Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Donald M Middlebrooks
Referred: Shaniek M Maynard
Case #: 2:22-cv-14238
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Case Filed:Jun 29, 2022
Terminated:Nov 09, 2022
Last checked: Monday Dec 26, 2022 3:43 AM EST
Counter Claimant
Jamil Mikati
Represented By
John Francis Bradley
Bradley Legal Group, P.A.
contact info
Counter Claimant
Shalini Jakhete
Represented By
John Francis Bradley
Bradley Legal Group, P.A.
contact info
Counter Claimant
Sanjeev Jakhete
Represented By
John Francis Bradley
Bradley Legal Group, P.A.
contact info
Counter Claimant
Linda Bisbee
Represented By
John Francis Bradley
Bradley Legal Group, P.A.
contact info
Counter Claimant
AquaGen Engineering Services, Inc.
Represented By
John Francis Bradley
Bradley Legal Group, P.A.
contact info
Counter Claimant
Beaver Ecoworks, LLC
Represented By
John Francis Bradley
Bradley Legal Group, P.A.
contact info
Counter Defendant
Aqua Pulsar, LLC
Represented By
Edward Maurice Mullins
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Wesley Andrew Butensky
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Ana Maria Barton
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Daniel Alvarez Sox
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Defendant
Swapan Biswas
Defendant
Nikolas Tavlarios
Defendant
Calliope Tavlarios
Defendant
John TAVLARIOS
Defendant
Global Water Investments, LLC.
Defendant
Shalini Jakhete
Represented By
John Francis Bradley
Bradley Legal Group, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
AquaGen Engineering Services, Inc.
Represented By
John Francis Bradley
Bradley Legal Group, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Beaver Ecoworks, LLC
Represented By
John Francis Bradley
Bradley Legal Group, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Linda Bisbee
Represented By
John Francis Bradley
Bradley Legal Group, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Sanjeev Jakhete
Represented By
John Francis Bradley
Bradley Legal Group, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Jamil Mikati
Represented By
John Francis Bradley
Bradley Legal Group, P.A.
contact info
Mediator
Jeffrey Grubman
Mediator
Pamela I Perry
Pamela I. Perry, P.A. 1501 Venera Ave. Ste. 300 Coral Gables
Coral Gables, FL 33146
Plaintiff
Aqua Pulsar, LLC
Represented By
Edward Maurice Mullins
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Wesley Andrew Butensky
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Ana Maria Barton
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Daniel Alvarez Sox
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
Global Water Investments, LLC.
Represented By
Edward Maurice Mullins
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Daniel Alvarez Sox
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
John TAVLARIOS
Represented By
Edward Maurice Mullins
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Daniel Alvarez Sox
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
Calliope Tavlarios
Represented By
Daniel Alvarez Sox
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
Swapan Biswas
Represented By
Edward Maurice Mullins
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Daniel Alvarez Sox
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
Nikolas Tavlarios
Represented By
Edward Maurice Mullins
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Daniel Alvarez Sox
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Sanjeev Jakhete
Represented By
John Francis Bradley
Bradley Legal Group, P.A.
