California Eastern District Court
Judge:Allison Claire
Case #: 2:22-cv-01124
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause08:1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petition
Case Filed:Jun 29, 2022
Terminated:Oct 19, 2022
Last checked: Monday Dec 26, 2022 1:19 AM PST
Defendant
Antony Blinken
Represented By
Elliot C. Wong, GOVT
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Katherine Brucker
Represented By
Elliot C. Wong, GOVT
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Ana Escrogima
Represented By
Elliot C. Wong, GOVT
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
David J. Connor
Represented By
Joshua Goldstein
Goldstein Immigration Lawyers
contact info

GPO Sep 07 2022
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/7/2022 GRANTING 6 Stipulation for extension of time. The new date for the defendants to file an answer or other dispositive pleading is 10/6/2022.(Perdue, C.)
GPO Oct 04 2022
ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/3/2022 DIRECTING the parties to submit in writing within 10 days of this order why they have not filed their consent/decline forms. Submission of the forms will automatically discharge this order. (Perdue, C.)
GPO Oct 11 2022
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/7/2022 GRANTING defendants until 10/21/2022 to file an answer or other dispositive pleading. (Coll, A)
GPO Oct 19 2022
ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/19/2022. CASE CLOSED. (Rodriguez, E)

Docket last updated: 55 minutes ago
Wednesday, October 19, 2022
15 15 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 10/19 11:32 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/19/2022. CASE CLOSED. (Rodriguez, E)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 18, 2022
14 14 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 10/18 2:36 PM
STIPULATION of DISMISSAL by David J. Connor.(Goldstein, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, October 11, 2022
13 13 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Tue 10/11 9:39 AM
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/7/2022 GRANTING defendants until 10/21/2022 to file an answer or other dispositive pleading. (Coll, A)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 06, 2022
12 12 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Thu 10/06 8:41 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Second Extension of Time by Antony Blinken, Katherine Brucker, Ana Escrogima. (Wong, Elliot)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 05, 2022
order Consent Minute Order Wed 10/05 9:38 AM
CONSENT MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) signed by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/5/2022: All parties have consented to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings in this action, including trial and entry of judgment, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(1). Accordingly, this Court AUTHORIZES the action to proceed before the assigned United States Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings including trial and entry of judgment. All further papers filed in this action shall bear the case number 2:22-cv-1124 AC.(Benson, A.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 04, 2022
10 10 misc Consent/Decline of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Tue 10/04 11:08 AM
CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Goldstein, Joshua)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Consent/Decline of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Tue 10/04 10:28 AM
CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Wong, Elliot)
Related: [-]
8 8 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 10/04 10:10 AM
ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/3/2022 DIRECTING the parties to submit in writing within 10 days of this order why they have not filed their consent/decline forms. Submission of the forms will automatically discharge this order. (Perdue, C.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 07, 2022
7 7 order Stipulation and Order Wed 09/07 12:32 PM
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/7/2022 GRANTING6 Stipulation for extension of time. The new date for the defendants to file an answer or other dispositive pleading is 10/6/2022.(Perdue, C.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 06, 2022
6 6 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 09/06 3:18 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for First Extension of Time by Antony Blinken, Katherine Brucker, Ana Escrogima. Attorney Wong, Elliot C. added. (Wong, Elliot)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 22, 2022
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Fri 07/22 11:35 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by David J. Connor. Antony Blinken served on 7/5/2022, answer due 9/6/2022; Katherine Brucker served on 7/21/2022, answer due 9/19/2022; Ana Escrogima served on 7/5/2022, answer due 9/6/2022. (Goldstein, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 15, 2022
4 4 misc Designation of Counsel Fri 07/15 9:13 AM
DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Elliot C. Wong, GOVT for Antony Blinken,Elliot C. Wong, GOVT for Katherine Brucker (Wong, Elliot)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 29, 2022
3 3 misc Civil New Case Documents for Magistrate as Presider Wed 06/29 11:00 AM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Coll, A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form,
Att: 2 VDRP
2 2 service Summons Wed 06/29 10:57 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Antony Blinken, Katherine Brucker, Ana Escrogima* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Joshua Goldstein* *Goldstein Immigration Lawyers* *2217 Jerome Way* *Los Angeles, CA 90039*. (Coll, A)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 06/29 9:57 AM
PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS and COMPLAINT against Antony Blinken, Katherine Brucker, Ana Escrogima by David J. Connor. Attorney Goldstein, Joshua added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10303937)(Goldstein, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet