Golden v. Verizon
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Ronnie Abrams |
Referred: | Jennifer E Willis |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-05757 |
Nature of Suit | 445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment |
Cause | 42:12101 The Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990 |
Case Filed: | Jul 06, 2022 |
Last checked: Monday Jan 02, 2023 4:15 AM EST |
Defendant
Verizon
|
|
Plaintiff
Timothy J. Golden
3584 Tuscala St.
Seaford, NY 11783 |
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
misc
Mailing Receipt
Fri 04/26 9:10 AM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 53. Mailed to: Timothy J. Golden 3584 Tuscala St. Seaford, NY 11783. (nb) |
||
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
53 | 53
order
Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Hearings
Thu 04/25 3:51 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:52 Letter filed by Timothy J. Golden. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. The in-person conference is adjourned until June 21, 2024 at 11:30 A.M. and will be held in Courtroom 1506 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse. Mr. Golden is directed to attend the conference even if he has not found counsel by that time. ( Status Conference set for 6/21/2024 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 1506, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Ronnie Abrams.) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 4/25/2024) (ate) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
misc
Mailing Receipt
Wed 04/24 4:05 PM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 51. Mailed to: Timothy J. Golden 3584 Tuscala St. Seaford, NY 11783. (vn) |
||
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
52 | 52
misc
Letter
Tue 04/23 4:58 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Timothy J. Golden dated 4/23/2024 re: Request for Extension of Time of 45 days to appear for an in-person conference. Document filed by Timothy J. Golden. (rro) |
|
51 | 51
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Tue 04/23 4:58 PM
ORDER: Due to a scheduling conflict, the conference currently scheduled for April 26, 2024, at 2:30 p.m. is hereby rescheduled to April 26, 2024 at 1:00 p.m. The conference will take place in Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007, in Courtroom 318. If the date or time is inconvenient for either party, they shall promptly notify the Court. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this Order to Mr. Golden. ( Case Management Conference set for 4/26/2024 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 318, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Ronnie Abrams.) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 4/23/2024) (ate) |