Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:22-bk-80649

Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Clifton R Jessup Jr
Case #: 8:22-ap-80234
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 24, 2022
Terminated:Dec 01, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
CarePayment Technologies, Inc.
9600 SW Nimbus Ave., Suite 260
Beaverton, OR 97008
Defendant
Highlands Medical Center
380 Woods Cove Rd.
Scottsboro, AL 35768
Plaintiff
Devonna Talley
1715 S. Scott St.
Scottsboro, AL 35768
Represented By
John C. Larsen
Larsen Law, P.C.
contact info
Trustee
Judith Thompson
P. O. Box 18966
Huntsville, AL 35804


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, December 01, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Thu 12/01 9:12 AM
Adversary Case 8:22-ap-80234 Closed (bng)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 23, 2022
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 10/23 11:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 10/23/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 21 Order Approving
Friday, October 21, 2022
21 21 order Approving Fri 10/21 3:33 PM
Order Awarding Actual Damages Pursuant to 11 U.S.C 362 (k) Signed on 10/21/2022. (bng)
Related: [-]
utility Update Professional Fees Fri 10/21 3:35 PM
Update Professional Fees for John C. Larsen, Debtor's Attorney, Period: to , Fees awarded: $3000.00, Expenses awarded: $0.00; Awarded on 10/21/2022 (bng)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 13, 2022
19 19 court Hearing Scheduled Tue 09/13 11:31 AM
Hearing Scheduled Related [+] Hearing scheduled 9/21/2022 at 10:00 AM at Huntsville Federal Building (CRJ). (dwh)
Related: [-] 17 Response filed by Plaintiff Devonna Talley
Monday, September 12, 2022
18 18 misc Brief Mon 09/12 2:59 PM
Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Allegations Asserted in the Complaint Filed by Plaintiff Devonna Talley.(Larsen, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit and Formal Accounting of Attorney's Fees
17 17 answer Response Mon 09/12 2:57 PM
Response to Related [+] Filed by Plaintiff Devonna Talley (Larsen, John)
Related: [-] Item:9 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Highlands Medical Center, Defendant CarePayment Technologies, Inc.
16 16 misc Brief Mon 09/12 2:30 PM
Brief Defendants Carepayment Technologies, Inc. and Highlands Medical Centers Brief Filed by Defendants CarePayment Technologies, Inc., Highlands Medical Center Related [+].(Shepard, Tazewell)
Related: [-] 13 Order: (1) Requiring Response to Motion to Dismiss and Briefs; and (2) Scheduling Status Conference Signed on 8/12/2022. Status hearing to be held on 9/21/2022 at 10:00 AM at Huntsville Federal Building (CRJ). (dwh)
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B
Sunday, August 14, 2022
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 08/14 11:32 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 08/14/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Notice of Hearing
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 08/14 11:32 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 08/14/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Order and Notice of Status Conference
Friday, August 12, 2022
13 13 2 pgs order Order and Notice of Status Conference Fri 08/12 10:39 AM
Order: (1) Requiring Response to Motion to Dismiss and Briefs; and (2) Scheduling Status Conference Signed on 8/12/2022. Status hearing to be held on 9/21/2022 at 10:00 AM at Huntsville Federal Building (CRJ). (dwh)
Related: [-]
12 12 court Notice of Hearing-Van200 Fri 08/12 8:27 AM
Notice of Hearing on Related [+] Hearing scheduled 9/21/2022 at 10:00 AM at Huntsville Federal Building (CRJ). (dwh)
Related: [-] 9 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Highlands Medical Center, Defendant CarePayment Technologies, Inc.
Wednesday, August 10, 2022
11 11 answer Answer Wed 08/10 3:39 PM
Answer Related [+] Defendant Highlands Medical Center's Answer Filed by Defendant Highlands Medical Center (Shepard, Tazewell)
Related: [-] ;1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Devonna Talley
10 10 answer Answer Wed 08/10 3:35 PM
Answer Related [+] Defendant Carepayment Technologies, Inc.s Answer Filed by Defendant CarePayment Technologies, Inc. (Shepard, Tazewell)
Related: [-] ;1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Devonna Talley
9 9 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Wed 08/10 3:17 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Filed by Defendants CarePayment Technologies, Inc., Highlands Medical Center (Shepard, Tazewell)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 29, 2022
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Notice Fri 07/29 11:37 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 07/29/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Wednesday, July 27, 2022
7 7 order Extend Time Wed 07/27 2:11 PM
Order Extending Deadline to File Responsive Pleading Related [+] Signed on 7/27/2022. Deadline extended to August 12, 2022 (dwh)
Related: [-] 6
6 6 motion Extend Time Wed 07/27 10:23 AM
Motion to Extend Time Carepayment Technologies, Inc. and Highland Medical Centers Unopposed Motion to Extend the Deadline to Respond to the Plaintiffs Complaint by Fourteen (14) Days Filed by Defendant Highlands Medical Center (Shepard, Tazewell)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 06, 2022
5 5 misc Certificate of Service Wed 07/06 4:18 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+]. (Larsen, John)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Issued Highlands Medical Center Date Issued 6/27/2022, Answer Due 7/27/2022 (dwh)
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Wed 07/06 4:17 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+]. (Larsen, John)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued CarePayment Technologies, Inc. Date Issued 6/27/2022, Answer Due 7/27/2022 (dwh)
Monday, June 27, 2022
3 3 cmp Summons Issued Mon 06/27 8:58 AM
Summons Issued Highlands Medical Center Date Issued 6/27/2022, Answer Due 7/27/2022 (dwh)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Summons Issued Mon 06/27 8:56 AM
Summons Issued CarePayment Technologies, Inc. Date Issued 6/27/2022, Answer Due 7/27/2022 (dwh)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 24, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 06/24 3:48 PM
Adversary case 22-80234 14 Related [+]) Complaint by Devonna Talley against CarePayment Technologies, Inc., Highlands Medical Center. Receipt Number N/A, Fee Amount $350 (Larsen, John)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - other
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - BNC Certificate of Notice
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Proof of Claim Number 3
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Proof of Claim Number 14
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - CarePayment-Highlands Letter 5-6-22
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - CarePayment-Highlands Letter 6-6-22