Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:Maureen P Kelly
Case #: 2:22-cv-00952
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:12101 The Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Case Filed:Jun 29, 2022
Terminated:Jan 12, 2023
Last checked: Monday Dec 26, 2022 3:54 AM EST
Defendant
VERIZON MARYLAND LLC
Represented By
Katherine J. McLay
Jones Day
contact info
James S. Urban
Jones Day
contact info
Mediator
LOUIS B. KUSHNER
Rothman Gordon 310 Grant Street 3rd Floor
Pittsburgh, PA 15219
Represented By
Louis B. Kushner
Rothman Gordon, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
MOMACH MCGATT
Represented By
David M. Koller
Koller Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, April 28, 2023
21 21 1 pgs order Order Fri 04/28 9:32 AM
ORDER Approving20 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by MOMACH MCGATT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 4/28/2023. (et)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 27, 2023
20 20 misc Stipulation of Dismissal (Atty) Thu 04/27 2:55 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by MOMACH MCGATT. (Koller, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 01, 2023
19 19 order Order Wed 02/01 9:34 AM
ORDER denying without prejudice the Motion for Attorney Jordan Santo to Appear Pro Hac Vice, ECF No. 16, in light of his failure to file a proposed order as directed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 2/1/23. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (Kelly, Maureen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 12, 2023
order Order for Administrative Case Closing Thu 01/12 11:10 AM
ORDER FOR ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING: This action has been resolved and the only matter remaining to be completed is the submission of a stipulation for dismissal. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk mark the above-captioned action CLOSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court expressly retains jurisdiction of this matter to consider any issue arising during the period when such stipulation is being finalized, including but not limited to enforcing any settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 1/12/2023. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (et)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 11, 2023
misc QC - No Proposed Order Attached Wed 01/11 11:17 AM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ERROR: Proposed Order was not attached. CORRECTION: Attorney is advised to file a proposed order by using the Proposed Order event and linking it to the document in question. (kss)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 05, 2023
17 17 adr Report of Mediation Thu 01/05 8:19 AM
REPORT of Mediation: Case has been resolved. LOUIS B. KUSHNER terminated. Attorney Louis B. Kushner terminated. The parties are reminded of their obligation to complete the ADR questionnaire and submit within 5 days of the conclusion of the ADR process. The questionnaire can be accessed [LINK:here] or at www.pawd.uscourts.gov. Click on the ADR icon. Mediation session was held on 1/4/2023. (Kushner, Louis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 03, 2023
16 16 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required) Tue 01/03 9:10 PM
MOTION for attorney Jordan D. Santo to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7468044) by MOMACH MCGATT. (Santo, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support of pro hac vice motion
Tuesday, November 08, 2022
15 15 adr Neutral's Notice of ADR Proceeding Tue 11/08 11:36 AM
Notice of ADR proceeding: The litigants are advised that at the conclusion of the ADR process they must submit a completed questionnaire to the Clerk of Courts. The questionnaire is available on the Court's website at www.pawd.uscourts.gov and click on the ADR icon. Mediation Conference set for 1/4/2023 10:00 AM (Kushner, Louis)
Related: [-]
14 14 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 11/08 10:51 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Amended Pleadings and Joinder of Parties due by 12/8/2022. ADR to be completed by 1/9/2023. Discovery due by 4/7/2023. Post-Discovery Status/Settlement Conference set for 4/18/2023 at 08:45 AM in Suite 9280 before Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 11/8/2022. (et)
Related: [-]
13 13 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Mediation Tue 11/08 10:45 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Attorney Louis Kushner is appointed as mediator. Party LOUIS B. KUSHNER added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 11/8/2022. (et)
Related: [-]
12 12 minutes Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference Tue 11/08 10:42 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly: Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference held on 11/8/2022. (Court Reporter: none) (et)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 01, 2022
11 11 adr Stipulation Selecting ADR process Tue 11/01 3:09 PM
STIPULATION selecting ADR process by VERIZON MARYLAND LLC. (McLay, Katherine)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Tue 11/01 3:08 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (McLay, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 13, 2022
8 8 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 10/13 8:58 AM
ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting to be conducted on or before 10/25/2022. Rule 26 Meeting Report and either the Stipulation Selecting ADR Process or the Expedited Docket Stipulation due by 11/1/2022. Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/8/2022 at 08:45 AM by Telephone Conference before Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 10/13/2022. (et)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 12, 2022
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 09/12 3:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James S. Urban on behalf of VERIZON MARYLAND LLC. (Urban, James)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.1) Mon 09/12 3:14 PM
Disclosure Statement identifying Verizon Communications, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by VERIZON MARYLAND LLC. (McLay, Katherine)
Related: [-]
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 09/12 3:13 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by VERIZON MARYLAND LLC. (McLay, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 01, 2022
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 08/01 12:13 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MOMACH MCGATT. VERIZON MARYLAND LLC waiver sent on 7/14/2022, answer due 9/12/2022. (Koller, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 07, 2022
3 3 2 pgs order Order Thu 07/07 10:34 AM
As detailed in the accompanying Order, given that motions pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) are discouraged if the pleading defect is curable by amendment, IT HEREBY IS ORDERED that the parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of any motion to dismiss to determine whether it can be avoided. The duty to meet and confer extends to parties appearing pro se. Consistent with the foregoing, motions to dismiss must be accompanied by a certificate of the movant, stating that the moving party has made a good faith effort to confer with the nonmovant(s) to determine whether the identified pleading deficiencies properly may be cured by amendment. Motions to dismiss that do not contain the required certification will be summarily denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 7/7/2022. (et)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 05, 2022
order Order Reassigning Case Tue 07/05 3:51 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Judge Joy Flowers Conti no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 7/5/2022. Text-only entry; No PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (map)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 07/05 3:56 PM
Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly presiding. (cww)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 29, 2022
1 1 12 pgs cmp Complaint (for Clerk of Court personnel only) Thu 06/30 10:45 AM
COMPLAINT against VERIZON MARYLAND LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number BPAWDC-7176281), filed by MOMACH MCGATT. (sdp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet