Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-09222
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jul 01, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 28, 2022 3:38 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
JOSEPH PARK
Represented By
DEBORAH K LEVY
Junelle & Associates Pllc - Houston Tx
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Wednesday, January 18, 2023
2 2 16 pgs order Order Fri 01/20 10:05 AM
ORDER. For any plaintiff failing to submit a census form by February 8, 2023, his/her case will be dismissed with prejudice, in light of repeated failures to comply. (Pretrial Order No. 18 / Pretrial Order No. 81 and this Order). Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 1/18/2023. (erl)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 01, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 07/01 4:08 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-7248781.), filed by JOSEPH PARK. (LEVY, DEBORAH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet