Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Robert A Mark
Case #: 1:22-bk-15158
Case Filed:Jul 01, 2022
Claims Deadline:Sep 09, 2022
Dismissed:Mar 20, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Belle Meade Studios, LLC
6815 Biscayne Blvd # 103-366
Miami, FL 33138-6292
Represented By
Scott Alan Orth, Esq.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130


Docket last updated: 11 minutes ago
Saturday, March 22, 2025
268 268 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case Sun 03/23 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case Related [+] Notice Date 03/22/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 266 Order On Debtor's Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss Case (Re: 254 ). This Case is Dismissed With Prejudice for a Period of 180 days. [Filing Fee Balance Due: $0.00] (Olivier, Mike)
Thursday, March 20, 2025
267 267 attydoc Certificate of Service [Attorney] Thu 03/20 2:35 PM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Scott Alan Orth Esq. Related [+]. (Orth, Scott)
Related: [-] 266 Order on Motion to Dismiss Case
266 266 order Dismiss Case Order Thu 03/20 1:35 PM
Order On Debtor's Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss Case Related [+]. This Case is Dismissed With Prejudice for a Period of 180 days. [Filing Fee Balance Due: $0.00] (Olivier, Mike)
Related: [-] # 254
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
265 265 misc Notice of Compliance/Non-Compliance Wed 03/19 11:01 AM
Notice of Compliance Filed by Debtor Belle Meade Studios, LLC Related [+]. (Orth, Scott)
Related: [-] 263 Order on Motion to Dismiss Case