Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 9:22-bk-90104

Texas Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Joshua P Searcy
Case #: 9:22-ap-09001
Nature of Suit91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 30, 2022
Terminated:Dec 29, 2022

Debtor
Jaime R. Hernandez
140 Egg Farm Rd.
Lufkin, TX 75901
Represented By
Jaime R. Hernandez
contact info
Debtor
Wendy L. Almeida-Cruz
140 Egg Farm Rd.
Lufkin, TX 75901
Represented By
Wendy L. Almeida-Cruz
contact info
Last checked: never
Defendant
EMVLP, LLC d/b/a State Farm
211 E. 7th Street Suite 620
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
EMVLP, LLC d/b/a State Farm
contact info
Defendant
EMVLP, LLC II d/b/a EMVLP II PLLC and d/b/a State Farm
211 E. 7th Street Suite 620
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
EMVLP, LLC II d/b/a EMVLP II PLLC and d/b/a State Farm
contact info
Defendant
Romans Adjusters Inc.
5300 Buford Jett Ln.
Balch Springs, TX 75180
Represented By
Romans Adjusters Inc.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 1:10 PM CDT
Saturday, December 31, 2022
21 21 court Certificate of Mailing Sat 12/31 11:23 PM
Certificate Of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 12/31/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 20 Order Closing Due to Stipulated Dismissal (RE: related document(s)19 Notice of Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding with prejudice filed by Debtor Jaime R. Hernandez, Plaintiff Jaime R. Hernandez, Debtor Wendy L. Almeida-Cruz, Plaintiff Wendy L. Almeida-Cruz). (md)
Thursday, December 29, 2022
20 20 1 pgs order Order - Matrix Thu 12/29 8:24 AM
Order Closing Due to Stipulated Dismissal Related [+]. (md)
Related: [-] 19 Notice of Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding with prejudice filed by Debtor Jaime R. Hernandez, Plaintiff Jaime R. Hernandez, Debtor Wendy L. Almeida-Cruz, Plaintiff Wendy L. Almeida-Cruz
court Close Adversary Case Thu 12/29 8:26 AM
Adversary Case Number 22-9001 Closed. (md)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 21, 2022
19 19 notice Notice of Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Case Wed 12/21 10:55 AM
Agreed Notice of Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding with prejudice Filed by Wendy L. Almeida-Cruz, Jaime R. Hernandez(Newton, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, November 03, 2022
18 18 court Certificate of Mailing Thu 11/03 11:32 PM
Certificate Of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 11/03/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 Telephonic Management Conference Continued (RE: related document(s)1 COMPLAINT: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(91 (Declaratory judgment)): filed by Debtor Jaime R. Hernandez, Plaintiff Jaime R. Hernandez, Debtor Wendy L. Almeida-Cruz, Plaintiff Wendy L. Almeida-Cruz).. Telephonic Management Conference continued to 1/24/2023. A precise time for this telephonic management conference will be assigned and transmitted to all parties at the time of their respective communications with the Courtroom Deputy. (JD)
Tuesday, November 01, 2022
17 17 court Hearing Continued - With Form Tue 11/01 1:35 PM
Telephonic Management Conference Continued Related [+]. . Telephonic Management Conference continued to 1/24/2023. A precise time for this telephonic management conference will be assigned and transmitted to all parties at the time of their respective communications with the Courtroom Deputy. (JD)
Related: [-] 1 COMPLAINT: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(91 (Declaratory judgment)): filed by Debtor Jaime R. Hernandez, Plaintiff Jaime R. Hernandez, Debtor Wendy L. Almeida-Cruz, Plaintiff Wendy L. Almeida-Cruz
Tuesday, October 25, 2022
16 16 notice Notice of Initial Disclosure Tue 10/25 3:48 PM
Notice of Initial Disclosure Filed by EMVLP, LLC II d/b/a EMVLP II PLLC and d/b/a State Farm, EMVLP, LLC d/b/a State Farm (Sapp, Matthew)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Initial Disclosure Tue 10/25 1:55 PM
Notice of Initial Disclosure Filed by Romans Adjusters Inc. (Newman, Patrick)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Initial Disclosure Tue 10/25 1:55 PM
Notice of Initial Disclosure of the Plaintiffs Filed by Wendy L. Almeida-Cruz, Jaime R. Hernandez (Newton, Charles)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 08, 2022
13 13 court Certificate of Mailing Thu 09/08 11:31 PM
