Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-09133
Nature of Suit368 Torts - Personal Injury - Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jun 30, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 27, 2022 3:54 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
JOSEPH M SCOTT
Represented By
JOSEPH SCOTT NABERS
Nabers Law Firm Pllc - Houston Tx
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, July 01, 2022
misc Docket Annotation Fri 07/01 9:59 AM
NOTICE TO FILER re entering case data information at case opening. The correct Nature of Suit is 365 (Personal Inj. Prod. Liability). Clerk will correct all case data information. (jcw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 30, 2022
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 06/30 3:13 PM
COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-7243819.), filed by JOSEPH M. SCOTT. (NABERS, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet