Kelsey v. Sherman et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Vincent L Briccetti |
Case #: | 7:22-cv-01934 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 07, 2022 |
Terminated: | Jul 23, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Jul 01, 2022 10:06 PM EDT |
Defendant
Felix Catena
|
|
Defendant
Kathy Hochul
|
|
Defendant
Christopher Sherman
|
|
Plaintiff
Michael N. Kelsey
243 Hibernia Rd.
Salt Point, NY 12578 |
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Friday, May 02, 2025 | ||
65 | 65
![]() MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to64 Notice of Appeal filed by Michael N. Kelsey USCA Case Number 24-2053 Ordered that the appeal is DISMISSED. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 5/2/2025. (tp) |
|
appeal
Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to District Judge
Fri 05/02 2:16 PM
Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to the District Judge re:65 USCA Mandate..(tp) |