California Northern District Court
Judge:Susan Illston
Case #: 4:22-cv-03789
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Jun 27, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Dec 24, 2022 1:25 AM PST
Defendant
DDR Media, LLC
Defendant
Lead Intelligence, Inc.
Represented By
Aravind Swaminathan
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe
contact info
Rebecca Clair Harlow
Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Loretta Williams
Represented By
Patrick Harry Peluso
Woodrow & Peluso, LLC
contact info
Steven Lezell Woodrow
Woodrow & Peluso, LLC
contact info
Rebecca Leah Davis
Lozeau Drury LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, July 12, 2022
oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Tue 07/12 5:09 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 07, 2022
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 07/07 2:53 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Loretta Williams. Lead Intelligence, Inc. served on 6/30/2022, answer due 7/21/2022. (Peluso, Patrick)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Thu 07/07 2:40 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Loretta Williams.. (Peluso, Patrick)
Related: [-]
9 9 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Thu 07/07 1:41 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 7 Patrick H. Peluso's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 06, 2022
8 8 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 07/06 11:08 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17325473.) filed by Loretta Williams. (Woodrow, Steven)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 07/06 10:40 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17325322.) filed by Loretta Williams. (Peluso, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 28, 2022
6 6 service Summons Issued Tue 06/28 10:04 AM
Summons Issued as to DDR Media, LLC, Lead Intelligence, Inc.(mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Lead Intelligence, Inc.
5 5 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Tue 06/28 10:00 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/28/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/5/2022 01:30 PM. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 27, 2022
4 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/11/2022. (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Proposed Summons Mon 06/27 1:56 PM
Proposed Summons. (Davis, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Mon 06/27 1:55 PM
Proposed Summons. (Davis, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 06/27 1:54 PM
COMPLAINT against DDR Media, LLC, Lead Intelligence, Inc. d/b/a Jornaya ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17299077.). Filed byLoretta Williams.(Davis, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Mon 06/27 2:16 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/11/2022. (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]