California Southern District Court
Judge:Cynthia Bashant
Referred: David D Leshner
Case #: 3:22-cv-00950
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983cv Civil Rights Act - Civil Action for Deprivation of Rights
Case Filed:Jun 28, 2022
Terminated:Jun 18, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Dec 25, 2022 12:47 AM PST
Defendant
Robert Andres Bonta
Represented By
Jennifer Godfrey Perkell
California Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Emmanuelle Soichet
Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Todd Grabarsky
California Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Kim Johnson
Represented By
Jennifer Godfrey Perkell
California Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Emmanuelle Soichet
Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Todd Grabarsky
California Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Foothills Christian Church
Represented By
Matthew McReynolds
Pacific Justice Institute
contact info
Kevin Trent Snider
Pacific Justice Institute
contact info
Plaintiff
San Diego Journey Community Church
Represented By
Matthew McReynolds
Pacific Justice Institute
contact info
Kevin Trent Snider
Pacific Justice Institute
contact info
Plaintiff
The Grove Church
Represented By
Matthew McReynolds
Pacific Justice Institute
contact info
Kevin Trent Snider
Pacific Justice Institute
contact info

GPO Jun 15 2023
Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice (ECF No. 13). The Court grants in part and denies in part Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice (ECF No. 14). If Plaintiffs wish to do so, they must file an Amended Complaint on or before 7/14/23. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 6/15/23. (jmo)
GPO May 20 2024
Order Granting Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint (ECF No.24). If Plaintiffs wish to amend the claims for which leave to amend is granted, they must do so on or before June 10, 2024. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 05/20/2024. (mjw)
GPO Jun 18 2024
ORDER Dismissing Action for Failure to Amend. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 06/18/2024.(mjw)

Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
32 32 appeal USCA Time Schedule Order Tue 07/02 12:55 PM
USCA Time Schedule Order as to30 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit, filed by Foothills Christian Ministries, Journey Community Church, San Diego Journey Community Church, Foothills Christian Church, The Grove Church. (NOTICE TO PARTIES of deadlines regarding appellate transcripts: Appellant shall file transcript designation and ordering form with the US District Court, provide a copy of the form to the court reporter, and make payment arrangements with the court reporter on or by 7/29/2024 (see Ninth Circuit Rule 10-3.1); Due date for filing of transcripts in US District Court is 8/28/2024.) (cc: Court Reporter). (No mailing address listed on Civil docket for Pro Se Parties )(mjw)(jrd)
Related: [-]
31 31 appeal USCA Case Number Tue 07/02 12:54 PM
USCA Case Number: 24-4049 Re: ECF No.30 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit, filed by Foothills Christian Ministries, Journey Community Church, San Diego Journey Community Church, Foothills Christian Church, The Grove Church.(No mailing address listed on Civil docket for Pro Se's)(mjw)(jrd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attorney Appeal Case Opening,
Att: 2 Pro Se Appeals Case Opening,
Att: 3 Ninth Circuit Appellate Mentoring Program
Friday, June 28, 2024
30 30 appeal Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Fri 06/28 2:34 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit RE:29 CLERK'S JUDGMENT by Foothills Christian Church, Foothills Christian Ministries, Journey Community Church, San Diego Journey Community Church, The Grove Church. ( Filing fee $ 605 receipt number ACASDC-18974556.) (Notice of Appeal electronically transmitted to US Court of Appeals.) (Snider, Kevin) (mjw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
29 29 order Judgment - Clerk Tue 06/18 3:21 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that judgment is The Plaintiffs claims regarding the Free Exercise Clause are dismissed with prejudice, but Plaintiffs remaining claims are dismissed without prejudice the case is hereby closed.(mjw)
Related: [-]
28 28 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 06/18 3:16 PM
ORDER Dismissing Action for Failure to Amend. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 06/18/2024.(mjw)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
27 27 31 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 05/21 8:21 AM
Order Granting Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint (ECF No.24 ). If Plaintiffs wish to amend the claims for which leave to amend is granted, they must do so on or before June 10, 2024. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 05/20/2024. (mjw)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
26 26 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 12/08 1:20 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Robert Andres Bonta, Kim Johnson. (Grabarsky, Todd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
25 25 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 11/14 5:22 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Foothills Christian Church, Foothills Christian Ministries, Journey Community Church, San Diego Journey Community Church, The Grove Church.(Snider, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Request for Judicial Notice and Exhibits 1-2
Friday, September 22, 2023
24 24 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 09/22 9:58 AM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Robert Andres Bonta, Kim Johnson.(Grabarsky, Todd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Request for Judicial Notice
Tuesday, July 18, 2023
23 23 service Summons Issued Tue 07/18 12:39 PM
Amended Summons Issued to Amended Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jmo)
Related: [-]
22 22 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1) Tue 07/18 12:31 PM
Order Granting Joint Motion to Set Briefing Schedule (ECF No.21 ). Defendants to file their motion to dismiss, or other responsive pleading to the Amended Complaint, by no later than 11/14/23. Opposition due by 11/14/2023. Reply due by 12/8/2023. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 7/18/23. (jmo)(caption corrected)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 14, 2023
21 21 motion Miscellaneous (Other 1) Fri 07/14 10:53 AM
Joint MOTION Joint Motion Setting Briefing Schedule on Defendants Planned Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Amended Complaint by Robert Andres Bonta, Kim Johnson. (Soichet, Emmanuelle) (jmo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 13, 2023
20 20 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 07/13 1:24 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by The Grove Church, Foothills Christian Church, San Diego Journey Community Church. (Snider, Kevin) (jmo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 15, 2023
19 19 39 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1) Thu 06/15 11:19 AM
Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice (ECF No.13 ). The Court grants in part and denies in part Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice (ECF No.14 ). If Plaintiffs wish to do so, they must file an Amended Complaint on or before 7/14/23. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 6/15/23. (jmo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 15, 2022
18 18 notice Notice (Other) Tue 11/15 2:43 PM
NOTICE Withdrawal of Docket No. 16 by Robert Andres Bonta re16 Reply to Response to Motion (Soichet, Emmanuelle)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 14, 2022
17 17 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 11/14 5:14 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by Kim Johnson. (Soichet, Emmanuelle)
Related: [-]
16 16 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 11/14 4:34 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by Kim Johnson. (Soichet, Emmanuelle)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 25, 2022
15 15 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 10/25 4:54 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by Foothills Christian Church, San Diego Journey Community Church, The Grove Church. (Snider, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 20, 2022
14 14 motion Miscellaneous (Other 1) Tue 09/20 2:51 PM
MOTION Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Motion to Dismiss re13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by Kim Johnson.(Soichet, Emmanuelle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. B,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. C,
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex. D,
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex. E,
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex. F,
Att: 7 Exhibit Ex. G,
Att: 8 Exhibit Ex. H,
Att: 9 Exhibit Ex. I
13 13 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Tue 09/20 2:46 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by Kim Johnson. (Soichet, Emmanuelle)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 15, 2022
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/15 2:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Todd Grabarsky on behalf of Robert Andres Bonta, Kim Johnson (Grabarsky, Todd)Attorney Todd Grabarsky added to party Robert Andres Bonta(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Grabarsky added to party Kim Johnson(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 17, 2022
11 11 2 pgs order Order of Judge Transfer Wed 08/17 10:24 AM
ORDER OF TRANSFER. Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner for all further proceedings. The new case number is 22cv950 BAS-DDL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg on 8/17/22.(jmo)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 12, 2022
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 08/12 1:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance of Jennifer G. Perkell by Jennifer Godfrey Perkell on behalf of Robert Andres Bonta, Kim Johnson (Perkell, Jennifer)Attorney Jennifer Godfrey Perkell added to party Robert Andres Bonta(pty:dft), Attorney Jennifer Godfrey Perkell added to party Kim Johnson(pty:dft) (jmo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 10, 2022
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1) Wed 08/10 3:16 PM
Order Granting Joint Motion to Set Briefing Schedule on Motion to Dismiss (ECF No.8 ). Defendants shall file their motion to dismiss or other responsive pleading to the Complaint by no later than 9/20/22. Plaintiffs shall file their opposition by no later than 10/25/22. Defendants shall file their reply by no later than 11/14/21. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 8/10/22. (jmo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 28, 2022
8 8 motion Miscellaneous (Other 1) Thu 07/28 4:46 PM
Joint MOTION Setting Briefing Schedule on Defendants Intended Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by Robert Andres Bonta. (Soichet, Emmanuelle)Attorney Emmanuelle Soichet added to party Robert Andres Bonta(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 13, 2022
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Thu 07/14 8:42 AM
Order Granting Defendants' Unopposed Application to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint (ECF No.6 ). Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 7/13/22. (jmo)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Wed 07/13 10:08 AM
Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File ; Declaration of Emmanuelle S. Soichet; Proposed Order by Kim Johnson. (Soichet, Emmanuelle)Attorney Emmanuelle Soichet added to party Kim Johnson(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 12, 2022
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 07/12 3:22 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Grove Church, Foothills Christian Church, San Diego Journey Community Church. Robert Andres Bonta served. (Snider, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 08, 2022
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 07/08 3:28 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Grove Church, Foothills Christian Church, San Diego Journey Community Church. Kim Johnson served. (Snider, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 07, 2022
order Order of Judge Transfer Thu 07/07 11:30 AM
MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Thomas J. Whelan is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Cynthia Bashant for all further proceedings. The new case number is 22cv950 BAS-MSB.(no document attached) (sjt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 28, 2022
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 06/28 4:11 PM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (cxl1) (sjt)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 06/28 4:08 PM
COMPLAINT against Robert Andres Bonta, Kim Johnson ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACASDC-16950929.)Filed by The Grove Church, Foothills Christian Church, San Diego Journey Community Church. The new case number is 3:22-cv-950-W-MSB. Judge Thomas J. Whelan and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg are assigned to the case. (Snider, Kevin)(cxl1)(sjt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet