New Mexico District Court
Judge:Martha Vazquez
Referred: Steven C Yarbrough
Case #: 1:22-cv-00482
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Jun 30, 2022
Case in other court:Second Judicial District Court, 22cv2396
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 27, 2022 2:07 AM MST
Defendant
Marriott International, Inc.
Represented By
Agnes F. Padilla
Butt Thornton & Baehr, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Johnny Abel Gonzales
Represented By
Sheree D Wright
contact info

GPO Jun 20 2023
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough denying 32 Motion to Extend Expert Disclosure Deadline. (kfo)

Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Thursday, August 31, 2023
49 49 REPLY to Response to Motion re41 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment On All Counts In Plaintiff's Amended Complaint And Supporting Memorandum filed by Marriott International, Inc.. (Padilla, Agnes)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 17, 2023
48 48 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re41 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment On All Counts In Plaintiff's Amended Complaint And Supporting Memorandum filed by Johnny Abel Gonzales. (Wright, Sheree)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9
Wednesday, August 16, 2023
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Plaintiff filed under seal 46 Notice of Errata. Parties seeking to file a document under seal are required to seek leave of Court before doing so. See CM/ECF Adm. Proc. Manual para. 9(h)(1) & (2) (leave of Court required to file documents under seal except under Fed.R.Civ.P. 5.2(F), Fed.R.Crim.P. 49.1, or statute). Within 7 days of this Order, Plaintiff shall request leave of Court to seal this filing, or the Court will unseal it without further notice. (kfo)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 14, 2023
45 45 1 pgs ORDER by District Judge Martha Vazquez GRANTING44 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to41 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment On All Counts In Plaintiff's Amended Complaint And Supporting Memorandum . Responses due by 8/17/2023. (gr)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 11, 2023
44 44 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to41 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment On All Counts In Plaintiff's Amended Complaint And Supporting Memorandum by Johnny Abel Gonzales. (Wright, Sheree)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 08, 2023
43 43 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to41 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment On All Counts In Plaintiff's Amended Complaint And Supporting Memorandum by Johnny Abel Gonzales. (Wright, Sheree)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 07, 2023
42 42 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Marriott International, Inc. re41 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment On All Counts In Plaintiff's Amended Complaint And Supporting Memorandum filed by Marriott International, Inc. (Padilla, Agnes)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 19, 2023
41 41 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment On All Counts In Plaintiff's Amended Complaint And Supporting Memorandum by Marriott International, Inc.. (Padilla, Agnes)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F
40 40 MOTION for Summary Judgment On All Counts In Plaintiff's Amended Complaint And Supporting Memorandum by Marriott International, Inc.. (Padilla, Agnes)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F
Wednesday, July 12, 2023
Reset Deadlines pursuant to39 Order: Pretrial Motions due by 7/19/2023. Pretrial Order due by 8/9/2023. (gr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 11, 2023
39 39 1 pgs ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough granting38 Motion for Extension of Time. Pretrial motions due 7/19/2023. Pretrial order due to Court 8/9/2023. (kfo)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 10, 2023
38 38 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Johnny Abel Gonzales. (Wright, Sheree)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 20, 2023
37 37 5 pgs ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough denying32 Motion to Extend Expert Disclosure Deadline. (kfo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 31, 2023
36 36 NOTICE by Marriott International, Inc. Amended Notice of Agreement Of Extension Of Time To File Motion To Compel (Padilla, Agnes)
Related: [-]
35 35 NOTICE by Marriott International, Inc. Notice Of Agreement Of Extension Of Time To File Motion To Compel (Padilla, Agnes)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 18, 2023
34 34 NOTICE by Marriott International, Inc. Extension of Time To File Motion To Compel (Padilla, Agnes)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 08, 2023
33 33 RESPONSE in Opposition re32 First MOTION to Extend (other) Expert Dislosure Deadline filed by Marriott International, Inc.. (Padilla, Agnes)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 25, 2023
32 32 First MOTION to Extend (other) Expert Dislosure Deadline by Johnny Abel Gonzales. (Wright, Sheree)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1-9
Tuesday, April 11, 2023
31 31 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough: Status Conference held on 4/11/2023. (kfo)
Related: [-]
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. The Court extends the deadlines for non-expert discovery as follows. Termination date for discovery: June 12, 2023. Motions relating to discovery to be filed by: July 3, 2023. Pretrial motions other than discovery motions filed by: July 12, 2023. Plaintiff's deadline to file a motion to extend his Rule 26(a)(2) expert disclosure deadline is April 25, 2023. (kfo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 06, 2023
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/11/2023 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. The parties shall call the AT&T Conference line at (888) 398-2342 [Access Code 2418431] to connect to the proceedings. (kfo)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 27, 2023
