Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Indira Talwani
Case #: 1:22-cv-11091
Nature of Suit893 Other Statutes - Environmental Matters
Cause42:4321 Review of Agency Action-Environment
Case Filed:Jul 07, 2022
Terminated:Oct 13, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 03, 2023 3:55 AM EST
Defendant
JOHN A. ATILANO, II
Represented By
Mark Brown
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Luther L. Hajek
U.S. Department Of Justice, Environment And Natural Resource
contact info
Perry M. Rosen
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Mark Arthur Brown, Sr.
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
United States Department of the Interior
Represented By
Mark Brown
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Luther L. Hajek
U.S. Department Of Justice, Environment And Natural Resource
contact info
Perry M. Rosen
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Mark Arthur Brown, Sr.
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
United States Department of Defense
Represented By
Mark Brown
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Luther L. Hajek
U.S. Department Of Justice, Environment And Natural Resource
contact info
Perry M. Rosen
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Mark Arthur Brown, Sr.
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
United States Department of Commerce
Represented By
Mark Brown
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Luther L. Hajek
U.S. Department Of Justice, Environment And Natural Resource
contact info
Perry M. Rosen
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Mark Arthur Brown, Sr.
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
United States Army Corps of Engineers
Represented By
Mark Brown
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Luther L. Hajek
U.S. Department Of Justice, Environment And Natural Resource
contact info
Perry M. Rosen
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Mark Arthur Brown, Sr.
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
SCOTT A. SPELLMON
Represented By
Mark Brown
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Luther L. Hajek
U.S. Department Of Justice, Environment And Natural Resource
contact info
Perry M. Rosen
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Mark Arthur Brown, Sr.
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
GINA M. RAIMONDO
Washington, DC 20230
Represented By
Mark Brown
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Luther L. Hajek
U.S. Department Of Justice, Environment And Natural Resource
contact info
Perry M. Rosen
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Mark Arthur Brown, Sr.
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION, NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE
Represented By
Mark Brown
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Luther L. Hajek
U.S. Department Of Justice, Environment And Natural Resource
contact info
Perry M. Rosen
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Mark Arthur Brown, Sr.
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
CATHERINE MARZIN
Represented By
Mark Brown
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Luther L. Hajek
U.S. Department Of Justice, Environment And Natural Resource
contact info
Perry M. Rosen
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Mark Arthur Brown, Sr.
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
AMANDA LEFTON
Represented By
Mark Brown
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Luther L. Hajek
U.S. Department Of Justice, Environment And Natural Resource
contact info
Perry M. Rosen
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Mark Arthur Brown, Sr.
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
DEB HAALAND
Represented By
Mark Brown
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Luther L. Hajek
U.S. Department Of Justice, Environment And Natural Resource
contact info
Perry M. Rosen
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Mark Arthur Brown, Sr.
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
LAURA DANIEL-DAVIS
Represented By
Mark Brown
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Luther L. Hajek
U.S. Department Of Justice, Environment And Natural Resource
contact info
Perry M. Rosen
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Mark Arthur Brown, Sr.
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Bureau of Ocean Energy Management
Represented By
Mark Brown
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Luther L. Hajek
U.S. Department Of Justice, Environment And Natural Resource
contact info
Perry M. Rosen
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Mark Arthur Brown, Sr.
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
LLOYD J. AUSTIN, III
Represented By
Mark Brown
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Luther L. Hajek
U.S. Department Of Justice, Environment And Natural Resource
contact info
Perry M. Rosen
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Mark Arthur Brown, Sr.
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
Vineyard Wind 1 LLC
Represented By
David T. Buente
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Brooklyn Hildebrandt
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
James Wedeking
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Joseph T. Zaleski
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Peter Christopher Whitfield
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Jack W. Pirozzolo
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Peter C. Whitfield
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
LONG ISLAND COMMERCIAL FISHING ASSOC., INC.
Represented By
Ira H. Zaleznik
Lawson & Weitzen, LLP
contact info
Connor William Mighell
Texas Public Policy Foundation
contact info
Theodore Hadzi-Antich
Texas Public Policy Foundation
contact info
Robert Henneke
Texas Public Policy Foundation
contact info
Plaintiff
NAT. W., INC.
Represented By
Ira H. Zaleznik
Lawson & Weitzen, LLP
contact info
Connor William Mighell
Texas Public Policy Foundation
contact info
Theodore Hadzi-Antich
Texas Public Policy Foundation
contact info
Robert Henneke
Texas Public Policy Foundation
contact info
Plaintiff
OLD SQUAW FISHERIES, INC.
Represented By
Ira H. Zaleznik
Lawson & Weitzen, LLP
contact info
Connor William Mighell
Texas Public Policy Foundation
contact info
Theodore Hadzi-Antich
Texas Public Policy Foundation
contact info
Robert Henneke
Texas Public Policy Foundation
contact info
Plaintiff
HERITAGE FISHERIES, INC.
Represented By
Connor William Mighell
Texas Public Policy Foundation
contact info
Theodore Hadzi-Antich
Texas Public Policy Foundation
contact info
Robert Henneke
Texas Public Policy Foundation
contact info
Plaintiff
SEAFREEZE SHORESIDE, INC.
Represented By
Ira H. Zaleznik
Lawson & Weitzen, LLP
contact info
Connor William Mighell
Texas Public Policy Foundation
contact info
Theodore Hadzi-Antich
Texas Public Policy Foundation
contact info
Robert Henneke
Texas Public Policy Foundation
contact info
Plaintiff
XIII NORTHEAST FISHERY SECTOR, INC.
Represented By
Ira H. Zaleznik
Lawson & Weitzen, LLP
contact info
Connor William Mighell
Texas Public Policy Foundation
contact info
Theodore Hadzi-Antich
Texas Public Policy Foundation
contact info
Robert Henneke
Texas Public Policy Foundation
contact info

GPO May 25 2023
Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered denying 115 Motion to Stay. See attached Memorandum and Order. (Talwani, Indira)
GPO Sep 25 2023
Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiffs' Motions to Strike Documents from and Supplement the Administrative Record, Seafreeze, Mot. to Strike [1:22-cv-11091 Doc No. 56]; Responsible, Mot. to Strike [1:22-cv-11172 Doc. No. 43], are DENIED.IT IS SO ORDERED. Please see attached. (Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-11091-IT, 1:22-cv-11172-IT) (Currie, Haley)
GPO Oct 12 2023
Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiffs have not shown that Defendants acted arbitrarily, capriciously, or otherwise unlawfully. Accordingly, Defendants and Vineyard Wind's Motions for Summary Judgment, 1:22-cv-11091, Doc. Nos. 72, 86; 1:22-cv-11172, Doc. Nos. 59, 73, are GRANTED and Plaintiffs' Motions for Summary Judgment, 1:22-cv-11091, Doc. No. 66; 1:22-cv-11172, Doc. No. 52, are DENIED.IT IS SO ORDERED. Please see attached. Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-11091-IT, 1:22-cv-11172-IT (Kelly, Danielle)

Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, May 05, 2025
153 153 appeal Writ of Certiorari Denied - Supreme Court Tue 05/06 9:43 AM
Order entered from the U.S. Supreme Court. The Petition for a Writ of Certiorari is Denied. (MAP)
Related: [-]