Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Amanda M Knapp
Case #: 5:22-cv-01185
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Jul 05, 2022
Terminated:Nov 30, 2022
Case in other court:Summit County Common Pleas Court, CV-22-00006-1836
Last checked: Sunday Jan 01, 2023 3:54 AM EST
Cross Defendant
Clopay Corporation
Represented By
Paul J. Schumacher, Jr.
Dickie Mccamey & Chilcote - Cleveland
contact info
Cross Defendant
McConnell Excavating, LTD.
Represented By
Stephen J. Chuparkoff
Cincinnati Insurance - Akron
contact info
Cross-Claimant
Menard, Inc.
Represented By
Holly M. Wilson
Reminger Co. - Cleveland
contact info
Gregory G. Guice
Reminger Co. - Cleveland
contact info
Cross-Claimant
Menards
Represented By
Gregory G. Guice
Reminger Co. - Cleveland
contact info
Defendant
Menard, Inc.
4777 Menard Drive
Eau Claire, WI 54703
Represented By
Holly M. Wilson
Reminger Co. - Cleveland
contact info
Gregory G. Guice
Reminger Co. - Cleveland
contact info
Defendant
John Doe Contractor
Defendant
Menards
Represented By
Gregory G. Guice
Reminger Co. - Cleveland
contact info
Defendant
Clopay Corporation
Represented By
Paul J. Schumacher, Jr.
Dickie Mccamey & Chilcote - Cleveland
contact info
Defendant
McConnell Excavating, LTD.
Represented By
Stephen J. Chuparkoff
Cincinnati Insurance - Akron
contact info
Plaintiff
John Whatmough
2331 E. Turkeyfoot Lake Road
Green, OH 44312
Represented By
Michael J. Maillis
Kisling, Nestico & Redick - Youngstown
contact info
Christopher J. Van Blargan
Kisling, Nestico & Redick - Akron
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
3rd Party Plaintiff
Menard, Inc.
Terminated: 09/23/2022
Represented By
Holly M. Wilson
Reminger Co. - Cleveland
contact info
Gregory G. Guice
Reminger Co. - Cleveland
contact info
3rd Party Plaintiff
Menards
Terminated: 09/23/2022
Represented By
Gregory G. Guice
Reminger Co. - Cleveland
contact info
3rd Pty Defendant
Clopay Corporation
Terminated: 09/23/2022
Represented By
Paul J. Schumacher, Jr.
Dickie Mccamey & Chilcote - Cleveland
contact info
3rd Pty Defendant
McConnell Excavating, LTD.
Terminated: 09/23/2022
Represented By
Stephen J. Chuparkoff
Cincinnati Insurance - Akron
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, December 19, 2022
39 39 oth_evt Remark Mon 12/19 10:32 AM
Acknowledgement of receipt of Order of Remand received from Summit County Court of Common Pleas Court on 12/5/2022. Related document(s)38 (B,DL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 30, 2022
38 38 oth_evt Remark Wed 11/30 12:52 PM
Certified copy of order of remand and docket sheet mailed to Summit County Court of Common Pleas with acknowledgment of receipt enclosed. Related document(s)37 . (P,G)
Related: [-]
37 37 2 pgs order Order of Remand Wed 11/30 9:40 AM
Order of Remand to Summit County Court of Common Pleas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp on 11/30/2022. Related [+] (S,S)
Related: [-] 17 ,35
36 36 1 pgs order Order Wed 11/30 9:20 AM
Consent of the parties to this case being transferred to the docket of Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp for further proceedings. Judge John R. Adams on 11/30/22. (K,C)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 29, 2022
35 35 order Minute Order _ Status Conference Tue 11/29 4:38 PM
Minute Order of Telephonic Status Conference held on 11/29/2022. New party defendants McConnell Excavating and Clopay Corporation indicated their consent to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge. The parties were instructed to expeditiously complete and docket the Magistrate Consent Package, and have done so as of this filing. (ECF Doc.34 .) The parties also agreed that the District Court lacks subject-matter jurisdiction due to the addition of non-diverse party defendants, and that remand to state court is necessary. The Court informed the parties that the case would be remanded to state court once the consent of all new party defendants to the Magistrate Judge had been finalized. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp on 11/29/2022. (Time: 15 min.) (S,S)
Related: [-]
34 34 oth_doc Proposed Order Tue 11/29 1:22 PM
Proposed Order Magistrate Consent by All Parties filed by John Whatmough. (Van Blargan, Christopher)
Related: [-]
33 33 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 11/29 8:24 AM
Waiver of Service Returned Executed by CLOPAY CORPORATION. CLOPAY CORPORATION waiver sent on 11/11/2022, answer due 1/10/2023 filed on behalf of CLOPAY CORPORATION (Van Blargan, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 28, 2022
32 32 notice Notice of Service (atty event) Mon 11/28 11:26 AM
Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures filed by MCCONNELL EXCAVATING, LTD.. (Chuparkoff, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 22, 2022
31 31 notice Status Report (atty event) Tue 11/22 5:58 PM
Joint Status Report filed by CLOPAY CORPORATION, MCCONNELL EXCAVATING, LTD., Menard, Inc., Menards, John Whatmough. (Van Blargan, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 11, 2022
30 30 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement (atty event) Fri 11/11 1:55 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Griffon Corporation for CLOPAY CORPORATION filed by CLOPAY CORPORATION. (Schumacher, Paul)
Related: [-]
29 29 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Fri 11/11 1:51 PM
