New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Joan M Azrack
Case #: 2:22-cv-03869
Nature of Suit462 Immigration - Naturalization Application
Cause8:1446 Petition for Naturalization Hearing
Case Filed:Jun 30, 2022
Terminated:Aug 23, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 27, 2022 4:05 AM EST
Defendant
Ur M. Jaddou
Director, USCIS, in her official capacity USCIS Office of Chief Counsel 5900 Capital Gateway Drive Mail Stop 2120
Camp Springs, MD 20588
Represented By
Matthew J. Modafferi
Us Attorney'S Office/edny
contact info
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
Washington, DC 20528
Represented By
Matthew J. Modafferi
Us Attorney'S Office/edny
contact info
Defendant
Elizabeth Miller
Director of the Holtsville, New York District Office of USCIS, in her official capacity USCIS 30 Barretts Avenue
Holtsville, NY 11742
Represented By
Matthew J. Modafferi
Us Attorney'S Office/edny
contact info
Defendant
U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS)
Represented By
Matthew J. Modafferi
Us Attorney'S Office/edny
contact info
Plaintiff
Tao Shi
262 Vista Drive
Jericho, NY 11753
Represented By
Aleksander B Milch
The Kasen Law Firm, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Tuesday, August 23, 2022
order Order Dismissing Case Tue 08/23 11:35 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE re9 . Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 8/23/2022. (Posillico, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 22, 2022
9 9 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 08/22 8:07 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Tao Shi (Milch, Aleksander)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 26, 2022
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Immigration/Social Security Cases Tue 07/26 12:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Modafferi on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Modafferi, Matthew)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Tue 07/26 9:44 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tao Shi. Ur M. Jaddou served on 7/20/2022, answer due 9/18/2022; Alejandro Mayorkas served on 7/20/2022, answer due 9/18/2022; Elizabeth Miller served on 7/20/2022, answer due 9/18/2022; U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS) served on 7/20/2022, answer due 9/18/2022. (Milch, Aleksander)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 12, 2022
6 6 service Summons Issued as to USA Tue 07/12 12:51 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Elizabeth Miller, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS), U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Coleman, Laurie)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 11, 2022
5 5 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Mon 07/11 6:20 PM
Proposed Summons. Re2 Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet,1 Complaint, by Tao Shi (Milch, Aleksander)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 01, 2022
4 4 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Fri 07/01 1:01 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Jakubowski, Laura)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Fri 07/01 12:52 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Jakubowski, Laura)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Fri 07/01 11:06 AM
Civil Cover Sheet.. Re1 Complaint,, by Tao Shi (Milch, Aleksander)
Related: [-]
notice Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet Fri 07/01 8:40 AM
Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. A Civil Cover Sheet was not filed; the Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a Civil Cover Sheet. Counsel is directed to submit the Civil Cover Sheet using the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Jakubowski, Laura)
Related: [-]
utility Incorrect Case-Document Information Fri 07/01 12:44 PM
Incorrect Case/Document Entry Information. Deleted Defendant USCIS and added Defendant U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS) to the case to conform to the Complaint. Deleted Document Entry No. 1 (Complaint and Exhibits) and re-entered as against all Defendants. (Jakubowski, Laura)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 07/01 1:00 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Jakubowski, Laura)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 30, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 06/30 5:47 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Tao Shi. (Jakubowski, Laura)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A--Naturalization Application Filing Receipt,
Att: 2 Exhibit B--Naturalization Interview Results,
Att: 3 Exhibit C--Pre-Litigation Letter Sent to USCIS,
Att: 4 Exhibit D--Case Status per USCIS Website,
Att: 5 Exhibit E--Naturalization Application
misc Filing Fee Received Fri 07/01 12:42 PM
FILING FEE: $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15709479 (Jakubowski, Laura)
Related: [-]