28 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marriott International, Inc. Certificate of Service for Defendant's Responses to Plaintiff's First Requests for Production (Padilla, Agnes)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 24, 2023
27 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marriott International, Inc. First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production (Padilla, Agnes)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 26, 2023
26 26 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough: Settlement Conference held on 1/26/2023. Case did not settle. (kfo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 15, 2022
25 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marriott International, Inc. Notice To Take Deposition Of Johnny Gonzales (Padilla, Agnes)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 14, 2022
24 24 7 pgs ANSWER to Complaint First Amended Complaint For Damages For Violation Of Interference With Civil Rights Act Of 1964, Intentional Infliction Of Severe Emotional Distress, Negligent Infliction Of Emotional Distress And Negligence by Marriott International, Inc.. Related document:23 Amended Complaint filed by Johnny Abel Gonzales.(Padilla, Agnes)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 30, 2022
23 23 12 pgs AMENDED COMPLAINT against Johnny Abel Gonzales., filed by Johnny Abel Gonzales. (Wright, Sheree)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 29, 2022
22 22 First MOTION to Amend/Correct 18 Order on Motion for Leave to File,,,,, by Johnny Abel Gonzales. (Wright, Sheree)
Related: [-]
20 20 4 pgs ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Settlement Conference set for 1/26/2023 at 09:00 AM via Zoom before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. (kfo)
Related: [-]
19 19 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough: Status Conference held on 11/29/2022. (kfo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 03, 2022
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough finding as moot16 Motion for Leave to File; granting17 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. If the parties disagree with the Court's finding that Doc.16 is moot, either party may notify the Court within 14 days. Within 14 days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall file [17-2] Amended Complaint separately on the docket. Defendant's answer deadline will run from the date of this separate filing. (kfo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 02, 2022
17 17 First MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Johnny Abel Gonzales. (Wright, Sheree)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion,
Att: 2 Proposed Amended Complaint
Monday, October 17, 2022
16 16 First MOTION for Leave to File by Johnny Abel Gonzales. (Wright, Sheree)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement,
Att: 2 Supplement,
Att: 3 Supplement
Tuesday, October 04, 2022
15 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marriott International, Inc. Rule 1-068 Offer Of Settlement (Padilla, Agnes)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 01, 2022
14 14 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough: Scheduling Conference held on 9/1/2022. (kfo)
Related: [-]
12 12 1 pgs ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. (kfo)
Related: [-]
11 11 2 pgs SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Discovery due by 3/28/2023. Pretrial Motions due by 4/27/2023. Proposed Pretrial Order due to Court by 7/12/2023. (kfo)
Related: [-]
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/29/2022 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. The parties shall call the AT&T Conference line at (888) 398-2342 [Access Code 2418431] to connect to the proceedings. (kfo)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 26, 2022
10 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marriott International, Inc. Initial Disclosures (Padilla, Agnes)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 22, 2022
9 9 Joint Status Report And Provisional Discovery Plan by Marriott International, Inc. (Padilla, Agnes)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 09, 2022
PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Martha Vazquez as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges. Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa no longer assigned to this case. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 18, 2022
7 7 2 pgs INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Joint Status Report due by 8/22/2022. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 9/1/2022 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 8/8/2022. (kfo)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 01, 2022
Filing Fee: $ 402, receipt number ALB052836 (snw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 30, 2022
5 5 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
Related: [-]
4 4 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re1 Notice of Removal Civil Cover Sheet by Marriott International, Inc. (Padilla, Agnes)
Related: [-]
3 3 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re1 Notice of Removal Second Judicial District Court Docket by Marriott International, Inc. (Padilla, Agnes)
Related: [-]
2 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) For Damages For Violation Of Interference With Civil Rights Act of 1964, Intentional Infliction Of Severe Emotional Distress, Negligent Infliction Of Emotional Distress, And Negligence by Marriott International, Inc.. (Padilla, Agnes)
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Marriott International, Inc. from Second Judicial District Court, case number D-202-CV-2022-02396. ( Filing Fee - Deliver Payment), filed by Marriott International, Inc.. (Padilla, Agnes)
Related: [-]
United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (dr)
Related: [-]
PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
Related: [-]