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Beaver Ecoworks, LLC
Represented By
John Francis Bradley
Bradley Legal Group, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, November 09, 2022
45 45 1 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Thu 11/10 9:33 AM
ORDER CLOSING CASE: Closing Case with prejudice. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 11/9/2022. See attached document for full details. (mab)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 08, 2022
44 44 adr Mediation Report Tue 11/08 2:58 PM
FINAL MEDIATION REPORT by Pamela I. Perry. Disposition: Settled in full.(Perry, Pamela)
Related: [-]
43 43 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - aty Tue 11/08 2:33 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Joint Stipulated Dismissal with Prejudice of Entire Action by Aqua Pulsar, LLC, Swapan Biswas, Global Water Investments, LLC., John TAVLARIOS, Calliope Tavlarios, Nikolas Tavlarios (Sox, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 25, 2022
42 42 adr Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing Tue 10/25 9:43 PM
NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Pamela I Perry as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 11/2/2022 at 1:00 p.m.. (Perry, Pamela)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 24, 2022
41 41 notice Notice (Other) Mon 10/24 2:22 PM
NOTICE by Aqua Pulsar, LLC, Swapan Biswas, Global Water Investments, LLC., John TAVLARIOS, Nikolas Tavlarios . Attorney Edward Maurice Mullins added to party Swapan Biswas(pty:3pd), Attorney Edward Maurice Mullins added to party Swapan Biswas(pty:3pd), Attorney Edward Maurice Mullins added to party Global Water Investments, LLC.(pty:3pd), Attorney Edward Maurice Mullins added to party Global Water Investments, LLC.(pty:3pd), Attorney Edward Maurice Mullins added to party John TAVLARIOS(pty:3pd), Attorney Edward Maurice Mullins added to party John TAVLARIOS(pty:3pd), Attorney Edward Maurice Mullins added to party Nikolas Tavlarios(pty:3pd), Attorney Edward Maurice Mullins added to party Nikolas Tavlarios(pty:3pd). (Mullins, Edward)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 19, 2022
40 40 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Thu 10/20 11:26 AM
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW granting34 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Ana Maria Barton representing Aqua Pulsar, LLC (Plaintiff) and Aqua Pulsar, LLC (Counter Defendant) withdrawn from case. Plaintiff and Third Party Defendants other counsel of record will continue to represent Plaintiff and Third Party Defendants in this matter. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 10/19/2022. See attached document for full details. (swr)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 17, 2022
notice Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney Mon 10/17 9:03 AM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re37 Notice (Other). Wrong Event Selected ; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, See DE# 38 . It is not necessary to refile this document. (cds)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 14, 2022
37 37 notice Notice (Other) Fri 10/14 5:24 PM
NOTICE by Aqua Pulsar, LLC, Swapan Biswas, Global Water Investments, LLC., John TAVLARIOS, Calliope Tavlarios, Nikolas Tavlarios re22 Scheduling Order,,,, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,, Notice of Mediation (Sox, Daniel)
Related: [-]
adr Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing Mon 10/17 8:57 AM
JOINT NOTICE OF MEDIATOR SELECTION. Selected/Added Jeffrey Grubman as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 11/07/2022. (For Image See DE#37 (cds)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 13, 2022
36 36 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 10/13 7:01 PM
Amended MOTION TO DISMISS28 Third Party Complaint,24 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Counterclaim, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Lack of Standing by Aqua Pulsar, LLC, Swapan Biswas, Global Water Investments, LLC., John TAVLARIOS, Calliope Tavlarios, Nikolas Tavlarios. Responses due by 10/27/2022 (Sox, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 11, 2022
35 35 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Wed 10/12 8:59 AM
ORDER ON MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME AND ENLARGEMENT OF PAGE LIMITATION granting31 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion. The deadline for Aqua Pulsar and the Third Party Defendants to file a Consolidated Motion to Dismiss the Counterclaims DE20 and Third Party Claims DE28 is extended to October 13, 2022. The deadline for Jakhete and Beaver Ecoworks to file their Response to the Consolidated Motion is extended to November 9, 2022. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 10/11/2022. See attached document for full details. (swr)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 10, 2022
