Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:Richard A Lanzillo
Case #: 1:22-cv-00211
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 The Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Case Filed:Jul 05, 2022
Terminated:Sep 12, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Jan 01, 2023 3:32 AM EST
Defendant
TOADFISH, LLC
Plaintiff
ANTHONY HAMMOND MURPHY
Represented By
Lawrence H. Fisher
Lawrence Fisher
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, October 14, 2022
7 7 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Atty) Fri 10/14 11:49 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ANTHONY HAMMOND MURPHY (Fisher, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 12, 2022
5 5 notice Notice of Settlement Mon 09/12 1:12 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by ANTHONY HAMMOND MURPHY (Fisher, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
order Order for Administrative Case Closing Mon 09/12 1:37 PM
ORDER FOR ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING. Counsel for the Plaintiff, Lawrence H. Fisher, Esq., as notified the Court that a settlement has been reached in this matter. See ECF No. 5. In light of this settlement agreement, the Clerk of Court is directed to mark this case ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED as of today's date. Nothing contained in this Order shall be considered a dismissal or disposition of this matter and the Court will retain jurisdiction should further proceedings regarding settlement become necessary. See Kokkonen v. Guardian Life Ins. Co. of Am. , 511 U.S. 375 (1994). Attorney Fisher is hereby ordered to file a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(i) on or before Wednesday, October 12, 2022. Should said Notice not be filed by that date, the Plaintiff is to file a written status report updating the Court on the progress made toward effectuating the settlement. Signed by United States Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on September 12, 2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jbh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 26, 2022
4 4 misc Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 07/26 3:56 PM
Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by ANTHONY HAMMOND MURPHY Answer due from TOADFISH, LLC on 9/15/2022. (Fisher, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 21, 2022
3 3 service Summons/Return of Service Returned Executed Thu 07/21 2:18 PM
SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by ANTHONY HAMMOND MURPHY. TOADFISH, LLC served on 7/11/2022, answer due 8/1/2022. (Fisher, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 06, 2022
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 07/06 8:16 AM
Summons Issued as to TOADFISH, LLC (keh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 05, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint (for Clerk of Court personnel only) Wed 07/06 8:15 AM
COMPLAINT against TOADFISH, LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-7174944), filed by ANTHONY HAMMOND MURPHY. (keh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet