Maine District Court
Judge:Nancy Torresen
Referred: Karen Frink Wolf
Case #: 2:22-cv-00193
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jun 28, 2022
Terminated:Feb 03, 2023
Last checked: Monday Dec 26, 2022 3:48 AM EST
Defendant
ADAM F CAIL
Represented By
CHRISTIAN C. FOSTER
Terry Garmey & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
MARY DICKINSON CASHIN
Represented By
FRED W. BOPP, III
Bopp & Guecia
contact info
Plaintiff
GOLDIVA GOLDENS LLC
Represented By
FRED W. BOPP, III
Bopp & Guecia
contact info


Docket last updated: 54 minutes ago
Friday, February 03, 2023
14 14 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 02/03 11:05 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by MARY DICKINSON CASHIN, GOLDIVA GOLDENS LLC. (BOPP, FRED)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 17, 2022
minutes Settlement Conference Thu 11/17 1:16 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON: Settlement Conference held. Settlement achieved. (Court Reporter: Tammy Martell) (jwr)
Related: [-]
order Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement Thu 11/17 1:18 PM
NOTICE of Settlement and PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT: Settlement Conference having been held this date and counsel having advised the Court that settlement has been effected by mutual agreement of the parties herein, it is hereby ORDERED that counsel shall complete the settlement of this matter within seventy-five (75) days of this date and cause to be filed a stipulation of dismissal of this matter with prejudice and without costs, failing which, the case will be dismissed pursuant to Local Rule 41.1(a).( Stipulation of Dismissal due by 1/31/2023.) By Rodrigue, DEPUTY CLERK. (jwr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 19, 2022
notice Notice (Other) Wed 10/19 6:41 AM
NOTICE of Cancelled Hearing. The Settlement Conference for 10/19/2022 at 8:30 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON is cancelled and will be rescheduled to a mutually agreeable time with the Court, counsel and parties. (jwr)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Hearing Wed 10/19 2:12 PM
NOTICE of Rescheduled Hearing: Video Settlement Conference reset for 11/17/2022 at 8:30 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 21, 2022
order Order on Motion to Stay Wed 09/21 8:16 AM
ORDER granting8 Consent Motion to Stay Motions. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (slg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 20, 2022
8 8 3 pgs motion Stay Tue 09/20 2:23 PM
Consent MOTION to Stay by MARY DICKINSON CASHIN, GOLDIVA GOLDENS LLC Responses due by 10/11/2022. (BOPP, FRED)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 13, 2022
7 7 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 09/13 9:19 AM
ORDER Setting Video Settlement Conference for 10/19/2022 at 8:30 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. In Camera Settlement Papers due by 10/12/2022. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 06, 2022
6 6 motion Dismiss Tue 09/06 3:40 PM
First MOTION to Dismiss with Incorporated Memorandum by ADAM F CAIL Responses due by 9/27/2022. (FOSTER, CHRISTIAN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 09, 2022
5 5 service Acknowledgment of Service Tue 08/09 2:27 PM
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to All Defendants . (BOPP, FRED)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Answer Deadline Wed 08/10 8:03 AM
Set Answer Deadline for ADAM F CAIL per acceptance of service ECF No. 5: Answer due by 8/29/2022. (slg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 30, 2022
4 4 1 pgs notice Notice of Interested Parties Thu 06/30 12:53 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties by GOLDIVA GOLDENS LLC (BOPP, FRED)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 28, 2022
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 06/28 11:36 AM
Summons Issued as to ADAM F CAIL. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 06/28 11:33 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 06/28 11:32 AM
COMPLAINT against ADAM F CAIL PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. , filed by GOLDIVA GOLDENS LLC, MARY DICKINSON CASHIN. (Service of Process Deadline 9/26/2022) Fee due by 6/30/2022.(bfa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Exhibit A - 2020-05-11 show and breeding contract,
Att: 2 1 pgs Exhibit B - 2021-11-01 AKC registration certificate
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 06/28 11:37 AM
Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 7/5/2022. (bfa)
Related: [-]
misc Case Opening Filing Fee Paid Tue 06/28 12:07 PM
Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMEDC-2668893.), filed by GOLDIVA GOLDENS LLC, MARY DICKINSON CASHIN.(BOPP, FRED)
Related: [-]