Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:William S Stickman
Case #: 2:22-cv-00953
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Jun 29, 2022
Terminated:Nov 15, 2022
Last checked: Monday Dec 26, 2022 4:34 AM EST
Defendant
PENNATRONICS
Represented By
Sarah Boehme
Marks O'Neill O'Brien Doherty & Kelly PC
contact info
Plaintiff
JERMAINE THOMPSON
Represented By
Mary Lemieux-Fillery
The Law Offices Of Eric A. Shore
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Mediator
KENNETH BENSON
Terminated: 10/03/2022
Represented By
Kenneth J. Benson
Justus Adr Services
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, November 15, 2022
order Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Tue 11/15 8:31 AM
ORDER OF COURT. Upon review of15 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by JERMAINE THOMPSON, this matter is dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs. Clerk is to mark CASE CLOSED. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 11/15/22. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 14, 2022
15 15 misc Stipulation of Dismissal (Atty) Mon 11/14 3:21 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by JERMAINE THOMPSON. (Lemieux-Fillery, Mary)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 03, 2022
13 13 adr Report of Mediation Mon 10/03 12:07 PM
REPORT of Mediation: Case has been resolved. KENNETH BENSON terminated. Attorney Kenneth J. Benson terminated. The parties are reminded of their obligation to complete the ADR questionnaire and submit within 5 days of the conclusion of the ADR process. The questionnaire can be accessed [LINK:here] or at www.pawd.uscourts.gov. Click on the ADR icon. Mediation session was held on 10/3/2022. (Benson, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
order Order Mon 10/03 3:47 PM
ORDER OF COURT. Upon review of13 Report of Mediation, all deadlines in this matter are TERMINATED and the Court will await the filing of a stipulation of dismissal to close this case. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 10/03/22. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 18, 2022
12 12 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Mediation Thu 08/18 11:44 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Kenneth Benson is appointed as mediator. Mediation shall be concluded by 10/18/22. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 08/18/22. (eca)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Case Management Order Thu 08/18 11:39 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 09/02/22; Joinder of Parties due 09/02/22; Exchange of initial disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1) due by 08/29/22; Discovery ends 01/09/23; Telephonic Post-Discovery Status Conference set for 01/09/23 at 10:00 am; Call parameters outlined herein; Fee records due by the 28th of each month; First disclosure due by 09/28/22; Summary Judgment due by 01/30/23; Response to Summary Judgment due by 02/28/23; Reply brief due by 03/14/23; Page limitations outlined herein. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 08/18/22. (eca)
Related: [-]
10 10 minutes Initial Case Management Conference Thu 08/18 11:23 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William S. Stickman: Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference held on 8/18/2022. (Court Reporter: None) (eca)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 28, 2022
9 9 adr Stipulation Selecting ADR process Thu 07/28 5:42 PM
STIPULATION selecting ADR process by PENNATRONICS. (Boehme, Sarah)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Thu 07/28 5:40 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Boehme, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 22, 2022
7 7 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 07/22 1:18 PM
ORDER SCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Rule 26 Meeting to be conducted on or before 8/8/2022. Rule 26 Meeting Report and Stipulation Selecting ADR Process due by 8/15/2022. Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/18/2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge William S. Stickman. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 07/22/22. (eca)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 07/22 12:57 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by PENNATRONICS. (Boehme, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 06, 2022
5 5 misc Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.1) Wed 07/06 11:18 AM
Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by PENNATRONICS. (Boehme, Sarah)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 07/06 8:41 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JERMAINE THOMPSON. PENNATRONICS waiver sent on 6/30/2022, answer due 8/29/2022. (Lemieux-Fillery, Mary)
Related: [-]
misc QC - Party did not file Disclosure Statement Wed 07/06 7:51 AM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re3 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 7/13/2022. (jv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 05, 2022
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 07/05 4:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Boehme on behalf of PENNATRONICS. (Boehme, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 29, 2022
2 2 misc Exhibits in Support Thu 06/30 10:26 AM
EXHIBIT A in Support of1 Complaint by JERMAINE THOMPSON. (jv)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (for Clerk of Court personnel only) Thu 06/30 10:20 AM
COMPLAINT against PENNATRONICS (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-7176393), filed by JERMAINE THOMPSON. (jv)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet