California Northern District Court
Judge:Lucy H Koh
Referred: Susan Van Keulen
Case #: 5:14-cv-04062
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Case Filed:Sep 08, 2014
Terminated:Jun 05, 2017
Last checked: Sunday May 10, 2015 9:19 AM PDT
Defendant
Dreamworks Animation SKG Inc.
Represented By
Shannon Edward Mader
Gibson Dunn And Crutcher LLP
contact info
Rodney Joseph Stone
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher
contact info
Daniel Glen Swanson
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Defendant
Blue Sky Studios, Inc.
Represented By
Jonathan Bradley Pitt
Williams And Connolly LLP
contact info
William Faulkner
Mcmanis Faulkner
contact info
Defendant
The Walt Disney Company
Represented By
Deborah A. Garza
Covington And Burling LLP
contact info
Cortlin Hall Lannin
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Emily Johnson Henn
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Thomas A. Isaacson
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Defendant
Sony Pictures Imageworks
Represented By
David Mark Goldstein, Esq.
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
contact info
Stephen V. Bomse
Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe
contact info
Paul Francis Rugani
Orrick, Herrington Sutcliffe
contact info
Defendant
Sony Pictures Animation
Represented By
David Mark Goldstein, Esq.
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
contact info
Stephen V. Bomse
Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe
contact info
Paul Francis Rugani
Orrick, Herrington Sutcliffe
contact info
Defendant
Pixar
Represented By
Deborah A. Garza
Covington And Burling LLP
contact info
Cortlin Hall Lannin
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Emily Johnson Henn
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Thomas A. Isaacson
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Defendant
Lucasfilm Ltd. LLC
Represented By
Deborah A. Garza
Covington And Burling LLP
contact info
Cortlin Hall Lannin
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Emily Johnson Henn
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Thomas A. Isaacson
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Defendant
ImageMovers Digital
Represented By
Deborah A. Garza
Covington And Burling LLP
contact info
Cortlin Hall Lannin
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Emily Johnson Henn
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Thomas A. Isaacson
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Defendant
ImageMovers
Represented By
Emily Johnson Henn
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert A. Nitsch, Jr.
Represented By
Steven Gerald Sklaver
Susman Godfrey LLP
contact info
Steve W. Berman
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
Richard L. Grossman
Pillsbury & Coleman, LLP
contact info
Daniel A. Small
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC
contact info
Brent W Johnson
Cohen Milstein Sellers And Toll PLLC
contact info
Matthew W Ruan
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll
contact info
Jeffrey Benjamin Dubner
Cohen Milstein Sellers And Toll PLLC
contact info
Bruce Van Spiva
The Spiva Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Georgia Cano
Represented By
Steven Gerald Sklaver
Susman Godfrey LLP
contact info
John Edward Schiltz
Susman Godfrey LLP
contact info
Steve W. Berman
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
Matthew Robert Berry
Susman Godfrey LLP
contact info
Julian Ari Hammond
Hammondlaw, PC
contact info
Ari Nathan Cherniak
Hammondlaw, PC
contact info
Craig Justin Ackermann
Ackermann & Tilajef, P.C.
contact info
Kalpana Srinivasan
Susman Godfrey
contact info
Polina Pecherskaya
contact info
Jeffrey Benjamin Dubner
Cohen Milstein Sellers And Toll PLLC
contact info
Jordan Lee Talge
Susman Godfrey, LLP
contact info
Marc M. Seltzer
Susman Godfrey LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
David Wentworth
Represented By
Steven Gerald Sklaver
Susman Godfrey LLP
contact info
Steve W. Berman
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
Ashley A Bede
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
Jeff D Friedman
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
Jeffrey Benjamin Dubner
Cohen Milstein Sellers And Toll PLLC
contact info
Shana E. Scarlett
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Digital Domain 3.0, Inc.
Terminated: 11/05/2014

GPO Sep 16 2014
Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice- Small.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2014)
GPO Sep 16 2014
Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice- Johnson.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2014)
GPO Sep 16 2014
Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice- Dubner.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2014)
GPO Sep 24 2014
ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 9/24/14. (lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2014)
GPO Nov 06 2014
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on November 6, 2014. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2014)
GPO Dec 09 2014
ORDER denying as moot 59 & 60. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on December 9, 2014. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2014)
GPO Apr 03 2015
ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 75 Motion to Dismiss (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2015)
GPO Apr 03 2015
ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 79 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2015)
GPO Apr 21 2015
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION REGARDING SEARCH TERM PROTOCOL by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal, granting 109. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 4/21/2015. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2015)
GPO Apr 24 2015
ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 71 Motion to Compel (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2015)
GPO Jul 08 2015
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on July 8, 2015. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2015)
GPO Aug 20 2015
ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 126 Motion to Dismiss (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2015)
GPO Dec 09 2015
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on December 9, 2015. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2015)
GPO Dec 14 2015
ORDER RE SEALING MOTIONS PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on December 14, 2015. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2015) Modified on 2/10/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
GPO Jan 21 2016
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on January 21, 2016. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
GPO Mar 03 2016
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SEAL by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting 220. (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2016)
GPO Mar 23 2016
ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART MOTION TO COMPEL. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on March 23, 2016, granting-in-part and denying-in-part 213. (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2016)
GPO Mar 28 2016
ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART MOTION TO SEAL by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal, granting-in-part and denying-in-part 244. (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2016)
GPO Mar 30 2016
ORDER DENYING MOTION TO COMPEL. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on March 30, 2016, re 213. (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2016)
GPO Apr 29 2016
Questions Regarding Motion for Class Certification. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on April 29, 2016. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2016)
GPO May 02 2016
Questions for Hearing on Motion for Class Certification. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on May 2, 2016. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2016)
GPO May 06 2016
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on May 6, 2016. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2016)
GPO May 25 2016
ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART AND DENYING-IN-PART 203 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on May 25, 2016. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2016)
GPO May 27 2016
ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 215 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 239 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 253 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 269 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2016)
GPO Jul 06 2016
ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 273 Motion for Settlement; granting 282 Motion for Settlement. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Redline of Postcard Notice)(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2016)
GPO Aug 05 2016
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on August 5, 2016. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2016)
GPO Oct 14 2016
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 321 Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 1. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2016)
GPO Nov 10 2016
Order Requiring Hourly Rate Justification for Motion for Attorneys' Fees. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/10/16. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2016)
GPO Nov 11 2016
Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh Granting 336 Motion for Final Approval of Settlement with Sony Pictures Imageworks, Inc., Sony Pictures Animation Inc., and Blue Sky Studios Inc.(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/11/2016)
GPO Nov 11 2016
Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh Granting 331 Motion for Attorney Fees.(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/11/2016)
GPO Nov 11 2016
Final Judgment as to Defendants Sony Pictures Imageworks Inc., Sony Pictures Animation Inc., and Blue Sky Studios Inc. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/11/16. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/11/2016)
GPO Nov 29 2016
Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh Denying 339 Motion for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge.(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2016)
GPO Jan 19 2017
Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh Granting 338 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. (Attachments: # (1) Red-Line Copy of Proposed Notice, # (2) Clean Copy of Proposed Notice)(lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2017)
GPO Mar 02 2017
Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting 360 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; Granting 361 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2017)
GPO Mar 02 2017
Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh Granting 358 Motion for Settlement.(lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2017)
GPO Mar 09 2017
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 285 Non-Party Motion for Reimbursement; granting 307 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2017)
GPO Jun 05 2017
Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh Granting (388) Motion for Final Approval in case 5:14-cv-04062-LHK.Associated Cases: 5:14-cv-04062-LHK, 5:14-cv-04203-LHK, 5:14-cv-04422-LHK(lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2017)
GPO Jun 05 2017
Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh Granting in Part and Denying in Part (385) Motion for Attorney's Fees in case 5:14-cv-04062-LHK.Associated Cases: 5:14-cv-04062-LHK, 5:14-cv-04203-LHK, 5:14-cv-04422-LHK(lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2017)

1. Disney settles anti-poaching lawsuit for $100 million (forbes.com)
Submitted Fri 02/03/2017
2. Disney, DreamWorks and Sony Describe Artists' Wage-Theft Lawsuit As ?Futile' (cartoonbrew.com)
Submitted Wed 01/14/2015
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, April 07, 2020
454 454 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds Wed 04/08 9:01 AM
Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting 453 Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Distribution of Settlement Funds and Approval of Supplemental Notification Plan. (kedS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]