Alabama Southern District Court
Judge:Kristi K Dubose
Referred: P Bradley Murray
Case #: 1:22-cv-00255
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jun 29, 2022
Terminated:Dec 13, 2022
Last checked: Monday Dec 26, 2022 2:34 AM CST
Defendant
Maurice Kirk Harless
Represented By
Cecily L. Kaffer
The Kullman Firm, PLC
contact info
Defendant
The City of Satsuma, Alabama
Represented By
David F. Walker
Galloway, Wettermark & Rutens, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Reginald Johnson
11627 Idlebrook Dr.
Houston, TX 77070

GPO Oct 25 2022
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. It is RECOMMENDED that 1) Plaintiff be ENJOINED from pursuing the instant complaint against Harless and/or MKH Properties in this Court or any other forum and that the instant complaint against Maurice Kirk Harless (doc. 1) be DISMISSED, and Defendant Maurice Kirk Harless's Rule 12(b)(5) Motion to Dismiss for Insufficient Service be GRANTED; 2) the motion to dismiss filed by the City of Satsuma be GRANTED and that Plaintiff's complaint against the City of Satsuma (doc. 1) be DISMISSED with prejudice; 3) Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate Judgment for Fraud on the Court Under Rule 60(d)(3) in the United States District Court (doc. 5) be DENIED; 4) Plaintiff's Motion for Equal Protection of the Law (doc. 16) be DENIED; 5) Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint for a More Definite Statement as Motioned for in the Defendant's Response to the Court (doc. 18) be DENIED as futile; and 6) Plaintiff's Motion for a Default Judgment (doc. 21) be DENIED. Copy to Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 10/25/2022. (meh)
GPO Dec 13 2022
ORDER ADOPTING 24 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. It is ORDERED that 1) Plaintiff is ENJOINED from pursuing the instant complaint against Harless and/or MKH Properties in this Court or any other forum and that the instant complaint against Maurice Kirk Harless (doc. 1) is DISMISSED with prejudice; 2) the motion to dismiss filed by the City of Satsuma is GRANTED and that Plaintiff's complaint against the City of Satsuma (doc. 1) is DISMISSED with prejudice; 3) Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate Judgment for Fraud on the Court Under Rule 60(d)(3) in the United States District Court (doc. 5) is DENIED; 4) Plaintiff's Motion for Equal Protection of the Law (doc. 16) is DENIED; 5) Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint for a More Definite Statement as Motioned for in the Defendant's Response to the Court (doc. 18) is DENIED as futile; and 6) Plaintiff's Motion for a Default Judgment (doc. 21) is DENIED. Copy to Plaintiff. Signed by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 12/13/2022. (meh)
GPO Dec 13 2022
JUDGMENT - It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that: the Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice; and the Plaintiff is ENJOINED from Pursuing the claims set forth in the instant complaint against Maurice Kirk Harless and/or MKH Properties in this Court or any other forum. Signed by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 12/13/2022. (meh)

Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
37 37 appeal USCA Mandate Tue 01/28 1:17 PM
MANDATE of USCA re:28 Notice of Appeal filed by Reginald Johnson. Mandate issued 1/28/2025; USCA Case Number 23-11481 (jmr)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
36 36 appeal USCA Order Mon 12/30 2:17 PM
JUDGMENT of USCA as to28 Notice of Appeal filed by Reginald Johnson. AFFIRMED. USCA Case No: 23-11481 (Mandate to issue at a later date). (jmr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
35 35 appeal USCA Order Thu 04/04 8:40 AM
ORDER of USCA as to28 Notice of Appeal filed by Appellant Reginald Johnson is hereby GRANTED. USCA Case Number 23-11481 (jmr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
34 34 appeal USCA Mandate Wed 10/25 1:25 PM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF DISMISSAL issued as MANDATE of USCA re:28 Notice of Appeal filed by Reginald Johnson. Appeal dismissed for want of prosecution. Mandate issued 10/25/2023; USCA Case Number 23-11481 (cjr)
Related: [-]
appeal Electronic Availability of ROA Wed 10/25 1:19 PM
Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 11(c), the Clerk of the District Court for the Southern District of Alabama certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal re:28 Notice of Appeal, Appeal No. 23-11481 The entire record on appeal is available electronically. (cjr)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 28, 2023
33 33 appeal Transcript Information Form Mon 08/28 4:32 PM
TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM filed by Reginald Johnson re:28 Notice of Appeal. Requesting transcripts for proceedings as follows: No transcript is required for appeal purposes. (cjr)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 31, 2023
32 32 appeal USCA Appeal Fees Mon 07/31 12:35 PM
USCA Appeal Fees received $505 receipt number 1062840 re28 Notice of Appeal filed by Reginald Johnson; USCA Case Number 23-11481 (cjr)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 07, 2023
31 31 order Order Fri 07/07 3:07 PM
ORDER: It is ORDERED that27 Objection is STRICKEN as untimely per the Order and Judgment25 26 which issued on 12/13/22. Signed by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 7/7/23. (gcp)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 05, 2023
30 30 appeal USCA Notice of Docketing ROA Fri 05/05 4:24 PM
NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re28 Notice of Appeal filed by Reginald Johnson. USCA Case Number 23-11481 (cjr)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 01, 2023
29 29 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Mon 05/01 12:13 PM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re:28 Notice of Appeal. No other appeals. Judge Appealed: Kristi K. DuBose. Fee not paid. (Transcript Information Form mailed to Appellant) (cjr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 27, 2023
