Louisiana Western District Court
Judge:James D Cain, Jr
Referred: Kathleen Kay
Case #: 2:22-cv-01912
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jun 28, 2022
Terminated:Aug 10, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Dec 25, 2022 3:39 AM CST
Defendant
Allstate Insurance Co
Represented By
Michele Trowbridge Barreca
Porteous Hainkel & Johnson (no)
contact info
Matthew Edward Simmons
Porteous Hainkel & Johnson (no)
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Lewis
Represented By
Joseph Muckleroy
Brasher Law Firm (beau)
contact info
Nishi Vimal Kothari
Brasher Law Firm (beau)
contact info
Derek Clinton Brasher
Brasher Law Firm (beau)
contact info
Special Master
Cade Richard Cole
Represented By
Cade Richard Cole
Law Office Of Cade R Cole
contact info
Special Master
Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Represented By
Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Juneau David
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Thursday, August 10, 2023
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss/Joint or Voluntary Thu 08/10 3:01 PM
ORDER granting10 Joint/Voluntary Motion to Dismiss with full prejudice. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 8/10/2023. (crt,Savoy, A)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 07, 2023
10 10 motion Dismiss/Joint or Voluntary Mon 08/07 2:11 PM
JOINT MOTION to Dismiss by Allstate Insurance Co, Michael Lewis. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/7/2023.(aty,Barreca, Michele) Modified on 8/7/2023 to add filer (Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed order
Thursday, October 06, 2022
9 9 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 10/06 10:21 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Allstate Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent Allstate Corp for Allstate Insurance Co. (aty,Barreca, Michele)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 04, 2022
8 8 notice Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included) Tue 10/04 2:37 PM
NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re:5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, sent to Michele Trowbridge Barreca on behalf of Allstate Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 10/18/2022. (crt,Whitener, M)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 10/04 1:04 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Allstate Insurance Co.(aty,Barreca, Michele)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 06, 2022
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 09/06 4:54 PM
ORDER granting5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint. Allstate Insurance Co answer due 10/4/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 9/6/2022. (crt,Jones, P)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Transferred Tue 09/06 8:25 AM
Motions Transferred regarding5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, with consent . Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Whitener, M)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 02, 2022
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 09/02 12:56 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, with consent by Allstate Insurance Co. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/2/2022.(Attorney Michele Trowbridge Barreca added to party Allstate Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Barreca, Michele)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed order
Wednesday, August 24, 2022
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 08/24 8:14 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Lewis. Allstate Insurance Co served on 8/23/2022, answer due 9/13/2022. (aty,Muckleroy, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 28, 2022
3 3 service Summons Issued - All (Form Included) Tue 06/28 3:50 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Allstate Insurance Co. (crt,Whitener, M)
Related: [-]
2 2 12 pgs order Order Tue 06/28 3:48 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 12/6/2021.(crt,Whitener, M)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
1 1 15 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 06/28 7:57 AM
COMPLAINT against Allstate Insurance Co with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5155898) filed by Michael Lewis.(Attorney Joseph Muckleroy added to party Michael Lewis(pty:pla))(aty,Muckleroy, Joseph) Modified docket text on 6/28/2022 (Whitener, M)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 06/28 3:46 PM
CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Whitener, M)
Related: [-]