Louisiana Western District Court
Judge:Robert R Summerhays
Referred: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Case #: 1:22-cv-01794
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act
Case Filed:Jun 15, 2022
Terminated:Oct 12, 2022
Case in other court:Severed from USDC/WDLA, 1:22-cv-1588
Last checked: Thursday Jun 30, 2022 10:05 PM CDT
Defendant
Warden Federal Correctional Institute Pollock Medium
Defendant
Federal Correctional Institution Pollock
Plaintiff
Michael Rosas
27433-078 F C I - Pollock Medium P O Box 4050
Pollock, LA 71467


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, October 12, 2022
8 8 order Sec P - Order to Strike Case Wed 10/12 11:24 AM
MEMORANDUM ORDER to strike complaint for failure to submit complaint on approved form and pay the filing fee or submit IFP application. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 10/11/2022. (crt,Devillier, W)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 23, 2022
7 7 order Minute Entry/Order Reassigning Case Sun 09/25 8:52 PM
ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY issued by the Clerk. Case reassigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays. Judge Elizabeth E Foote no longer assigned to case. All future filings should bear the name of the new judge assignment. Approved by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 9/23/2022. (crt,Whidden, C)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 23, 2022
6 6 motion Appoint Counsel Wed 06/29 1:00 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Set ripe date and refer motion once deficiency is corrected.)(crt,Haik, K)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Wednesday, June 15, 2022
5 5 ORDER TO SEVER: IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of Court SEVER the putative Plaintiffs from this proceeding. The Clerk of Court is further instructed to open a new proceeding for each putative Plaintiff and mail each an application to proceed in forma pauperis and a Bivens Complaint form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 6/15/2022. (crt,Haik, K)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit documents on approved forms.Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. ( Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 7/15/2022). Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 6/15/2022.(crt,Taylor, L)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Bivens form,
Att: 2 In Forma Pauperis form
Tuesday, June 14, 2022
3 3 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 6/14/2022. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 10, 2022
2 2 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/10/2022. (crt,Devillier, W)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 06, 2022
1 1 DEFICIENT COMPLAINT against Warden Federal Correctional Institute Pollock Medium, Federal Correctional Institution Pollock filed by Luis Alvarado Ibarra, Alan Vasquez Bazet, William Ray, Mardiveial Alanis, Osniel Munoz Foances, Morales HPZ, Perez Xajil Pablo, Carlos Hernandez, jose ceballos, V Jose Calleja, Jose Ortiz, Luis Pimentel, Samuel Roy Abram, Javier Silerio Cardenas, Genavo Sen Chan, Luis Torres, Osvaldo Armenta, Jorge Guz, Pablo Rivera Martinez, Ricard Gutierrez, Abel Sanchez, Johnathan Herrera, Clifford Poque, Wiford Ortiz, Eric Cheek, Javier Mendez, Larry Moore, David Diaz Laredo, Luis Degante, Baldenar Guadiana, Johnny Cedevo, Abdiel Dejesus, Luis A Suavez, Pastol Poueriet, Bentley Jenkins, Keith Chapman, Ishias HC, Sixto Villegegas, Jeremy Farley, Sherwin Birkett, Marshall Lane, Yuniel Sanchez, James Hill, Jaun Frausto, Wil Gomez, Jorge Alonzo, Eduardo Banegas Ortiz, Juan Valencia, Jon Athan Mendez, Jaron Calderon, Robson Morales, Josue Gonzalez, Alex Vasquez Londono, Mario Ovledo, Adria Rentena, Arthur Chapell, Jesus Hernandez Herrera, Sergio Medina, Mercede CA, Juarez Jesus, Darvin Lopez, Jose Ramirez, Echeverria Elias, Bairo Cardona Perez, Solis Silvster, Walter Carroll, Michael Rosas, Villobalbo Solorzana, Vallinas Cruz Juan, Daniel Ascencio, Jose Barajas, Villegas Alcantar Isreal, Juan Cabral, Salvador Hernandez.(crt,Lemoine, N). Complaint not on approved form.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet,
Att: 2 Envelope
1 1 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Samuel Roy Abram, Mardiveial Alanis, Jorge Alonzo, Osvaldo Armenta, Daniel Ascencio, Jose Barajas, Alan Vasquez Bazet, Sherwin Birkett, Mercede CA, Juan Cabral, Jaron Calderon, V Jose Calleja, Javier Silerio Cardenas, Walter Carroll, Johnny Cedevo, Genavo Sen Chan, Arthur Chapell, Keith Chapman, Eric Cheek, Luis Degante, Abdiel Dejesus, Echeverria Elias, Jeremy Farley, Osniel Munoz Foances, Jaun Frausto, Wil Gomez, Josue Gonzalez, Baldenar Guadiana, Ricard Gutierrez, Jorge Guz, Ishias HC, Morales HPZ, Carlos Hernandez, Salvador Hernandez, Jesus Hernandez Herrera, Johnathan Herrera, James Hill, Luis Alvarado Ibarra, Villegas Alcantar Isreal, Bentley Jenkins, Juarez Jesus, Vallinas Cruz Juan, Marshall Lane, David Diaz Laredo, Alex Vasquez Londono, Darvin Lopez, Pablo Rivera Martinez, Sergio Medina, Javier Mendez, Jon Athan Mendez, Larry Moore, Robson Morales, Eduardo Banegas Ortiz, Jose Ortiz, Wiford Ortiz, Mario Ovledo, Perez Xajil Pablo, Bairo Cardona Perez, Luis Pimentel, Clifford Poque, Pastol Poueriet, Jose Ramirez, William Ray, Adria Rentena, Michael Rosas, Abel Sanchez, Yuniel Sanchez, Solis Silvster, Villobalbo Solorzana, Luis A Suavez, Luis Torres, Juan Valencia, Sixto Villegegas, jose ceballos. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/6/2022. (crt,Lemoine, N). Added MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on 6/10/2022 (Devillier, W).
Related: [-]
CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Devillier, W)
Related: [-]