Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Linda V Parker
Referred: Kimberly G Altman
Case #: 2:22-cv-11468
Nature of Suit950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Jun 29, 2022
Terminated:Nov 30, 2022
Last checked: Monday Dec 26, 2022 4:24 AM EST
Defendant
Andrew Meisner
Represented By
John R. Fleming
Giarmarco, Mullins & Horton, PC
contact info
William H. Horton
Giarmarco, Mullins & Horton, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Oakland County
Represented By
John R. Fleming
Giarmarco, Mullins & Horton, PC
contact info
William H. Horton
Giarmarco, Mullins & Horton, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Dover Glen Condominium Association
Represented By
Jason J. Thompson
Sommers Schwartz, P.C.
contact info

GPO Nov 30 2022
OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S 16 MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (AFla)

Docket last updated: 74 minutes ago
Wednesday, November 30, 2022
17 17 13 pgs order Memorandum Opinion & Order Wed 11/30 9:10 AM
OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S16 MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (AFla)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 22, 2022
16 16 motion Motion - Free Tue 11/22 10:03 AM
MOTION Final Approval of the Class Action Settlement, Enhancement Awards to Class Representative and Attorneys' Fees and Costs by Dover Glen Condominium Association. (Thompson, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Amy Lechner, Simpluris
minutes Miscellaneous Hearing Tue 11/22 2:22 PM
Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before District Judge Linda V. Parker: Fairness Hearing held on 11/22/2022 Re: Notice to Appear. Disposition: Motion Taken Under Advisement (Court Reporter: Shacara Mapp) (AFla)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 18, 2022
notice Appear* Tue 10/18 4:12 PM
NOTICE TO APPEAR IN PERSON: Fairness Hearing RESET for 11/22/2022 02:00 PM before District Judge Linda V. Parker . (AFla)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 30, 2022
15 15 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 09/30 10:02 AM
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS'10 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF: (1) PROPOSED CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT, (2) NOTICE AND NOTICE PLAN, AND (3) ATTORNEYS' FEES AND EXPENSE AWARD ( Fairness Hearing set for 11/16/2022 10:00 AM before District Judge Linda V. Parker ). Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (AFla)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
minutes Motion Hearing Wed 09/28 10:47 AM
Minute Entry for virtual proceedings before District Judge Linda V. Parker: Motion Hearing held on 9/28/2022 re10 MOTION Approval of Settlement Plaintiffs' Motion and Memorandum of Law in Support of Preliminary Approval of Proposed Class Action Settlement, Notice and Notice Plan, and Attorney Fee and Expense Award filed by Dover Glen Condominium Association Disposition: Motion taken under advisement (Court Reporter: Timothy Floury) (AFla)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 14, 2022
14 14 notice Hearing on Motion* Wed 09/14 9:27 AM
NOTICE OF VIDEO CONFERENCE HEARING on10 MOTION Approval of Settlement Plaintiffs' Motion and Memorandum of Law in Support of Preliminary Approval of Proposed Class Action Settlement, Notice and Notice Plan, and Attorney Fee and Expense Award . Motion Hearing set for 9/28/2022 10:00 AM before District Judge Linda V. Parker . |Zoom Webinar Information: https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1603752077?pwd=U1djZnU1T21rYTBXK3hIcng1bFc3Zz09 Passcode: 910360 Or One tap mobile : US: +16692545252,,1603752077# or +16468287666,,1603752077#| (AFla)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 06, 2022
notice Text-Only Notice of Hearing Cancelled Tue 09/06 11:03 AM
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Hearing on 9/6/2022 is Cancelled re13 Notice of Hearing on Motion,, (AFla)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 31, 2022
13 13 notice Hearing on Motion* Wed 08/31 2:31 PM
NOTICE OF VIDEO CONFERENCE HEARING on10 MOTION Approval of Settlement Plaintiffs' Motion and Memorandum of Law in Support of Preliminary Approval of Proposed Class Action Settlement, Notice and Notice Plan, and Attorney Fee and Expense Award . Motion Hearing set for 9/6/2022 11:00 AM before District Judge Linda V. Parker . |Zoom Webinar Information: https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1608607884?pwd=TndJUXBEK1BKNlhlcUQvbjliQnprdz09 Passcode: 682583 Or One tap mobile : US: +16692545252,,1608607884# or +16468287666,,1608607884#| (AFla)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 29, 2022