Certificate Of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 09/08/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Notice and Order Regarding Initial Pre-Trial Procedures in Adversary Proceeding and Scheduling of Telephonic Management Conference. (RE: related document(s)1 COMPLAINT: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(91 (Declaratory judgment)): filed by Charles Anthony Newton on behalf of Jaime R. Hernandez, Wendy L. Almeida-Cruz against EMVLP, LLC d/b/a State Farm, EMVLP, LLC II d/b/a EMVLP II PLLC and d/b/a State Farm, Romans Adjusters Inc.). Telephonic Management Conference scheduled for 11/1/2022. A precise time for this telephonic management conference will be assigned and transmitted to all parties at the time of their respective communications with the Courtroom Deputy. (at)
Tuesday, September 06, 2022
12 12 3 pgs order Order and Notice of Hearing (Telephonic Management Conference) Tue 09/06 3:49 PM
Notice and Order Regarding Initial Pre-Trial Procedures in Adversary Proceeding and Scheduling of Telephonic Management Conference. Related [+]. Telephonic Management Conference scheduled for 11/1/2022. A precise time for this telephonic management conference will be assigned and transmitted to all parties at the time of their respective communications with the Courtroom Deputy. (at)
Related: [-] 1 COMPLAINT: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(91 (Declaratory judgment)): filed by Charles Anthony Newton on behalf of Jaime R. Hernandez, Wendy L. Almeida-Cruz against EMVLP, LLC d/b/a State Farm, EMVLP, LLC II d/b/a EMVLP II PLLC and d/b/a State Farm, Romans Adjusters Inc.
Wednesday, August 31, 2022
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 08/31 10:18 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Romans Adjusters Inc. (Newman, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Sunday, August 14, 2022
10 10 court Certificate of Mailing Sun 08/14 11:25 PM
Certificate Of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 08/14/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Extend Time To Respond to The Complaint (RE: related document(s)8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time To Respond to Complaint Filed by Patrick Newman on behalf of Romans Adjusters Inc.). (srb)
Friday, August 12, 2022
9 9 order Extend Time (Adversary) Fri 08/12 12:36 PM
Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Extend Time To Respond to The Complaint Related [+]. (srb)
Related: [-] 8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time To Respond to Complaint Filed by Patrick Newman on behalf of Romans Adjusters Inc.
utility Update Answer Deadline Fri 08/12 12:38 PM
Romans Adjusters Inc. Answer Deadline Reset for 8/31/2022. (srb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 10, 2022
8 8 motion Extension of Time (Adversary) Wed 08/10 3:23 PM
Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time To Respond to Complaint Filed by Patrick Newman on behalf of Romans Adjusters Inc. (Newman, Patrick) Modified on 8/11/2022 (srb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, August 01, 2022
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 08/01 4:06 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by EMVLP, LLC II d/b/a EMVLP II PLLC and d/b/a State Farm (Egeland, Susan)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 08/01 4:05 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by EMVLP, LLC d/b/a State Farm (Egeland, Susan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 12, 2022
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 07/12 1:24 PM
Summons Service Executed on EMVLP, LLC d/b/a State Farm 7/1/2022 (Newton, Charles)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 11, 2022
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 07/11 9:33 AM
Summons Service Executed on EMVLP, LLC II d/b/a EMVLP II PLLC and d/b/a State Farm 7/1/2022 (Newton, Charles)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 07/11 9:31 AM
Summons Service Executed on EMVLP, LLC d/b/a State Farm 7/1/2022 (Newton, Charles)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 01, 2022
2 2 court Summons Issued Fri 07/01 8:36 AM
Summons Issued on EMVLP, LLC II d/b/a EMVLP II PLLC and d/b/a State Farm Date Issued 7/1/2022, Answer Due 8/1/2022; EMVLP, LLC d/b/a State Farm Date Issued 7/1/2022, Answer Due 8/1/2022; Romans Adjusters Inc. Date Issued 7/1/2022, Answer Due 8/1/2022 and electronically transmitted back to the filer to be served upon the relevant party(s). (srb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Att: 2 Summons
Thursday, June 30, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint [COURT USE ONLY] Thu 06/30 2:58 PM
COMPLAINT: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(91 (Declaratory judgment)): filed by Charles Anthony Newton on behalf of Jaime R. Hernandez, Wendy L. Almeida-Cruz against EMVLP, LLC d/b/a State Farm, EMVLP, LLC II d/b/a EMVLP II PLLC and d/b/a State Farm, Romans Adjusters Inc.. (Newton, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 cover sheet
Att: 2 Summons EMVLP, LLC
Att: 3 Summons EMVLP II, LLC
Att: 4 Summons Romans Adjusters, Inc.