34 34 motion Withdraw as Attorney Mon 10/10 4:39 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Ana M. Barton for / by Aqua Pulsar, LLC. Responses due by 10/24/2022(Barton, Ana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, October 06, 2022
33 33 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 10/06 11:54 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS28 Third Party Complaint,24 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Counterclaim, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Lack of Standing by Aqua Pulsar, LLC, Swapan Biswas, Global Water Investments, LLC., John TAVLARIOS, Calliope Tavlarios, Nikolas Tavlarios. Responses due by 10/20/2022 (Sox, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 03, 2022
32 32 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 10/03 11:55 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS24 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Counterclaim, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Lack of Standing by Aqua Pulsar, LLC. Responses due by 10/17/2022 (Sox, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 30, 2022
31 31 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Fri 09/30 1:08 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to28 Third Party Complaint,24 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Counterclaim, by All Parties by Aqua Pulsar, LLC, Swapan Biswas, Global Water Investments, LLC., John TAVLARIOS, Calliope Tavlarios, Nikolas Tavlarios. Attorney Daniel Alvarez Sox added to party Aqua Pulsar, LLC(pty:cd), Attorney Daniel Alvarez Sox added to party Swapan Biswas(pty:3pd), Attorney Daniel Alvarez Sox added to party Global Water Investments, LLC.(pty:3pd), Attorney Daniel Alvarez Sox added to party John TAVLARIOS(pty:3pd), Attorney Daniel Alvarez Sox added to party Calliope Tavlarios(pty:3pd), Attorney Daniel Alvarez Sox added to party Nikolas Tavlarios(pty:3pd).(Sox, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A (Joint Proposed Order)
Tuesday, September 20, 2022
30 30 notice Notice (Other) Tue 09/20 7:54 PM
NOTICE by Aqua Pulsar, LLC re22 Scheduling Order,,,, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,, Joint Discovery Plan . Attorney Daniel Alvarez Sox added to party Aqua Pulsar, LLC(pty:pla). (Sox, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 13, 2022
29 29 service Summons Issued Tue 09/13 1:52 PM
Summons Issued as to Calliope Tavlarios. (scn)
Related: [-]
28 28 cmp Third Party Complaint Tue 09/13 11:00 AM
Amended THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Swapan Biswas, Global Water Investments, LLC., John TAVLARIOS, Calliope Tavlarios, Nikolas Tavlarios, filed by Sanjeev Jakhete, Beaver Ecoworks, LLC.(Bradley, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex B,
Att: 3 Summon(s) Summons Calliope aka Caryn Tavlarios
26 26 service Summons Issued Tue 09/13 9:34 AM
Summons Issued as to Swapan Biswas, Global Water Investments, LLC., John TAVLARIOS, Nikolas Tavlarios. (scn)
Related: [-]
order Clerk's Notice to Filer - ELECTRONIC CASE, SUMMONS(ES) Tue 09/13 9:36 AM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Summons for Calliope Tavlarious (Caryn Tavlarios) cannot be issued. The party on the summons does not match the initiating documents. (scn)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 12, 2022
25 25 cmp Third Party Complaint Mon 09/12 7:33 PM
THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT by Sanjeev Jakhete and Beaver eco works, LLC. against John TAVLARIOS, Nikolas Tavlarios, Calliope Tavlarios, Swapan Biswas, Global Water Investments, LLC., filed by Beaver Ecoworks, LLC, Sanjeev Jakhete.(Bradley, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex B,
Att: 3 Summon(s) Global Water Inv,
Att: 4 Summon(s) John Tavlarios,
Att: 5 Summon(s) Nikolas Tavlarios,
Att: 6 Summon(s) Calliope Tavlarios,
Att: 7 Summon(s) Swapan Biswas
24 24 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Counterclaim Mon 09/12 7:27 PM
ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM by Jakhete and Beaver Ecoworks, LLC. against Aqua Pulsar, LLC by Linda Bisbee, Sanjeev Jakhete, AquaGen Engineering Services, Inc., Jamil Mikati, Beaver Ecoworks, LLC, Shalini Jakhete.(Bradley, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex B,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex B
Tuesday, August 30, 2022
22 22 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Mediation Tue 08/30 12:21 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION: ( Amended Pleadings due by 10/3/2022., Discovery due by 1/30/2023., Expert Discovery due by 1/30/2023., Joinder of Parties due by 10/3/2022., In Limine Motions due by 3/13/2023., Dispositive Motions due by 2/27/2023., Pretrial Stipulation due by 4/10/2023., Jury Trial set for 5/8/2023 09:00 AM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 5/3/2023 01:15 PM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.), Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 8/30/2022. See attached document for full details. (swr) [LINK:Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.] Modified Text on 8/30/2022 (swr)
Related: [-]
minutes Scheduling Conference Tue 08/30 10:47 AM
PAPERLESS MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard: Scheduling Conference held on 8/30/2022. Total time in court: 10 mins. Attorney Appearances: Ana Barton, Esq. for Plaintiff; John Bradley, Esq. for Defendant. Pretrial scheduling matters discussed. Scheduling Order to follow. (Digital WebEx Conference: SMM_8-30-2022_10:30 am_22cv14238) (jrz)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Tue 08/30 5:56 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot14 Motion to Dismiss. In light of the Amended Complaint (DE20 ), Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Complaint is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 8/30/2022. (kal)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 29, 2022
20 20 cmp Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal Mon 08/29 10:03 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Aqua Pulsar, LLC.(Barton, Ana)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 25, 2022
19 19 misc Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1 Thu 08/25 9:13 AM
Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Aqua Pulsar, LLC(Barton, Ana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, August 23, 2022
17 17 motion Extension of Time Tue 08/23 4:16 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Change Trial Date re13 Scheduling Order,,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,, by Aqua Pulsar, LLC. Responses due by 9/6/2022(Barton, Ana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 08/23 4:26 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER denying17 the Parties' Joint Motion to Change Trial Date. The Parties request that I continue the trial date in this matter from May 2023 to November 2023. As support for this broad relief, they cite only the "complex issues involved in this case, the realistic timeframes for discovery and pretrial motions, and the number of Parties involved." "A continuance of any trial... will be granted only on exceptional circumstances." S.D. Fla. L.R. 7.6. The Parties' vague references to the complexity of this case and the number of Parties do not constitute exceptional circumstances, nor do they establish good cause for the continuance requested. Moreover, I am not persuaded that there are any obstacles that will prevent the Parties from litigating this case during the trial period I have set, and the Parties have not pointed to any such obstacle. Accordingly, the Parties' Joint Motion (DE17 ) is denied. The Parties are reminded that if they desire more flexibility in the Pretrial Schedule, they may consent to magistrate jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 8/23/2022. (jnk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 18, 2022
16 16 notice Notice of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name Thu 08/18 5:23 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Ana Maria Barton (Barton, Ana)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 17, 2022
order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Wed 08/17 12:53 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for TUESDAY, AUGUST 30, 2022, at 10:30 A.M. in Fort Pierce Division before U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard. To participate, counsel shall dial (888) 684-8852 and enter access code 5312437. Counsel shall confer and file, by THURSDAY, AUGUST 25, 2022, a Joint Scheduling Report pursuant to Local Rule 16.1.B. To the extent a Joint Scheduling Report has previously been filed, the parties shall file an amended version based on the existing trial date. The parties shall also begin pretrial tasks now, in advance of the Conference. This includes the exchange of initial disclosures and the start of discovery coordination. This is necessary so that the parties can complete all pretrial tasks within the time allotted and have the case ready for trial by the existing trial date. The parties must be prepared for the Conference at their assigned time but may have to wait 10-20 minutes before their Conference begins, as the Court sets multiple cases for the same time slot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 8/17/2022. (jrz)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 15, 2022
14 14 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Mon 08/15 6:30 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction1 Complaint, ( Responses due by 8/29/2022) by AquaGen Engineering Services, Inc., Beaver Ecoworks, LLC, Linda Bisbee, Sanjeev Jakhete, Shalini Jakhete, Jamil Mikati.(Bradley, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits
13 13 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 08/15 3:05 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE AND SETTING TRIAL DATE: ( Jury Trial set for 5/8/2023 09:00 AM in Fort Pierce Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 5/3/2023 01:15 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard for Settlement. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 8/15/2022. See attached document for full details. (swr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 04, 2022
11 11 motion Extension of Time Thu 08/04 11:29 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time time to respond re1 Complaint, by AquaGen Engineering Services, Inc., Beaver Ecoworks, LLC, Linda Bisbee, Sanjeev Jakhete, Shalini Jakhete, Jamil Mikati. Responses due by 8/18/2022(Bradley, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 08/04 11:44 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting11 Defendants' Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is August 5, 2022. (DE 7 ). Defendants seek a second extension of this deadline, citing that the pleadings in a related case, which have not yet been submitted, will be relevant and referenced in their response. Based on the representations contained in Defendants' Motion, I find good cause to grant the relief requested. Accordingly, Defendants' deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to August 16, 2022 . Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 8/4/2022. (jnk)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Set/Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline Thu 08/04 12:05 PM
Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline: AquaGen Engineering Services, Inc. response/answer due 8/16/2022; Beaver Ecoworks, LLC response/answer due 8/16/2022; Linda Bisbee response/answer due 8/16/2022; Sanjeev Jakhete response/answer due 8/16/2022; Shalini Jakhete response/answer due 8/16/2022; Jamil Mikati response/answer due 8/16/2022. PER DE# 12 (cds)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 01, 2022
10 10 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 08/01 4:00 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Beaver Ecoworks, LLC (Bradley, John)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 08/01 3:58 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by AquaGen Engineering Services, Inc. (Bradley, John)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 08/01 11:22 AM
Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aqua Pulsar, LLC (Mullins, Edward)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 19, 2022
notice Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney Tue 07/19 10:08 AM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re5 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Complaint re1 Complaint,. Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected ; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Tue 07/19 12:23 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting5 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' deadline to respond to the Complaint is July 22, 2022. They seek an extension of this deadline until August 5, 2022, citing that their response will depend on Plaintiff's response to Defendant Sanjeev Jakhete's Complaint in a related action, Case No. 22-cv-14158-KMM. Because the relief requested is brief and unopposed, I find good cause to grant the Motion. Accordingly, Defendants' deadline to respond to the Complaint is extended to August 5, 2022 . Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 7/19/2022. (jnk)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 18, 2022
5 5 motion Extension of Time Mon 07/18 6:35 PM
Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Complaint re1 Complaint, by AquaGen Engineering Services, Inc., Beaver Ecoworks, LLC, Linda Bisbee, Sanjeev Jakhete, Shalini Jakhete, Jamil Mikati. Attorney John Francis Bradley added to party AquaGen Engineering Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney John Francis Bradley added to party Beaver Ecoworks, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney John Francis Bradley added to party Linda Bisbee(pty:dft), Attorney John Francis Bradley added to party Sanjeev Jakhete(pty:dft), Attorney John Francis Bradley added to party Shalini Jakhete(pty:dft), Attorney John Francis Bradley added to party Jamil Mikati(pty:dft). Responses due by 8/1/2022(Bradley, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, June 30, 2022
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 06/30 10:04 AM
Summons Issued as to AquaGen Engineering Services, Inc., Beaver Ecoworks, LLC, Linda Bisbee, Sanjeev Jakhete, Shalini Jakhete, Jamil Mikati. (swr)
Related: [-]
3 3 29 pgs misc Form AO 120/121 Thu 06/30 10:00 AM
FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (swr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 29, 2022
1 1 28 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 06/29 4:21 PM
COMPLAINT for Damages against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15754745, filed by Aqua Pulsar, LLC.(Mullins, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s) Beaver Ecoworks, LLC,
Att: 3 Summon(s) Sanjeev Jakhete,
Att: 4 Summon(s) Shalini Jakhete,
Att: 5 Summon(s) Linda Bisbee,
Att: 6 Summon(s) Jamil Mikati,
Att: 7 Summon(s) Aquagen Engineering Services, Inc.
order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Thu 06/30 9:28 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (swr)
Related: [-]