Texas Western District Court
Judge:Alan D Albright
Referred: Derek T Gilliland
Case #: 6:22-cv-00737
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Jul 06, 2022
Terminated:Jan 24, 2023
Last checked: Monday Jan 02, 2023 3:20 AM CST
Defendant
G-III Apparel Group, Ltd.
Represented By
Neil J. McNabnay
Fish & Richardson, PC
contact info
Michael Jay Zinna
Kelley Drye & Warren LLP
contact info
Vincent Marc Ferraro
Kelley Drye & Warren LLP
contact info
Lance E. Wyatt, Jr.
Fish & Richardson P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
M4siz Limited
Represented By
William P. Ramey, III
Ramey LLP
contact info
Jeffrey Eugene Kubiak
The Kubiak Law Firm, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, January 24, 2023
20 20 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Hearings Tue 01/24 4:13 PM
ORDER Cancelling18 Order - Show Cause Hearing. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (sm3)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 01/24 1:15 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by M4siz Limited (Ramey, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 18, 2023
18 18 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 01/19 8:21 AM
ORDER Setting Zoom Show Cause for 1/25/2023 02:00 PM before Judge Derek T. Gilliland. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (bot2)
Related: [-]
17 17 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Wed 01/18 4:02 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to M4siz Limited. Show Cause Hearing set for 1/25/2023 02:00 PM before Judge Derek T. Gilliland. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (sm3)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 13, 2023
notice Deficiency Notice Fri 01/13 10:27 AM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re 16 Notice (Other) (sm3)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 12, 2023
16 16 notice Notice Thu 01/12 9:54 AM
NOTICE Unopposed Notice for Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Original Complaint by M4siz Limited (Ramey, William)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Answer Deadline Thu 01/12 10:12 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: (sm3)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 05, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 01/05 3:29 PM
Text Order DENYING15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re15 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer entered by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mklc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 04, 2023
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 01/04 9:56 AM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by M4siz Limited.. Motions referred to Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (Ramey, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
utility Set/Reset Answer Deadline Wed 01/04 10:34 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: G-III Apparel Group, Ltd. answer due 2/3/2023. (sm3)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 18, 2022
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 11/18 10:45 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by M4siz Limited.. Motions referred to Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (Ramey, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, October 21, 2022
13 13 notice Notice Fri 10/21 1:10 PM
NOTICE Unopposed Notice for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint by M4siz Limited (Ramey, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 07, 2022
12 12 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 10/07 3:50 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Derek T. Gilliland. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot4)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 21, 2022
utility Set/Reset Answer Deadline Wed 09/21 8:52 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: G-III Apparel Group, Ltd. answer due 10/21/2022. (sm3)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 20, 2022
11 11 notice Notice Tue 09/20 5:31 PM
NOTICE Unopposed Notice for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint by M4siz Limited (Ramey, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 16, 2022
misc Remark (No Doc#) Sat 09/17 10:22 PM
Parties shall comply with Judge Albright's updated[LINK:standing orders] available by clicking the included hyperlinks. The updated orders are as follows: 1. [LINK:Standing Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases] , 2. [LINK:Amended Standing Order On Pretrial Procedures and Requirements in Civil Cases] . (bot4)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 02, 2022
10 10 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 09/02 9:09 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Vincent Marc Ferraro on behalf of G-III Apparel Group, Ltd.. Attorney Vincent Marc Ferraro added to party G-III Apparel Group, Ltd.(pty:dft) (Ferraro, Vincent)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 09/02 9:06 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Jay Zinna on behalf of G-III Apparel Group, Ltd.. Attorney Michael Jay Zinna added to party G-III Apparel Group, Ltd.(pty:dft) (Zinna, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 01, 2022
8 8 notice Notice Mon 08/01 4:25 PM
NOTICE of Agreed Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by G-III Apparel Group, Ltd. re1 Complaint (Wyatt, Lance)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 08/01 4:17 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Neil J. McNabnay on behalf of G-III Apparel Group, Ltd.. Attorney Neil J. McNabnay added to party G-III Apparel Group, Ltd.(pty:dft) (McNabnay, Neil)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 14, 2022
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 07/14 12:45 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by M4siz Limited. G-III Apparel Group, Ltd. served on 7/12/2022, answer due 8/2/2022. (Ramey, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 06, 2022
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 07/08 10:40 AM
Summons Issued as to G-III Apparel Group, Ltd. (sv)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Certificate of Interested Parties Wed 07/06 3:13 PM
Certificate of Interested Parties by M4siz Limited. (Ramey, William)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 07/06 3:12 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by M4siz Limited. (Ramey, William)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Wed 07/06 3:11 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ramey, William)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 07/06 3:11 PM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-16222000), filed by M4siz Limited.(Ramey, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A & B,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Remark (No Doc#) Fri 07/08 10:34 AM
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 07/08 10:41 AM
Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (sv)
Related: [-]