notice Text-Only Notice of Hearing Cancelled Mon 08/29 12:13 PM
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Motion Hearing on 8/29/2022 is Cancelled re12 Notice of Hearing on Motion,, (AFla)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 23, 2022
12 12 notice Hearing on Motion* Tue 08/23 10:03 AM
NOTICE OF VIDEO CONFERENCE HEARING on10 MOTION Approval of Settlement Plaintiffs' Motion and Memorandum of Law in Support of Preliminary Approval of Proposed Class Action Settlement, Notice and Notice Plan, and Attorney Fee and Expense Award . Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2022 02:00 PM before District Judge Linda V. Parker . |Zoom Webinar Information: https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1604861255?pwd=Y0hDajRHNml3WWNGT210d0JOZkUrdz09 Passcode: 954722 Or One tap mobile : US: +16692545252,,1604861255# or +16468287666,,1604861255#| (AFla)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 17, 2022
11 11 service Certificate of Service Wed 08/17 1:00 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re10 MOTION Approval of Settlement Plaintiffs' Motion and Memorandum of Law in Support of Preliminary Approval of Proposed Class Action Settlement, Notice and Notice Plan, and Attorney Fee and Expense Award by Andrew Meisner, Oakland County (Horton, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 12, 2022
10 10 motion Motion - Free Tue 07/12 3:59 PM
MOTION Approval of Settlement Plaintiffs' Motion and Memorandum of Law in Support of Preliminary Approval of Proposed Class Action Settlement, Notice and Notice Plan, and Attorney Fee and Expense Award by Dover Glen Condominium Association. (Thompson, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Stipulation of Settlement,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Jason J. Thompson
Monday, July 11, 2022
9 9 order Reassignment/Disqualification Mon 07/11 4:20 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds and Magistrate Judge Jonathan J.C. Grey to District Judge Linda V. Parker and Magistrate Judge Kimberly G. Altman. (SSch)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Appearance Mon 07/11 11:02 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Fleming on behalf of Andrew Meisner, Oakland County. (Fleming, John)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Appearance Mon 07/11 11:00 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by William H. Horton on behalf of Andrew Meisner, Oakland County. (Horton, William)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed - 60 Day Mon 07/11 10:38 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Andrew Meisner waiver sent on 7/11/2022, answer due 9/9/2022; Oakland County waiver sent on 7/11/2022, answer due 9/9/2022. (Horton, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 08, 2022
5 5 notice Notice - Other Fri 07/08 7:53 AM
NOTICE by Dover Glen Condominium Association Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Andrew Meisner Only (Thompson, Jason)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 30, 2022
4 4 misc Errata Sheet Thu 06/30 3:54 PM
ERRATA Sheet re:1 Complaint,, filed by Dover Glen Condominium Association. by Dover Glen Condominium Association Amended Civil Cover Sheet (Thompson, Jason)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued* Thu 06/30 2:38 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *Oakland County* (DAll)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued* Thu 06/30 2:37 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *Andrew Meisner* (DAll)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Thu 06/30 2:40 PM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (DAll)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 29, 2022
1 1 cmp Civil Case - Complaint Wed 06/29 5:30 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Dover Glen Condominium Association against Andrew Meisner, Oakland County. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8963652 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland County - County Where Action Arose: Oakland County - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland County. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): US District Court Eastern District of Michigan, 4:14-cv-13958, Judge Terrance Berg ] (Thompson, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Notice of Lien