Delaware District Court
Judge:Richard G Andrews
Referred: Sherry R Fallon
Case #: 1:22-cv-00904
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:1 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Jul 06, 2022
Last checked: Monday Jan 02, 2023 3:25 AM EST
Defendant
Amazon Web Services, Inc.
Represented By
Lisa Phillips
contact info
Jennifer Ying
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Alan M. Fisch
contact info
R. William Sigler
contact info
Jack B. Blumenfeld
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Jeffrey Saltman
contact info
Plaintiff
Acceleration Bay, LLC
Represented By
Aaron M. Frankel
contact info
Paul J. Andre
contact info
Jonathan A. Choa
Potter Anderson & Corroon, LLP
contact info
Philip A. Rovner
Potter Anderson & Corroon, LLP
contact info
James R. Hannah
contact info
Michael H. Lee
contact info
Christina M. Finn
contact info
Lisa Kobialka
contact info

GPO Oct 19 2023
MEMORANDUM OPINION: Providing claim construction for multiple terms in U.S. Patent Nos. 6,701,344, 6,714,966, 6,732,147, 6,829,634, and 6,910,069. Within five days the parties shall submit a proposed order consistent with this Memorandum Opinion. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/19/2023. (nms)
GPO Sep 12 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/12/2024. (nms)
GPO Sep 20 2024
MEMORANDUM ORDER: Regarding the testimony of Mr. Hayden; Ms. Kindler's "portfolio licenses; Plaintiff's advancement of a new theory; and the motion to strike Mr. Gunderson's supplemental report which is denied (see D.I. 234, 228, 225, 235, and 238) (see Memorandum Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/20/2024. (nms)

Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, January 06, 2025
358 358 misc Redacted Document Mon 01/06 3:29 PM
REDACTED VERSION of354 Declaration of Aaron M. Frankel by Acceleration Bay, LLC.(Rovner, Philip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 11
357 357 misc Redacted Document Mon 01/06 3:27 PM
REDACTED VERSION of353 Reply Brief by Acceleration Bay, LLC. (Rovner, Philip)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
356 356 notice Notice re Attorney Appearance - Requesting Removal of Co-Counsel Thu 01/02 3:15 PM
NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Alan M. Fisch, R. William Sigler, Jeffrey M. Saltman, Lisa N. Phillips, Nathan K. Cummings, Brandon P. Evans, Lauren Hutchison, Ken K. Fung and the law firm of Fisch Sigler LLP as co-counsel.. (Ying, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
355 355 misc Redacted Document Thu 01/02 12:15 PM
REDACTED VERSION of352 Reply Brief by Amazon Web Services, Inc.. (Ying, Jennifer)
Related: [-]