Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-09164
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jun 30, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 27, 2022 4:07 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
ERNEST HERR
Represented By
KYLE CHRISTOPHER USNER
Hair Shunnarah Trial Attorneys - Metairie La
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, March 06, 2023
5 5 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Mon 03/06 1:22 PM
ORDER granting 4 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney DANA A LIZIK for ERNEST HERR. Attorney KYLE CHRISTOPHER USNER terminated. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 3/6/2023. (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 27, 2023
4 4 motion Substitute Attorney Mon 02/27 11:53 AM
Joint MOTION to Substitute Attorney and Withdrawal of Counsel for Plaintiff by ERNEST HERR. (LIZIK, DANA)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/27 11:52 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by DANA A LIZIK on behalf of ERNEST HERR (LIZIK, DANA)
Related: [-]
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Mon 02/27 12:32 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:4 Joint MOTION to Substitute Attorney and Withdrawal of Counsel for Plaintiff (mb)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 01, 2022
misc Docket Annotation Fri 07/01 12:46 PM
NOTICE TO FILER re entering case data information at case opening. The correct Nature of Suit is 365 (Personal Inj. Prod. Liability). Clerk will correct all case data information. (jcw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 30, 2022
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 06/30 4:59 PM
COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-7244913.), filed by ERNEST HERR. (USNER, KYLE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet