Missouri Eastern District Court
Judge:Henry Edward Autrey
Case #: 4:22-cv-00704
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim
Case Filed:Jul 01, 2022
Terminated:Mar 14, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 28, 2022 3:07 AM CST
Defendant
Joyce Meyer Ministries, Inc.
a limited liability corporation 700 Grace Parkway
Fenton, MO 63026
Represented By
Christine A. Vaporean
Brown And James Pc - St Louis
contact info
Plaintiff
Bernadette Aragon-Duell
5812 Hempshire Rd.
St. Louis, MO 63129
Represented By
Bret C. Kleefuss
Law Offices Of Derald Gab PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 13 minutes ago
Tuesday, March 14, 2023
order A Docket Text Order Tue 03/14 4:10 PM
Docket Text ORDER: as to Joyce Meyer Ministries, Inc. re23 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Bernadette Aragon-Duell; SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 3/14/2023. (HMA)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 13, 2023
23 23 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 03/13 1:33 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Bernadette Aragon-Duell (Kleefuss, Bret)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 28, 2023
22 22 adr ADR Compliance Report Wed 03/01 1:37 PM
ADR COMPLIANCE REPORT. Neutral: Neuner Jr., Francis X. Date of Conference: 2/22/2023. The parties participated in good faith. The parties achieved a settlement.(HMA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 17, 2023
21 21 adr Notice of Appointment of Neutral Tue 01/17 2:14 PM
NOTICE of Appointment of Neutral. Neutral name: Neuner Jr., Francis X. Neutral selected by Parties. (HMA) (copy of Notice sent to Neutral 1/17/23)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 16, 2023
20 20 adr Designation of Neutral and ADR Conference Report Mon 01/16 11:31 AM
Designation of Neutral by parties and ADR Conference Report by Plaintiff Bernadette Aragon-Duell Neutral: Neuner Jr., Francis X. Date of Conference: 02/22/2023 time: 9:00 a.m. Location: 120 S. Central, Suite 1250, St. Louis, Mo 63105(Kleefuss, Bret)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 13, 2023
order A Docket Text Order with Schedules Fri 01/13 4:56 PM
Docket Text ORDER: Re16 Consent MOTION for Extension off Time to Complete ADR by Defendant Joyce Meyer Ministries, Inc.; ORDERED ADDITIONAL TIME IS GRANTED UP TO AND INCLUDING FEBRUARY 24, 2023. (ADR Completion Deadline due by 2/24/2023., ADR Compliance Report Deadline due by 3/10/2023). Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 1/13/23. (EAB)
Related: [-]
order A Docket Text Order with Schedules Fri 01/13 4:59 PM
Docket Text ORDER: Re17 MOTION For Extension Of Time To File Designation Of Neutral/Conference Report by Plaintiff Bernadette Aragon-Duell; ORDERED ADDITIONAL TIME IS GRANTED UP TO AND INCLUDING JANUARY 16, 2023. (Designation of Neutral/Conference Report due by 1/16/2023). Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 1/13/23. (EAB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 12, 2023
17 17 misc Report To Court Order Thu 01/12 2:44 PM
REPORT TO COURT ORDER re 15 Electronic Notice of Noncompliance - Designation of Neutral/Conference Report, by Plaintiff Bernadette Aragon-Duell. (Kleefuss, Bret)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Extension Thu 01/12 12:38 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of: of Time to Complete ADR by Defendant Joyce Meyer Ministries, Inc.. (Vaporean, Christine)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 09, 2023
adr Electronic Notice of Noncompliance - Designation of Neutral/Conference Report Mon 01/09 3:55 PM
Electronic Notice of Noncompliance to Review of case shows the Designation of Neutral/ADR conference report has not been filed. A written motion requesting an extension of the designation of neutral/ADR conference report filing deadline must be filed with the court within 5 days. Notice only, no.pdf attached. (Designation of Neutral/Conference Report due by 1/14/2023)(JEB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 23, 2022
order A Docket Text Order with Schedules Wed 11/23 11:43 AM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:12 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Discovery filed by Plaintiff Bernadette Aragon-Duell; ORDERED ADDITIONAL TIME IS GRANTED UP TO AND INCLUDING NOVEMBER 29, 2022. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 11/23/2022. (HMA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 22, 2022
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 11/22 12:47 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to12 MOTION for Extension of: Time to Respond to Discovery by Defendant Joyce Meyer Ministries, Inc.. (Vaporean, Christine)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Extension Tue 11/22 11:32 AM
MOTION for Extension of: Time to Respond to Discovery by Plaintiff Bernadette Aragon-Duell. (Kleefuss, Bret)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 04, 2022
11 11 4 pgs order Order Referring Case to ADR Thu 08/04 4:48 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution. This case is referred to: Mediation Designation of Lead Counsel: Bret C. Kleefuss ADR Completion Deadline due by 2/16/2023. ADR Compliance Report Deadline due by 3/2/2023. Designation of Neutral/Conference Report due by 1/6/2023. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 8/4/22. (EAB)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Case Management Order Thu 08/04 4:45 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (See Full Order) This case is assigned to Track: 2 (Standard). Motion to Join Parties due by 11/18/2022. Discovery Completion due by 3/17/2023. Non-Dispositive Motions due by 3/28/2023. This case shall be referred to alternative dispute resolution on December 16, 2022, and that reference shall terminate on February 16, 2023. Dispositive Motions due by 4/24/2023. Pretrial Compliance due by 10/23/2023. Motion in Limine due by 10/23/2023. Jury Trial set for 11/6/2023 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 10N - St. Louis before District Judge Henry Edward Autrey. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 8/4/22. (EAB)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 01, 2022
9 9 1 pgs order Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule) Mon 08/01 12:28 PM
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the scheduling conference pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 16 previously set for August 4, 2022, is vacated. The case management order will be entered based on the dates submitted by the parties in their Joint Proposed Scheduling Plan. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 8/1/2022. (JEB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 28, 2022
8 8 misc Joint Scheduling Plan Thu 07/28 8:01 AM
JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Bernadette Aragon-Duell. . (Kleefuss, Bret)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 12, 2022
7 7 notice Notice of Filing Notice of Removal Tue 07/12 4:29 PM
NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Joyce Meyer Ministries, Inc. Sent To: State Court - Executed (Vaporean, Christine)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Rule 16 Order Tue 07/12 4:16 PM
RULE 16 ORDER (See Full Order) This case is assigned to Track 2 Standard. Joint Scheduling Plan due by 7/28/2022. Rule 16 Conference set for 8/4/2022 10:00 AM in Telephone Conference in Chambers before District Judge Henry Edward Autrey. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 7/12/2022. (HMA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 05, 2022
5 5 cmp Complaint (Removal/Transfer) - COURT USE ONLY Tue 07/05 9:11 AM
Petition Related [+] Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis County, filed by Bernadette Aragon-Duell.(JDC)
Related: [-] moval/Transfer
misc Case Opening Notification Tue 07/05 9:15 AM
Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Henry Edward Autrey. (JDC)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 01, 2022
4 4 misc Disclosure of Organizational Interests Fri 07/01 4:34 PM
DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Joyce Meyer Ministries, Inc.. Parent companies: none, Subsidiaries: none, Publicly held company: none,. (Vaporean, Christine)
Related: [-]
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 07/01 4:33 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Joyce Meyer Ministries, Inc..(Vaporean, Christine)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Filing Notice of Removal Fri 07/01 4:32 PM
NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Joyce Meyer Ministries, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Vaporean, Christine)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Petition Fri 07/01 4:30 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County Circuit Court, case number 22SL-CC02610, with receipt number AMOEDC-9379299, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Joyce Meyer Ministries, Inc..(Vaporean, Christine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit State Court File,
Att: 2 Exhibit Docket Sheet,
Att: 3 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet