Tennessee Western District Court
Judge:Samuel H Mays, Jr
Referred: Tu M Pham
Case #: 2:22-cv-02420
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jun 28, 2022
Terminated:Jul 01, 2024
Defendant
201 Poplar Ave. Criminal Justice Center second floor med. 38103
Plaintiff
James Lewis Triggs

GPO May 17 2024
ORDER Dismissing the Consolidated Complaint Without Prejudice, Denying Motion to Appoint Counsel, and Granting Leave to Amend. Signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on May 17, 2024. (Mays, Samuel)

Docket last updated: 61 minutes ago
Monday, October 28, 2024
11 11 misc Mail Returned Tue 10/29 9:35 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to James Triggs9 10 . (Jenkins, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
10 10 order Judgment Mon 07/01 4:11 PM
JUDGMENT dismissing the case WITH PREJUDICE in accordance with the Order docketed on 07/01/2024, signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 07/01/2024. (Mays, Samuel)
Related: [-]
9 9 2 pgs order Order Mon 07/01 4:08 PM
ORDER dismissing the case, certifying that an appeal would not be taken in good faith, notifying Triggs of the appellate filing fee, and notifying Triggs of the Courts strike recommendation under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g), signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 07/01/2024. (Mays, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
8 8 9 pgs order Order Fri 05/17 5:05 PM
ORDER Dismissing the Consolidated Complaint Without Prejudice, Denying Motion to Appoint Counsel, and Granting Leave to Amend. Signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on May 17, 2024. (Mays, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
7 7 misc Letter Tue 02/13 10:37 AM
Letter from James Triggs. (mf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 envelope
Thursday, September 14, 2023
6 6 misc Letter Fri 09/15 10:31 AM
Letter from James Tiggs (jae)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 envelope
Friday, July 22, 2022
5 5 misc Attachment Mon 07/25 1:27 PM
ATTACHMENT to1 Pro Se Complaint (Inmate Grievance Forms) by James Lewis Triggs.(btg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 envelope
Wednesday, June 29, 2022
4 4 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 06/29 4:22 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and assessing $350.00 civil filing fee in accordance with PLRA, signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 06/29/2022. (Mays, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 28, 2022
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 06/29 3:06 PM
Pro Se MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by James Lewis Triggs.(csf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Inmate Balance History Report
1 1 cmp Pro Se Complaint Wed 06/29 3:05 PM
PRO SE COMPLAINT for Violation of Civil Rights Under 42 U.S.C. § 1983 filed by James Lewis Triggs against 201 Poplar Ave. Criminal Justice Center second floor med. 38103.(csf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Continuation,
Att: 2 Inmate Grievance Forms,
Att: 3 Envelope,
Att: 4 Judicial Cards
notice Notice LR 16.2 Wed 06/29 3:07 PM
NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Pro Se Prisoner track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf)
Related: [-]