Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Michael H Watson
Referred: Kimberly A Jolson
Case #: 2:22-cv-02629
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Case Filed:Jun 27, 2022
Terminated:Oct 24, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Dec 24, 2022 4:28 AM EST
Defendant
Crowe Construction, Inc.
1985 Echo Road
Stow, OH 44224
Plaintiff
Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits
Represented By
Ryan Keith Hymore
Mangano Law Offices Co., Lpa
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, October 24, 2022
11 11 order Judgment - Default Mon 10/24 3:46 PM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (jk)
Related: [-]
10 10 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Mon 10/24 3:33 PM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 10/24/2022. (jk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 13, 2022
9 9 motion Default Judgment (Motion for) Tue 09/13 9:23 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant Crowe Construction, Inc. by Plaintiff Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits. (Hymore, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1: Declaration of Brian Gaston,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2: Local 758 Building Agreement,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3: Local 894 Building Agreement,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4: Declaration of Ryan Hymore
Thursday, August 18, 2022
8 8 order Clerks Entry of Default Thu 08/18 10:13 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendant Crowe Construction, Inc. (tla)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 17, 2022
7 7 notice Application to Enter Default Wed 08/17 8:37 AM
Application to Clerk for entry of default against Defendant Crowe Construction, Inc. . (Hymore, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1: Declaration of Ryan Hymore
Tuesday, July 26, 2022
6 6 misc Certificate of Clerk Tue 07/26 3:45 PM
CERTIFICATE of Mailing by clerk to Crowe Construction, Inc. A copy of the Complaint & issued Summons was sent by ordinary mail service-USPS. Attachments: #1 Summons & Complaint) (vb)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 07/26 3:54 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Crowe Construction, Inc. Answer due 8/16/2022. (vb )
Related: [-]
Friday, July 22, 2022
5 5 notice Notice (Other) Fri 07/22 5:08 PM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits re4 Summons Returned Unexecuted of Request for Ordinary Mail Service upon Defendant (Hymore, Ryan)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Returned Unexecuted Fri 07/22 3:46 PM
Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Crowe Construction, Inc. (er)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 28, 2022
3 3 misc Certificate of Clerk Tue 06/28 3:46 PM
Certificate of Mailing: Certified mailing of summons and complaint through the Clerk's Office pursuant to Local Rule 4.2. (bjc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certified Mail Receipt
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 06/28 11:55 AM
SUMMONS Issued as to Crowe Construction, Inc. (tla)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 27, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 06/27 6:59 PM
COMPLAINT against Crowe Construction, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8929379), filed by Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits. (Hymore, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Form