Texas Western District Court
Judge:Alan D Albright
Case #: 6:22-cv-00718
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Jun 30, 2022
Terminated:Feb 22, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 27, 2022 3:12 AM CST
Defendant
Everlane, Inc.
Plaintiff
Hitel Technologies LLC
Represented By
Raymond W Mort, III
The Mort Law Firm, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, February 21, 2023
9 9 misc Report on Patent/Trademark (AO-120) Wed 02/22 12:20 PM
Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (bot2)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 24, 2022
8 8 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 10/24 4:26 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Hitel Technologies LLC (Mort, Raymond)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 16, 2022
misc Remark (No Doc#) Sat 09/17 10:19 PM
Parties shall comply with Judge Albright's updated[LINK:standing orders] available by clicking the included hyperlinks. The updated orders are as follows: 1. [LINK:Standing Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases] , 2. [LINK:Amended Standing Order On Pretrial Procedures and Requirements in Civil Cases] . (bot4)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 01, 2022
7 7 motion Stay Thu 09/01 3:32 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Stay All Deadlines & Notice of Settlement by Hitel Technologies LLC.(Mort, Raymond)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, July 11, 2022
6 6 notice Notice Mon 07/11 3:49 PM
NOTICE Extending Deadline to Answer to 9/9/22 by Hitel Technologies LLC (Mort, Raymond)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Answer Deadline Mon 07/11 4:15 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Everlane, Inc. answer due 9/9/2022. (sm3)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 01, 2022
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 07/01 1:57 PM
Summons Issued as to Everlane, Inc.. (sm3)
Related: [-]
misc Remark (No Doc#) Fri 07/01 1:54 PM
All parties shall flatten all documents before e-filing. All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/ (sm3)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 07/01 1:55 PM
Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (sm3)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 30, 2022
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 06/30 4:43 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Hitel Technologies LLC. (Mort, Raymond)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Thu 06/30 4:43 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mort, Raymond)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7) Thu 06/30 4:43 PM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Hitel Technologies LLC. (Mort, Raymond)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 06/30 4:42 PM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-16206328), filed by Hitel Technologies LLC.(Mort, Raymond)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet