Florida Southern District Court
Judge:William P Dimitrouleas
Case #: 9:22-cv-80996
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Jul 07, 2022
Terminated:Jul 08, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 04, 2023 4:23 AM EST
Defendant
Nordia Campbell
13101 Mahogany Dr.
Boynton Beach, FL 33436
Defendant
Giorbany Destin
13101 Mahogany Dr.
Boynton Beach, FL 33436
Defendant
Shadean McLean
13101 Mahogany Dr.
Boynton Beach, FL 33436
Plaintiff
Advenir@LaCosta, LLC
Represented By
Ryan Ruffner McCain
Barfield Mccain PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, July 19, 2022
8 8 service Acknowledgment of Receipt Tue 07/19 10:58 AM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT as to6 Transmittal Letter Sent. (scn)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 08, 2022
6 6 misc Transmittal Letter Sent to State Court - FORM Fri 07/08 10:09 AM
Transmittal Letter Sent with DE #5 to: 15th Judicial Circuit in and for Palm Beach County. State Court Case Number: 502022CC005739XXXSB (scn)
Related: [-]
5 5 4 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Fri 07/08 10:07 AM
ORDER REMANDING CASE TO STATE COURT: It is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Clerk is directed to REMAND this case to state court, CLOSE this case, and DENY any pending motions as moot. Closing Case. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/8/2022. See attached document for full details. (scn)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Compliance Fri 07/08 10:14 AM
NOTICE of Compliance re6 Transmittal Letter Sent,5 Order Remanding Case. DE #5 and #6 mailed to defendants per order at DE #5. (scn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 07, 2022
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 07/07 6:17 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Shadean McLean. (jas)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) Thu 07/07 6:15 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT ) Filing fee $402.00. IFP Filed, filed by Shadean McLean. (jas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 State Court Documents
order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Thu 07/07 6:16 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Ryon M. McCabe is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jas)
Related: [-]
order Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction - ELECTRONIC CASE Thu 07/07 6:18 PM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. State Court Complaint not included. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the State Court Records attached within 24 hours. (jas)
Related: [-]