28 28 appeal Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment Mon 05/01 12:09 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to25 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations,26 Judgment, by Reginald Johnson. (cjr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 03, 2023
27 27 respm Objection Tue 01/03 4:12 PM
Objection re:25 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations and26 Judgment filed by Reginald Johnson. (meh)
Related: [-]
utility Document Referred Tue 01/03 4:15 PM
REFERRAL OF27 Objection to Judge DuBose. (meh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 13, 2022
26 26 order Judgment Tue 12/13 11:04 AM
JUDGMENT - It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that: the Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice; and the Plaintiff is ENJOINED from Pursuing the claims set forth in the instant complaint against Maurice Kirk Harless and/or MKH Properties in this Court or any other forum. Signed by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 12/13/2022. (meh)
Related: [-]
25 25 1 pgs order Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Tue 12/13 10:58 AM
ORDER ADOPTING24 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. It is ORDERED that 1) Plaintiff is ENJOINED from pursuing the instant complaint against Harless and/or MKH Properties in this Court or any other forum and that the instant complaint against Maurice Kirk Harless (doc.1 ) is DISMISSED with prejudice; 2) the motion to dismiss filed by the City of Satsuma is GRANTED and that Plaintiff's complaint against the City of Satsuma (doc.1 ) is DISMISSED with prejudice; 3) Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate Judgment for Fraud on the Court Under Rule 60(d)(3) in the United States District Court (doc.5 ) is DENIED; 4) Plaintiff's Motion for Equal Protection of the Law (doc.16 ) is DENIED; 5) Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint for a More Definite Statement as Motioned for in the Defendant's Response to the Court (doc.18 ) is DENIED as futile; and 6) Plaintiff's Motion for a Default Judgment (doc.21 ) is DENIED. Copy to Plaintiff. Signed by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 12/13/2022. (meh)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 21, 2022
utility Motions Referred Mon 11/21 11:59 AM
MOTIONS REFERRED:24 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re18 MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Reginald Johnson. Referred to Judge DuBose. (meh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 25, 2022
24 24 motion Report and Recommendations Tue 10/25 2:30 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. It is RECOMMENDED that 1) Plaintiff be ENJOINED from pursuing the instant complaint against Harless and/or MKH Properties in this Court or any other forum and that the instant complaint against Maurice Kirk Harless (doc.1 ) be DISMISSED, and Defendant Maurice Kirk Harless's Rule 12(b)(5) Motion to Dismiss for Insufficient Service be GRANTED; 2) the motion to dismiss filed by the City of Satsuma be GRANTED and that Plaintiff's complaint against the City of Satsuma (doc.1 ) be DISMISSED with prejudice; 3) Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate Judgment for Fraud on the Court Under Rule 60(d)(3) in the United States District Court (doc.5 ) be DENIED; 4) Plaintiff's Motion for Equal Protection of the Law (doc.16 ) be DENIED; 5) Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint for a More Definite Statement as Motioned for in the Defendant's Response to the Court (doc.18 ) be DENIED as futile; and 6) Plaintiff's Motion for a Default Judgment (doc.21 ) be DENIED. Copy to Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 10/25/2022. (meh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 11, 2022
23 23 respm Response Tue 10/11 4:46 PM
RESPONSE to22 Response to Motion filed by Reginald Johnson. Referred to MJ Murray. (meh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 22, 2022
utility Document Referred Thu 09/22 8:53 AM
REFERRAL OF22 Response to Motion to Judge Murray. (meh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 21, 2022
22 22 respm Response to Motion Wed 09/21 5:15 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re:21 MOTION for Default Judgment as to filed by Maurice Kirk Harless. (Kaffer, Cecily)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 20, 2022
21 21 motion Default Judgment Tue 09/20 2:02 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Maurice Kirk Harless and MKH Properties filed by Reginald Johnson.Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (meh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Exhibits
Monday, August 29, 2022
utility Motions Referred Mon 08/29 10:17 AM
MOTIONS REFERRED:18 MOTION to Amend Complaint now referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (meh)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 26, 2022
20 20 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 08/26 4:00 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion9 filed by Maurice Kirk Harless. (Kaffer, Cecily)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit B
utility Document Referred Fri 08/26 4:50 PM
REFERRAL OF20 Reply to Response to Motion to Judge Murray. (meh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 23, 2022
utility Motions Referred Tue 08/23 4:06 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED:18 MOTION to Amend Complaint to Judge DuBose. (meh)
Related: [-]
utility Document Referred Tue 08/23 4:09 PM
REFERRAL OF3 MOTION to Dismiss and/or MOTION for More Definite Statement to Judge Murray. (meh)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 22, 2022
19 19 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 08/23 4:08 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re3 MOTION to Dismiss and/or MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Reginald Johnson. (meh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
18 18 motion Amend Complaint Tue 08/23 4:05 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend Complaint for a More Definite Statement as Motioned for in the Defendant's Response to the Court filed by Reginald Johnson. (meh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 18, 2022
17 17 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 08/19 12:23 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Reginald Johnson. Referred to MJ Murray. (meh) (meh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (8/19/2022) Exhibit
16 16 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 08/18 4:37 PM
MOTION for Equal Protection of the Law filed by Maurice Kirk Harless. Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (meh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Thursday, August 11, 2022
15 15 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 08/11 2:58 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion3 to Dismiss or For More Definite Statement filed by The City of Satsuma, Alabama. (Walker, David)
Related: [-]
14 14 respm Response to Motion Thu 08/11 2:56 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re:5 MOTION to Vacate Judgment filed by The City of Satsuma, Alabama. (Walker, David)
Related: [-]
utility Document Referred Thu 08/11 3:26 PM
REFERRAL OF14 Response to Motion to Vacate Judgment,15 Reply to Response to Motion to Dismiss to Judge Murray. (nah)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 10, 2022
13 13 service Certificate of Service Wed 08/10 5:20 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Maurice Kirk Harless re12 Brief,9 MOTION to Dismiss (Kaffer, Cecily)
Related: [-]
utility Document Referred Wed 08/10 8:11 AM
REFERRAL OF12 Brief to Judge Murray. (nah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 09, 2022
12 12 respm Brief Tue 08/09 5:22 PM
Brief filed by Maurice Kirk Harless re9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Maurice Kirk Harless. (Kaffer, Cecily)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Monday, August 08, 2022
utility Motions Referred Mon 08/08 10:17 AM
MOTIONS REFERRED:9 MOTION to Dismiss - Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (nah)
Related: [-]
order Order Mon 08/08 1:29 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER: On August 2, 2022, Plaintiff Reginald Johnson filed a Motion to Vacate Judgment for Fraud on the Court Under Rule 60(d)(3) in United States District Court. (Doc. 5). Defendant's response to this motion is due on or before August 16, 2022, and Plaintiff's reply, if any, is due on or before August 23, 2022, at which time the Court will take the motion under submission. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 8/8/22. (lto)
Related: [-]
order Order Mon 08/08 1:34 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER: On August 5, 2022, Defendant Maurice Kirk Harless filed a Rule 12(b)(5) Motion to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process. (Doc. 9). Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a response to Defendant's motion on or before August 19, 2022. Defendant is ORDERED to file its reply, if any, on or before August 26, 2022, at which time the Court will take the motion under submission. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 8/8/22. (lto)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 05, 2022
9 9 motion Dismiss Fri 08/05 7:44 PM
MOTION to Dismiss filed by Maurice Kirk Harless. (Kaffer, Cecily)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 08/05 7:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Cecily L. Kaffer on behalf of Maurice Kirk Harless (Kaffer, Cecily)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 08/05 4:39 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Reginald Johnson. Maurice Kirk Harless served on 7/15/2022, answer due 8/5/2022 (meh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 02, 2022
6 6 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 08/02 4:43 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re3 MOTION to Dismiss and/or MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Reginald Johnson. Referred to MJ Murray (meh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits
5 5 motion Vacate Tue 08/02 4:33 PM
MOTION to Vacate Judgment for Fraud on the Court under Rule 60(d)(3) in the United States District Court filed by Reginald Johnson. Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (meh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits
Thursday, July 28, 2022
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 07/28 4:52 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Reginald Johnson. The City of Satsuma, Alabama served on 7/13/2022, answer due 8/3/2022 (meh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Tracking History
Monday, July 18, 2022
3 3 motion Dismiss More Definite Statement Mon 07/18 11:52 AM
MOTION to Dismiss and/or , MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by The City of Satsuma, Alabama. (Walker, David)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Mon 07/18 4:18 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED:3 MOTION to Dismiss and/or MOTION for More Definite Statement Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (meh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 07, 2022
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 07/07 12:39 PM
Summons Issued as to Maurice Kirk Harless, The City of Satsuma, Alabama at Intake. (meh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 29, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 06/30 10:56 AM
COMPLAINT against The City of Satsuma, Alabama and Maurice Kirk Harless filed by Reginald Johnson. Fee paid at Intake, $402.00, Receipt number 1060545. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 9/27/2022. (meh)
Related: [-]