Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-08937
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jun 27, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Dec 24, 2022 3:50 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
BLAKE W FOGEL
Represented By
TAYLOR CHRISTOPHER BARTLETT
Heninger Garrison Davis Llc - Birmingham Al
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Friday, July 08, 2022
4 4 4 pgs order Order Fri 07/08 9:36 AM
ORDER - The Clerk is directed to administratively close the first-filed cases identified on Exhibit A. In the future, all pleadings and papers must be filed only on the docket for the second-filed cases. The Clerk is directed to file a copy of this Order on the docket for each of the cases identified on Exhibit A only. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 7/8/2022. (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 27, 2022
3 3 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Mon 06/27 3:52 PM
NOTICE of Designated Forum District of South Carolina by BLAKE W FOGEL (BARTLETT, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 06/27 3:51 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (BARTLETT, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 06/27 3:47 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-7229532.), filed by BLAKE W FOGEL. (BARTLETT, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]