Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Nathaniel M Gorton
Case #: 4:22-cv-40071
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1983 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jun 30, 2022
Re-opened:Oct 25, 2022
Terminated:Jan 27, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 27, 2022 3:38 AM EST
Defendant
David Churchy
Defendant
Ryan Daley
Defendant
Christopher Donais
Defendant
Ashley Jodoin
Defendant
Matthew Niles
Defendant
Mark Smith
Defendant
Town of North Brookfield
Defendant
Jeffery Martin
Plaintiff
David Allen Blankenship
80 Grove Street
North Brookfield, MA 01535

GPO Oct 21 2022
Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered granting 11 Motion to Reinstate Case on Docket. The Clerk shall reopen this action and issue summonses. Plaintiff is responsible for arranging service of the summons and complaint on each defendant in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and Local Rule 4.1. Rule 4 states that [a] summons must be served with a copy of the complaint by [a]ny person who is at least 18 years old and not a party[.] Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c). Rule 4(d) provides an alternative to serving the defendant with the summons and complaint by offering defendants the option to waive service of the summons. Plaintiff shall have 90 days from the date summonses issue to serve the defendants. Failure to timely serve a defendant will subject this action to dismissal against that defendant without prejudice. (PSSA, 4)

Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, January 27, 2023
16 16 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 01/27 3:25 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by David Allen Blankenship (Warnock, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 25, 2022
15 15 service Summons Issued Tue 10/25 12:11 PM
Summons Issued as to David Churchy, Ryan Daley, Christopher Donais, Ashley Jodoin, Jeffery Martin, Matthew Niles, Mark Smith, Town of North Brookfield. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Warnock, Douglas)
Related: [-]
14 14 utility Case Reopened Tue 10/25 8:36 AM
Case Reopened per [Dkt. 13]. (Deslauriers, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 21, 2022
13 13 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Reopen Case Mon 10/24 11:56 AM
Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered granting11 Motion to Reinstate Case on Docket. The Clerk shall reopen this action and issue summonses. Plaintiff is responsible for arranging service of the summons and complaint on each defendant in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and Local Rule 4.1. Rule 4 states that [a] summons must be served with a copy of the complaint by [a]ny person who is at least 18 years old and not a party[.] Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c). Rule 4(d) provides an alternative to serving the defendant with the summons and complaint by offering defendants the option to waive service of the summons. Plaintiff shall have 90 days from the date summonses issue to serve the defendants. Failure to timely serve a defendant will subject this action to dismissal against that defendant without prejudice. (PSSA, 4)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 26, 2022
misc Filing Fee/Payment Received Fri 08/26 3:14 PM
Filing fee/payment: $ 402.00, receipt number 100000071 for1 Complaint (Phillips, Sophie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 18, 2022
11 11 motion Reopen Case Thu 08/18 4:47 PM
MOTION to Reinstate Case on Docket by David Allen Blankenship. (Kelly, Danielle)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 11, 2022
10 10 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 08/11 5:05 PM
Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE(PSSA, 4)
Related: [-]
9 9 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 08/11 5:05 PM
Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered that: 1.Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Docket No. 8) is DENIED without prejudice. 2.For failure to comply with the Court's July 7, 2022 Order, this case is DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). 3.Plaintiff may reopen this case by (1) either paying the $402.00 filing or filing a renewed application in accordance with the Courts July 7, 2022 Order, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order; and (2) filing a motion to reopen the case. 4.The Clerk shall enter a separate order of dismissal.(PSSA, 4)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 22, 2022
8 8 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 07/22 5:05 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by David Allen Blankenship. (Warnock, Douglas)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice - Other Fri 07/22 5:02 PM
NOTICE by David Allen Blankenship (Warnock, Douglas)
Related: [-]
6 6 utility Remark Fri 07/22 5:00 PM
Regarding My Claim by David Blankenship (Warnock, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 07, 2022
5 5 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 07/07 11:17 AM
Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered denying without prejudice3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If plaintiff wishes to proceed with this action, he must, within 21 days from the date of this Order either pay the filing fee or file a renewed application to proceed in district court without prepaying fees or costs and any other document or written information he deems to be relevant. Failure to comply with this directive within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order will result in dismissal of this action. (PSSA, 4)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 30, 2022
4 4 motion Stay Thu 06/30 4:26 PM
MOTION to Stay by David Allen Blankenship.(Burgos, Sandra)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 06/30 4:26 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by David Allen Blankenship.(Burgos, Sandra)
Related: [-]
2 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Finn, Mary)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 06/30 4:13 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by David Allen Blankenship.(Burgos, Sandra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Statement of Claim,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet and Category Sheet
notice Notice of Case Assignment Thu 06/30 4:25 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Finn, Mary)
Related: [-]