Gilbert v. 3M Company, The et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-02116 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jul 05, 2022 |
Last checked: Sunday Jan 01, 2023 4:32 AM EST |
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
|
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
103 Fairview Park Drive
Elmsford, NY 10523 |
|
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
Coporation Trust Company 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
|
|
Defendant
3M Company, The
|
|
Plaintiff
Cynthia Gilbert
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, September 04, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Glenda Norris, Lonnie Craig Cannon, Robert Eugene Davis, Barbara L Manson, Russell Nobuhiro Nakamura, Bret Allen Freeman, Henry Lloyd Thompson, Sherri L Chaffin Schoolcraft, Michael Joseph Calvin, Laura Clark, Christopher Joseph Kiskeravage, Cynthia Gilbert, Thomas Walter Rusnack, Gabriele Charlie, Anita Schoenbeck, Thomas Jay Hills, Linda Davis, Dale Orrin Brown, Terry Lee Mize, Kevin Timothy Connolly, Edward Charles Harris, Steven James Miller, Michael Dale Henderson, Joseph Patrick Attanasio, Matthew Mark Beninger Of Particular Personal Injury Claims WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, July 06, 2022 | ||
3 | 3 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed) (associated as of 7/5/2022), Gilbert v. 3M et al, as DSC case 2:22-cv-2116-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Eastern Pennsylvania (sshe, ) | |
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Wed 07/06 4:01 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed) (associated as of 7/5/2022), Gilbert v. 3M et al, as DSC case 2:22-cv-2116-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Eastern Pennsylvania (sshe, ) |
||
Tuesday, July 05, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-10573047.), filed by Cynthia Gilbert. Service due by 10/3/2022(sshe, ) |