Attorney Appearance by Paul J. Schumacher, Jr filed by on behalf of CLOPAY CORPORATION. (Schumacher, Paul)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 10, 2022
28 28 oth_doc Proposed Order Thu 11/10 3:46 PM
Proposed Order to File Second Amended Complaint filed by John Whatmough. Related document(s)27 . (Van Blargan, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 04, 2022
27 27 motion Leave Fri 11/04 10:11 AM
Motion for leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff John Whatmough.(Van Blargan, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint
Wednesday, November 02, 2022
26 26 notice Notice of Service (atty event) Wed 11/02 3:26 PM
Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Discovery Responses filed by John Whatmough. (Van Blargan, Christopher)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement (atty event) Wed 11/02 10:48 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by MCCONNELL EXCAVATING, LTD.. (Chuparkoff, Stephen)
Related: [-]
24 24 answer Answer to Crossclaim Wed 11/02 10:29 AM
Answer to20 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim filed by MCCONNELL EXCAVATING, LTD.. (Chuparkoff, Stephen)
Related: [-]
23 23 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 11/02 10:28 AM
Answer to19 Amended complaint filed by MCCONNELL EXCAVATING, LTD.. (Chuparkoff, Stephen)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Wed 11/02 10:26 AM
Attorney Appearance by Stephen J. Chuparkoff filed by on behalf of MCCONNELL EXCAVATING, LTD.. (Chuparkoff, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 24, 2022
21 21 service Return of Service Executed Mon 10/24 12:40 PM
Return of Service by Email executed upon MCCONNELL EXCAVATING, LTD. on 10/24/2022, filed on behalf of John Whatmough (Van Blargan, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 21, 2022
20 20 answer Answer to Complaint Crossclaim Fri 10/21 4:47 PM
Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint , Crossclaim against CLOPAY CORPORATION, MCCONNELL EXCAVATING, LTD. filed by Menards, Menard, Inc.. (Guice, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 10, 2022
19 19 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 10/10 1:57 PM
First Amended complaint against CLOPAY CORPORATION, John Doe Contractor, MCCONNELL EXCAVATING, LTD. and adding new party defendant(s) Clopay Corporation. Filed by John Whatmough. (Van Blargan, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 06, 2022
order Order on Motion to amend complaint Order on Motion for leave Thu 10/06 9:09 AM
Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's motion to amend complaint17 . Plaintiff shall file the First Amended Complaint as proposed in Doc 17-1 no later than 5:00 p.m. on October 11, 2022. Plaintiff shall perfect service in accordance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Case management deadlines remain unchanged. Defendant has withdrawn its motion for leave to file a third-party complaint18 , which is moot. Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp on 10/6/2022. (S,S)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 29, 2022
18 18 motion Leave Thu 09/29 2:30 PM
Motion for leave to Assert Claims Against Clopay Corporation and McConnell Excavating, Ltd. filed by Menard, Inc., Menards. (Guice, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 23, 2022
order Order Fri 09/23 12:44 PM
Order [non-document]. Defendant's16 Third Party Complaint was filed without leave of court, and is accordingly stricken. Defendant may file a motion pursuant Fed. R. Civ. P. 14(a)(1) seeking leave of Court to file a Third Party Complaint within seven days, on or before September 30, 2022. Any such filing shall indicate whether the motion is opposed or unopposed. Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp on 9/23/2022. (S,S)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 19, 2022
17 17 motion Amend Complaint Mon 09/19 7:34 PM
Motion to amend complaint filed by Plaintiff John Whatmough.(Van Blargan, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed First Amended Complaint
16 16 cmp Third Party Complaint Mon 09/19 4:02 PM
Third party complaint against CLOPAY CORPORATION, MCCONNELL EXCAVATING, LTD.. Filed by Menards, Menard, Inc.. (Guice, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 08, 2022
15 15 notice Notice of Service (atty event) Thu 09/08 4:03 PM
Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures filed by John Whatmough. (Van Blargan, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 01, 2022
14 14 order Protective Order Thu 09/01 12:35 PM
Stipulated Protective Order . Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp on 9/1/2022. (S,S)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 24, 2022
13 13 notice Stipulation (atty event) Wed 08/24 4:48 PM
Proposed Stipulation filed by Menard, Inc., Menards. (Guice, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 23, 2022
12 12 order Case Management Conference Plan/Order Tue 08/23 1:16 PM
