Nevada District Court
Judge:Andrew P Gordon
Referred: Elayna J Youchah
Case #: 2:22-cv-01054
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Case Filed:Jul 05, 2022
Terminated:Aug 02, 2022
Case in other court:DISTRICT COURT, CLARK COUNTY, A-22-853465-C
Last checked: Sunday Jan 01, 2023 12:45 AM PST
Defendant
Regal Cinemas, Inc.
Represented By
Michael Hetey
Thorndal Armstrong Delk Balkenbush & Eisinger
contact info
Harold J. Rosenthal
Wiley Petersen Law Offices
contact info
Defendant
Regal Colonnade
Represented By
Michael Hetey
Thorndal Armstrong Delk Balkenbush & Eisinger
contact info
Harold J. Rosenthal
Wiley Petersen Law Offices
contact info
Defendant
Regal Entertainment Group
Represented By
Michael Hetey
Thorndal Armstrong Delk Balkenbush & Eisinger
contact info
Harold J. Rosenthal
Wiley Petersen Law Offices
contact info
Plaintiff
David Bogle
Represented By
G. Oliver Melgar
Revolutionary Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, August 02, 2022
13 13 1 pgs order Order Tue 08/02 9:59 AM
ORDER. It Is Therefore Ordered that this case is remanded to the state court from which it was removed for all further proceedings. The clerk of the court is instructed to close this case. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/1/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - Certified Order and Docket Sheet mailed to State Court - LOE) Modified Judge's signature date on 8/2/2022 (SLD)
Related: [-]
order ~Util - Terminate Case Tue 08/02 10:00 AM
Case terminated. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 29, 2022
12 12 respm Response Fri 07/29 1:37 PM
RESPONSE to11 Response by Plaintiff David Bogle. (Melgar, G. Oliver)
Related: [-]
11 11 respm Response Fri 07/29 11:56 AM
RESPONSE to9 Order, by Defendants Regal Cinemas, Inc., Regal Colonnade, Regal Entertainment Group. (Hetey, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 12, 2022
10 10 answer Answer to Petition for Removal Tue 07/12 3:42 PM
ANSWER re1 Petition for Removal,, filed by Regal Cinemas, Inc., Regal Colonnade, Regal Entertainment Group. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 8/26/2022.(Hetey, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 07, 2022
9 9 3 pgs order Order Fri 07/08 9:15 AM
ORDER. It Is Further Ordered that by July 29, 2022, the removing defendants shall show cause why this action should not be remanded for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Failure to respond to this order by that date will result in remand. Show Cause Response due by 7/29/2022. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/7/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 06, 2022
7 7 minord Minute Order Removal Case Wed 07/06 8:29 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/6/2022. Statement regarding removed action is due by 7/21/2022. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 8/5/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
Related: [-]
notice Notice Docket Correction Wed 07/06 8:27 AM
NOTICE of Docket Correction: Attorney G. Oliver Melgar added as counsel for Plaintiff and Attorney Harold J. Rosenthal added as counsel for Defendants. (no image attached) (EDS)
Related: [-]
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Wed 07/06 8:29 AM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (EDS)
Related: [-]
order Standing Order Wed 07/06 8:30 AM
STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink:[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 05, 2022
5 5 misc Statement in Removal Case Tue 07/05 2:05 PM
STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants REGAL CINEMAS, INC., REGAL COLONNADE, REGAL ENTERTAINMENT GROUP, INC... (Hetey, Michael)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Certificate Interested Parties Tue 07/05 2:04 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by REGAL CINEMAS, INC., REGAL COLONNADE, REGAL ENTERTAINMENT GROUP, INC.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Hetey, Michael)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Declaration Tue 07/05 2:03 PM
DECLARATION re1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendants REGAL CINEMAS, INC., REGAL COLONNADE, REGAL ENTERTAINMENT GROUP, INC... (Hetey, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Civil Cover Sheet Tue 07/05 1:59 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET to1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendants REGAL CINEMAS, INC., REGAL COLONNADE, REGAL ENTERTAINMENT GROUP, INC.. (Hetey, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition Removal Tue 07/05 1:57 PM
PETITION FOR REMOVAL from DISTRICT COURT - CLARK COUNTY, NEVADA, Case Number A-22-853465-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-6962018) by REGAL CINEMAS, INC., REGAL ENTERTAINMENT GROUP, INC., REGAL COLONNADE. (Hetey, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit