Florida Middle District Court
Judge:John E Steele
Referred: Nicholas P Mizell
Case #: 2:22-cv-00408
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Jul 06, 2022
Terminated:Feb 02, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jan 02, 2023 4:34 AM EST
Defendant
City of Cape Coral
Represented By
Christopher J. Stearns
Johnson, Anselmo, Murdoch, Burke, Piper
contact info
Jonathan Howard Railey
Johnson, Anselmo, Murdoch, Burke, Piper & Hochman, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Bridget Jackson
Represented By
Kristie Ann Scott
Light Path Law, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, February 02, 2024
33 33 order Judgment Fri 02/02 9:01 AM
JUDGMENT in favor of City of Cape Coral against Bridget Jackson. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 2/2/2024. (LSS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
32 32 31 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Thu 02/01 1:47 PM
OPINION & ORDER granting Defendant's 28 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly, terminate all pending motions and deadlines as moot, and close the file. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 2/1/2024. (FMB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
31 31 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 11/15 2:46 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re28 MOTION for Final Summary Judgment filed by City of Cape Coral. (Railey, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
30 30 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 11/01 11:44 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re28 MOTION for Final Summary Judgment Response to Defendant's Statement of Undisputed Facts Contained Within its Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Bridget Jackson. (Scott, Kristie)
Related: [-]
29 29 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 11/01 11:37 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re28 MOTION for Final Summary Judgment filed by Bridget Jackson.(Scott, Kristie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit Index,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex.1,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex. 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex. 4,
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex. 5,
Att: 7 Exhibit Ex. 6,
Att: 8 Exhibit Ex. 7,
Att: 9 Exhibit Ex. 8,
Att: 10 Exhibit Ex. 9
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
28 28 motion Summary Judgment Wed 10/11 12:29 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by City of Cape Coral.(Railey, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit Index
Thursday, September 14, 2023
27 27 adr Mediation report Thu 09/14 7:38 PM
MEDIATION report Hearing held on Zoom. Hearing outcome: Impasse.. (Evans-Putney, Karen)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 08, 2023
26 26 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 09/08 1:23 PM
ORDER denying 23 plaintiff's motion to amend the scheduling order. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 9/8/2023. (JMM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 06, 2023
25 25 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 09/06 9:39 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re23 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by City of Cape Coral. (Railey, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 01, 2023
24 24 order Order Fri 09/01 11:03 AM
TEXT ORDER directing defendants to file an expedited response to plaintiff's motion to amend the scheduling order (Doc. 23 ) by September 7, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 9/1/2023. (JMM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 31, 2023
23 23 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 08/31 1:17 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Bridget Jackson. (Scott, Kristie)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 21, 2023
22 22 notice Notice of mediation conference/hearing Mon 08/21 3:19 PM
NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on September 11, 2023 at 1:30pm before Karen Evans, Esq.. (Scott, Kristie)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 18, 2023
21 21 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Fri 08/18 9:29 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 20 joint motion to mediate by videoconference. The court is satisfied with the parties' assurances that mediation by videoconference would be just as likely to resolve this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 8/18/2023. (JMM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 17, 2023
20 20 misc Stipulation Thu 08/17 4:10 PM
STIPULATION to Conduct Remote Mediation by Bridget Jackson. (Scott, Kristie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 21, 2022
19 19 answer Answer to amended complaint Wed 12/21 10:25 AM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to 18 Amended Complaint, by City of Cape Coral.(Railey, Jonathan) Modified text on 12/21/2022 (JK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 07, 2022
18 18 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 12/07 3:22 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against City of Cape Coral with Jury Demand. filed by Bridget Jackson.(Scott, Kristie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Main Document
Wednesday, November 09, 2022
17 17 order Case Management / FLSA / ADA / Social Security / Scheduling Order Wed 11/09 12:32 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 12/8/2022, Discovery due by 9/13/2023, Dispositive motions due by 10/11/2023 Pretrial statement due by 2/9/2024 Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 6/6/2023 Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 7/7/2023 Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/23/2024 at 09:30 AM before Judge John E. Steele, Jury Trial term 3/4/2024 at 09:00 AM before Judge John E. Steele, Conduct mediation hearing by 9/20/2023. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 11/9/2022. (WRW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 08, 2022
16 16 minutes Preliminary pretrial conference Tue 11/08 11:51 AM
Minute Entry. Telephonic Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell: PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 11/8/2022. (DIGITAL) (WRW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 18, 2022
notice Notice of hearing Tue 10/18 12:38 PM
NOTICE of hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 11/8/2022 at 10:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. All parties shall appear telephonically. The toll-free teleconference number is 1-877-873-8018. The access code is 5997085. You will then be prompted to enter a participant security code: 22408. All parties are encouraged to utilize a landline or similarly stable connection free of ambient interference to avoid having any portion of the conference conducted without them. (WRW)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 30, 2022
notice Notice canceling hearing Fri 09/30 1:00 PM
NOTICE: Due to Hurricane Ian, the hearing previously scheduled for 10/6/2022 at 10:15 a.m. is POSTPONED and will be rescheduled by separate notice. The Fort Myers courthouse will be closed through at least Friday, October 7. Updates will be posted to the court's website (www.flmd.uscourts.gov) as they become available. If you have a time-sensitive matter in the meantime, contact the Tampa division clerk's office at 813-301-5400. (SRW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 24, 2022
notice Notice of rescheduling hearing (time only) Wed 08/24 9:53 AM
NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING (AS TO TIME ONLY): The Preliminary Pretrial Conference hearing previously scheduled for 10/6/2022 at 10:00 AM is rescheduled to 10/6/2022 at 10:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. All telephonic instructions remain the same.(WRW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 18, 2022
12 12 misc Case Management Report Thu 08/18 2:36 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Scott, Kristie)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 08/18 2:35 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Bridget Jackson. (Scott, Kristie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 09, 2022
notice Notice of hearing Tue 08/09 9:16 AM
NOTICE of hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/6/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. Parties to file a Case Management Report by 9/12/2022. All parties shall appear telephonically. The toll-free teleconference number is 1-877-873-8018. The access code is 5997085. You will then be prompted to enter a participant security code: 22408. All parties are encouraged to utilize a landline or similarly stable connection free of ambient interference to avoid having any portion of the conference conducted without them. (WRW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 04, 2022
9 9 notice Notice of appearance Thu 08/04 9:50 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J. Stearns on behalf of City of Cape Coral (Stearns, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 03, 2022
8 8 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 08/03 10:31 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re4 Civil Action Order by City of Cape Coral. (Railey, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 08/03 10:28 AM
Defendant's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by City of Cape Coral.(Railey, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of appearance Wed 08/03 8:50 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Howard Railey on behalf of City of Cape Coral (Railey, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 21, 2022
5 5 service Summons returned executed Thu 07/21 12:02 PM
RETURN of service executed on 07/14/2022 by Bridget Jackson as to City of Cape Coral. (Scott, Kristie)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 11, 2022
4 4 order Civil Action Order Mon 07/11 3:45 PM
CIVIL Action Order. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 7/11/2022. (SPB)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons issued Mon 07/11 3:42 PM
SUMMONS issued as to City of Cape Coral. (SPB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 07, 2022
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 07/07 12:10 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John E. Steele and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:22-cv-00408-JES-NPM. (APV)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 06, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 07/06 5:09 PM
COMPLAINT against City of Cape Coral with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number BFLMDC-19745826) filed by BRIDGET JACKSON.(Scott, Kristie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons,
Att: 3 Notice of Lead Counsel,
Att: 4 Notice of Related Action