Case Management Conference Order. Case is assigned to the standard track. Deadline to file motion seeking to add parties or amend pleadings: September 19, 2022. Deadline to complete all non-expert discovery: January 15, 2023. Deadline for party with burden of proof on a claim or defense to disclose expert report(s): January 15, 2023. Deadline for parties without burden of proof on claim or defense to disclose rebuttal expert report(s): February 15, 2023. Deadline to complete expert discovery: March 15, 2023. Deadline for filing dispositive motions: April 15, 2023. Joint Status Report due on or before November 22, 2022. Telephonic status conference set for November 29, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. Counsel should carefully review the requirements of this Order to ensure compliance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp on 8/23/2022. Related [+] (S,S)
Related: [-] lated document11
11 11 order Minute Order _ Case Management Conference Tue 08/23 12:55 PM
Minute Order of Case Management Conference held on 8/19/2022. The parties and the Court discussed the underlying facts of the case, the potential for alternative dispute resolution, and the parties proposed schedule, which the Court modified. The parties will file a Joint Status Report no later than 5:00 p.m. on November 22, 2022, as described in the separately filed CMC Plan Order. The Court will conduct a Telephonic Status Conference on November 29, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. Instructions for connecting to the conference will be emailed to counsel of record. Additional case management dates and deadlines were discussed with counsel and are set forth in a separately filed CMC Plan Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp on 8/23/2022. (Time: 33 min.) (S,S)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 18, 2022
10 10 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Thu 08/18 9:58 AM
Attorney Appearance of Co-Counsel by Holly M. Wilson filed by on behalf of Menard, Inc.. (Wilson, Holly)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 16, 2022
9 9 notice Notice (atty event) Tue 08/16 5:18 PM
Initial Disclosures of Defendant filed by Menard, Inc., Menards. (Guice, Gregory)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Report of Parties Planning Meeting (atty event) Tue 08/16 4:48 PM
Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Menard, Inc., Menards. (Guice, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 03, 2022
7 7 notice Stipulation (atty event) Wed 08/03 2:55 PM
Proposed Stipulation Stipulation and Protective Order filed by Menard, Inc., Menards. (Guice, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 18, 2022
6 6 order Consent to Magistrate Judge Mon 07/18 9:58 AM
Consent of the parties to this case being transferred to the docket of Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp for further proceedings. Judge John R. Adams on 7/18/22. (K,C)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judge Mon 07/18 10:05 AM
Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp assigned to case pursuant to consent. Judge John R. Adams terminated. Related document(s)6 . (M,TL)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Notice of Hearing or Conference Mon 07/18 2:01 PM
IMPORTANT: Notice of Hearing [non-document]. Telephonic Case Management Conference rescheduled for 8/19/2022 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp. Lead counsel is expected to attend. Parties and party representatives are welcome to attend, but their attendance is not required. Bridge line instructions for the telephonic CMC will be emailed to counsel of record. (S,S)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 15, 2022
5 5 notice Notice (atty event) Fri 07/15 9:20 AM
Proposed Consent to Magistrate filed by All Plaintiffs. (Van Blargan, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 14, 2022
4 4 order Case Management Conference Scheduling Order Thu 07/14 2:22 PM
Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with telephonic case management conference to be held on 8/8/2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge John R. Adams. Judge John R. Adams on 7/14/2022.(L,J)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting,
Att: 2 Local Rule 30.1,
Att: 3 Magistrate Consent Form,
Att: 4 Budget,
Att: 5 ECF Policies and Procedures
Thursday, July 07, 2022
3 3 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement (atty event) Thu 07/07 4:49 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Menard, Inc., Menards. (Guice, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 06, 2022
2 2 oth_evt Magistrate Consent Form Issued by Intake Wed 07/06 8:15 AM
Magistrate Consent Form issued. (M,TL)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judge Wed 07/06 8:13 AM
Judge John R. Adams assigned to case (M,TL)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Wed 07/06 8:14 AM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp. (M,TL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 05, 2022
1 1 3 pgs cmp Notice of Removal Tue 07/05 5:06 PM
Notice of Removal from Summit County Common Pleas Court, case number CV-2022 06-1836 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 402, receipt number AOHNDC-11504205.. Filed by Menard, Inc. c/o Corporation Service Company, Menard, Inc., Menard, Inc. aka Menard, Inc., John Doe Contractor 1-10 c/o Corporation Service Company. (Guice, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 6 pgs Exhibit "A" - Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit "B" - Docket,
Att: 3 Exhibit "C" - Answer,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet