National Shooting Sports Foundation, Inc. v. James
Original Case: 1:21-cv-01348
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-cv-01374 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes |
Case Filed: | Jun 24, 2022 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 29, 2022 4:24 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Letitia James, in her official capacity as New York Attorney General
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
National Shooting Sports Foundation, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Beretta U.S.A. Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Davidson's, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Glock Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Central Texas Gun Works
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Hornady Manufacturing Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Lipsey's LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Osage County Guns LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
RSR Group, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Shedhorn Sports, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Sig Sauer, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Smith & Wesson Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Sports South LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Sprague's Sports Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Sturm, Ruger & Company, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 08/29/2023 4:35 PM EDT |
Friday, June 24, 2022 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellants Beretta U.S.A. Corp., Central Texas Gun Works, Davidson's, Inc., Glock Inc., Hornady Manufacturing Company, Lipsey's LLC, National Shooting Sports Foundation, Inc., Osage County Guns LLC, RSR Group, Inc., Shedhorn Sports, Inc., Sig Sauer, Inc., Smith & Wesson Inc., Sports South LLC, Sprague's Sports Inc. and Sturm, Ruger & Company, Inc., FILED. [3339475] 22-1374 [Entered: 06/28/2022 02:18 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 14 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellants Beretta U.S.A. Corp., Central Texas Gun Works, Davidson's, Inc., Glock Inc., Hornady Manufacturing Company, Lipsey's LLC, National Shooting Sports Foundation, Inc., Osage County Guns LLC, RSR Group, Inc., Shedhorn Sports, Inc., Sig Sauer, Inc., Smith & Wesson Inc., Sports South LLC, Sprague's Sports Inc. and Sturm, Ruger & Company, Inc., district court receipt # ANYNDC-5946923, FILED.[3339480] 22-1374 [Entered: 06/28/2022 02:22 PM] | |
3 | 3 26 pgs DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER, dated 05/25/2022, RECEIVED.[3339484] 22-1374 [Entered: 06/28/2022 02:24 PM] | |
4 | 4 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 05/25/2022, RECEIVED.[3339485] 22-1374 [Entered: 06/28/2022 02:26 PM] | |
5 | 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3339487] 22-1374 [Entered: 06/28/2022 02:27 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 13 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |