Kegele et al v. Ford Motor Company
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Morrison C England, Jr |
Referred: | Carolyn K Delaney |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-01154 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 15:2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 01, 2022 |
Terminated: | Sep 13, 2022 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 28, 2022 12:49 AM PST |
Defendant
Ford Motor Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Dorobiala
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Spenser Henry
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Benjamin Kegele
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Jul 28 2022
ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 7/27/2022 ORDERING that Defendant Ford Motor Company's respond to the Complaint is due on 8/29/2022.(Reader, L) |
1. | 2021-22 Mustang Mach-E owners slap Ford with federal lawsuit over safety defect (freep.com) |
Submitted Thu 07/14/2022 | |
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Tuesday, September 13, 2022 | ||
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 09/13 7:56 AM
CASE CLOSED pursuant to12 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal.(Kastilahn, A) |
||
Thursday, September 08, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 09/08 1:49 PM
NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Thomas Dorobiala, Spenser Henry, Benjamin Kegele. (Desai, Aashish) |
|
Tuesday, August 30, 2022 | ||
order
Minute Order ~Util - 1 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Motions Submitted/Under Advisement Order on Motion to Dismiss
Tue 08/30 10:51 AM
MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the 10/27/2022 hearing on the Motion to Dismiss10 is VACATED and SUBMITTED without appearance and argument. The opposition or statement of non-opposition and reply due dates shall be filed in accordance with the original motion hearing date. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date. Any outstanding request for telephonic appearance is denied as moot. (Deutsch, S) |
||
Monday, August 29, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Dismiss
Mon 08/29 8:59 PM
MOTION to DISMISS by Ford Motor Company. Motion Hearing set for 10/27/2022 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Senior Judge Morrison C. England Jr..(Edwards, Randall) |
|
Att: 1 Defendant Ford Motor Company's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Complaint and to Strike Nationwide Class Allegations, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Erich Kemnitz in Support of Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint and to Strike Nationwide Class Allegations, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Order Granting Ford Motor Company's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint and to Strike Nationwide Class Allegations | ||
Thursday, July 28, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Thu 07/28 10:29 AM
ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 7/27/2022 ORDERING that Defendant Ford Motor Company's respond to the Complaint is due on 8/29/2022 |
|
Monday, July 25, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Mon 07/25 4:08 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time for Defendant Ford Motor Company to Respond to Complaint by Ford Motor Company.(Edwards, Randall) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order on Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint | ||
7 | 7
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 07/25 1:20 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Edwards, Randall) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 07/25 1:15 PM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Kelsey M. Larson on behalf of Ford Motor Company. Attorney Larson, Kelsey M. added. (Larson, Kelsey) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 07/25 1:08 PM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Randall William Edwards on behalf of Ford Motor Company. Attorney Edwards, Randall William added. (Edwards, Randall) |
|
Thursday, July 14, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 07/14 12:49 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: All Defendants. (Desai, Aashish) |
|
Tuesday, July 05, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Civil New Case Documents for MCE
Tue 07/05 10:53 AM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Mena-Sanchez, L) |
|
Att: 1 Consent Form, | ||
Att: 2 VDRP | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons
Tue 07/05 10:52 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Ford Motor Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Aashish Y. Desai* *Desai Law Firm, P.C.* *3200 Bristol Street, Suite 650* *Costa Mesa, CA 92626*. (Mena-Sanchez, L) |
|
Friday, July 01, 2022 | ||
1 | 1 15 pgs COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Benjamin Kegele, Spenser Henry, Thomas Dorobiala. Attorney Desai, Aashish Y. added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10310741)(Desai, Aashish) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet |