Nevada District Court
Judge:Gloria M Navarro
Referred: Daniel J Albregts
Case #: 2:22-cv-01015
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgment
Case Filed:Jun 28, 2022
Terminated:Feb 29, 2024
Case in other court:Eighth Judicial District Court, A-21-843758-C
Last checked: Sunday Dec 25, 2022 1:36 AM PST
Defendant
Harris Law Firm, LLP
Represented By
Kristina R. Weller
Richard Harris Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Represented By
Matthew A. Sarnoski
Dennett Winspear, LLP
contact info
Gina Winspear
Dennett Winspear
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
44 44 appeal USCA Memorandum/Opinion Thu 04/24 12:45 PM
MEMORANDUM of USCA, Ninth Circuit, AFFIRMING Judgment of the USDC as to41 Notice of Appeal filed by Harris Law Firm, LLP. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
41 41 appeal Notice Appeal Fri 03/29 3:12 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Defendant Harris Law Firm, LLP. Filing fee $ 605, receipt number ANVDC-7635078. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (Clark, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Friday, March 01, 2024
40 40 order Judgment Fri 03/01 11:48 AM
JUDGMENT in favor of State Farm Fire & Casualty Company against Harris Law Firm, LLP. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 3/1/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH) (Main Document 40 replaced on 3/1/2024) (CAH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
39 39 10 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Fri 03/01 11:41 AM
ORDER granting20 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk of Court is instructed to close the case and enter judgment in favor of Plaintiff against Defendant. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/29/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
minutes Settlement Conference Thu 12/21 1:20 PM
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Settlement Conference held on 12/21/2023 before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. Crtrm Administrator: J. Ries ; Pla Counsel: Gina Winspear ; Def Counsel: David Clark ; Recording start and end times: 10:10 - 12:40 ; Courtroom: 3A ; Also present were Linda Cummings, Richard Harris, Dane Littlefield and Jay Stahnke.. The court heard presentations from counsel and the parties present and met with each side in caucuses. Offers and counteroffers were exchanged. A settlement was not reached. Counsel may jointly contact the court to request an additional settlement conference if they agree that additional negotiations would be helpful. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAR)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
37 37 4 pgs order Order on Stipulation Mon 12/11 4:33 PM
ORDER granting36 Stipulation FOR VIRTUAL APPEARANCE AT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. IT IS SO ORDERED that Dane A. Littlefield, Esq., and Fire Casualty Claim Specialist Jay Stahnke may attend the settlement conference scheduled for December 21, 2023, at 10:00 A.M. PST via virtual appearance. Defendant shall include the email addresses of defense attorney Littlefield and Claim Specialist Stahnke in their written confidential settlement statement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 12/11/2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
36 36 motion Stipulation Mon 11/27 1:14 PM
Joint STIPULATION and Order for Virtual Appearance at Settlement Conference re34 Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings, 35 Minute Order,, by Plaintiff State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. (Sarnoski, Matthew) (other) (settlement)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
minord Minute Order Tue 11/14 6:20 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 11/14/2023. Re: 34 Order resetting settlement conference. This case is set for a settlement conference on December 21, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that the parties confidential settlement conference statements should be submitted to Kimberly_LaPointe@nvd.uscourts.gov by 4:00 p.m. on Thursday, December 14, 2023. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
34 34 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings (non motion deadlines) Wed 10/25 1:41 PM
ORDER - The Settlement Conference previously set by the Court is continued and RESET for Thursday, December 21, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 3A. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 10/25/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2023
minord Minute Order Fri 10/13 9:12 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 10/13/2023. By Deputy Clerk: J, Ries. The parties have filed a stipulation to continue settlement conference31 that does not contain five mutual agreeable dates for a continued settlement conference. ORDERED that the parties are to submit five mutual agreeable dates for a continued settlement conference by October 24, 2023. FURTHER ORDERED counsel is to email the proposed dates to the courtroom deputy for this court at jerry_ries@nvd.uscourts.gov. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
33 33 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Fri 10/13 11:28 AM
ORDER granting31 Stipulation to Continue Settlement Conference. The Settlement Conference set for October 12, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. should be vacated and reset for a different date within the next 60 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 10/12/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
31 31 motion Stipulation Wed 10/11 4:13 PM
STIPULATION TO CONTINUE (First Request) Joint Stipulation and Order to Continue Settlement Conference re22 Order Setting Settlement Conference,, by Defendant Harris Law Firm, LLP. (Clark, David) (continue) (ene)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
30 30 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List Wed 10/04 1:27 PM
ORDER granting ECF No.27 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Kristina Weller is removed from the list of counsel to be noticed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 10/4/2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
28 28 notice Notice Appearance of Counsel Tue 10/03 11:27 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney David A. Clark on behalf of Defendant Harris Law Firm, LLP. (Clark, David)
Related: [-]
27 27 motion Motion Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List Tue 10/03 11:24 AM
MOTION to remove attorney Kristina Weller from the Electronic Service List in this case by Defendant Harris Law Firm, LLP. (Clark, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
minord Minute Order Thu 09/28 2:41 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 9/28/2023. Re: 25 Plaintiff's request for exception to personal attendance requirements for judicial settlement. Having reviewed Plaintiff's request, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a pre-Settlement Conference telephonic conference is set for Tuesday, October 3, 2023 at 11:00 a.m. This telephonic conference is for Judge Albregts and counsel only. Counsel must call (888) 808-6929, access code 8129639 , five minutes before the telephonic conference. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
25 25 misc Request Judicial Notice Tue 09/26 2:22 PM
REQUEST for Judicial Notice re22 Order Setting Settlement Conference,, by Plaintiff State Farm Fire & Casualty Company.. (Sarnoski, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 22, 2023
24 24 respm Reply Tue 08/22 2:58 PM
REPLY to Response to20 Motion for Summary Judgment,, by Plaintiff State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. (Winspear, Gina)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 08, 2023
23 23 respm Response Tue 08/08 6:14 PM
RESPONSE to20 Motion for Summary Judgment,, by Defendant Harris Law Firm, LLP. Replies due by 8/22/2023.(Weller, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix Defendant's Appendix to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment
Tuesday, August 01, 2023
22 22 4 pgs order Order Setting Settlement Conference Wed 08/02 2:43 PM
ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - In-Person Settlement Conference set for Thursday, 10/12/2023 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. The written settlement statements must be submitted by email to Kimberly_LaPointe@nvd.uscourts.gov by 4:00 p.m. on Thursday, October 5, 2023 . Do not deliver or mail them to the clerks office. Do not serve a copy on opposing counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 8/1/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CJS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 27, 2023
minord Minute Order Thu 07/27 6:56 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/27/2023. By Deputy Clerk: NEV. Pursuant to LR 16-5, this case is REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts for a settlement conference. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 18, 2023
20 20 motion Motion Summary Judgment Tue 07/18 1:29 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment and Declaratory Relief by Plaintiff State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. Responses due by 8/8/2023.(Winspear, Gina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - State Farm Policy,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Lease Agreement,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Air Transport Srvc Agmt,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - 702PC Entity Info,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Law Firm Depo,
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Law Firm Payment Ledgers,
Att: 8 Exhibit H - Law Firm Checks,
Att: 9 Exhibit I - 702PC Payment Ledgers,
Att: 10 Exhibit J - 702PC Checks,
Att: 11 Exhibit K - McKinnon Report,
Att: 12 Exhibit L - Def Initial Expert Designation,
Att: 13 Exhibit M - Def Supp & Rebuttal Designation
Wednesday, March 15, 2023
19 19 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation Scheduling Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings (non motion deadlines) Wed 03/15 2:40 PM
ORDER. IT IS SO ORDERED that the parties Stipulation to modify Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order to Extend Discovery Deadlines (ECF No.18 ) is GRANTED. Discovery due by 6/21/2023. Motions due by 7/21/2023. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/21/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 3/15/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - YAW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 14, 2023
18 18 motion Stipulation Tue 03/14 4:33 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) by Defendant Harris Law Firm, LLP. (Weller, Kristina) (extend) (discovery)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 16, 2022
notice Notice AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge Fri 12/16 7:47 AM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (KF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 15, 2022
16 16 5 pgs order Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Fri 12/16 7:46 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER Granting15 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 5/22/2023. Motions due by 6/21/2023. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/21/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 12/15/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 14, 2022
15 15 motion Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Wed 12/14 3:57 PM
Joint Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff State Farm Fire & Casualty Company.. (Winspear, Gina)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 22, 2022
14 14 misc Certificate Interested Parties Tue 11/22 10:09 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Harris Law Firm, LLP. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Weller, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 21, 2022
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 11/21 5:22 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,, FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT AND JURY DEMAND filed by Harris Law Firm, LLP. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 1/5/2023.(Weller, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 27, 2022
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 07/27 11:50 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company re6 Amended Complaint,. Harris Law Firm, LLP served on 7/25/2022.(Sarnoski, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint & AOS
Monday, July 25, 2022
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 07/25 11:42 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company re3 Summons Issued. Harris Law Firm, LLP served on 7/5/2022.(Sarnoski, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Ex. A - Affd of Service
minord Minute Order Mon 07/25 9:26 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/25/2022. Upon Review of Plaintiff's 9 Response to the Court's 5 Minute Order, the Court HEREBY FINDS that Plaintiff has satisfied the order to show cause. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 20, 2022
9 9 respm Response Wed 07/20 11:23 AM
RESPONSE to 5 Minute Order,,,,, by Plaintiff State Farm Fire & Casualty Company.(Sarnoski, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - NV Secretary of State Harris Business Info,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Harris Initial or Annual List & BL,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Harris Annual or Amd List & BL
Tuesday, July 19, 2022
8 8 misc Certificate Interested Parties Tue 07/19 5:07 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Sarnoski, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 18, 2022
7 7 misc Certificate Interested Parties Mon 07/18 3:36 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Sarnoski, Matthew)
Related: [-]
6 6 cmp Complaint Amended Mon 07/18 3:20 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against State Farm Fire & Casualty Company by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. No changes to parties. (Sarnoski, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex A - Underlying Action Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex B - State Farm Policy,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex C - Lease Agreement MGI Aircraftco & Richard Harris 4/23/17,
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex D - Air Transportation Services Agreement,
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex E - 702PC Entity Info
Wednesday, July 06, 2022
minord Minute Order Wed 07/06 11:14 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/6/2022. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff State Farm Fire & Casualty Company ("Plaintiff") show cause by July 20, 2022, as to why the Court should not dismiss this action for failure to satisfy the diversity jurisdiction requirements set forth in 28 U.S.C. § 1332. To show Defendant Harris Law Firm, LLP's ("Defendant's") diversity, Plaintiff broadly states that Defendant "is a Limited Liability Company, licensed and domiciled with Nevada with its principal place of business in Las Vegas, Nevada." (Compl. 5, ECF No. 1 ). However, that broad statement fails to adequately allege Defendant's citizenship for purposes of diversity jurisdiction. See NewGen, LLC v. Safe Cig, LLC , 840 F.3d 606, 611 (9th Cir. 2016) (explaining that, to properly plead diversity jurisdiction for a limited liability company, the citizenship of all members must be pled). Accordingly, to ensure that the Court has subject matter jurisdiction over this case, Plaintiff must file a Notice by July 20, 2022, listing the citizenship for all of Defendant's members/owners (or partners, since Plaintiff, at various times, refers to Defendant both as an LLP and an LLC). (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KB)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 01, 2022
4 4 misc Certificate Interested Parties Fri 07/01 10:55 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Winspear, Gina)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 28, 2022
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 06/28 3:06 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Harris Law Firm, LLP re1 Complaint. (EDS)
Related: [-]
2 2 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 06/28 10:52 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANVDC-6954243) by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. Proof of service due by 9/26/2022. (Winspear, Gina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex A - Underlying Action Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex B - State Farm Policy,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex C - Lease Agreement MGI Aircraftco & Richard Harris 4/23/17,
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex D - Air Transportation Services Agreement,
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex E - 702PC Entity Info,
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 7 Summons Summons to be Issued
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Tue 06/28 3:01 PM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (EDS)
Related: [-]
order Standing Order Tue 06/28 3:02 PM
STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
Related: [-]