Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Edward L Morris
Case #: 4:22-bk-41537
Case Filed:Jul 07, 2022
Creditor Meeting:Aug 09, 2022

Debtor
Matthews Steel LLC
310 S Oak St Ste 216
Roanoke, TX 76262-6333
Represented By
Nicholas C. Inman
Allmand Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Roddrick Breon Newhouse
401 Century Pkwy Unit 715
Allen, TX 75013
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75202


Docket last updated: 07/07/2022 12:02 PM CDT
Thursday, July 07, 2022
1 1 caseupld Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 (case upload) Thu 07/07 9:46 AM
Non-Individual Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition (case upload) filed by Nicholas C. Inman of Allmand Law Firm, PLLC on behalf of Matthews Steel LLC. (Inman, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of creditors 7 bus. no asset - AutoAssign Thu 07/07 9:48 AM
First Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/9/2022 at 09:00 AM by TELEPHONE. (Inman, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of appearance and request for notice Thu 07/07 11:07 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Charles W. Gameros Jr. filed by Creditor Red Steel Company. (Gameros, Charles)
Related: [-]