California Northern District Court
Judge:Lucy H Koh
Referred: Paul Singh Grewal
Case #: 3:14-cv-04062
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Case Filed:Sep 08, 2014
Last checked: Sunday May 10, 2015 9:21 AM PDT
Defendant
Dreamworks Animation SKG Inc.
Represented By
Shannon Edward Mader
Gibson Dunn And Crutcher LLP
contact info
Rodney Joseph Stone
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher
contact info
Daniel Glen Swanson
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Defendant
ImageMovers
Represented By
Emily Johnson Henn
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Defendant
ImageMovers Digital
Represented By
Emily Johnson Henn
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Deborah A. Garza
Covington And Burling LLP
contact info
Cortlin Hall Lannin
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Thomas A. Isaacson
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Defendant
Lucasfilm Ltd. LLC
Represented By
Emily Johnson Henn
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Deborah A. Garza
Covington And Burling LLP
contact info
Cortlin Hall Lannin
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Thomas A. Isaacson
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Defendant
Pixar
Represented By
Emily Johnson Henn
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Deborah A. Garza
Covington And Burling LLP
contact info
Cortlin Hall Lannin
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Thomas A. Isaacson
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Defendant
Sony Pictures Animation
Represented By
Stephen V. Bomse
Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe
contact info
Paul Francis Rugani
Orrick, Herrington Sutcliffe
contact info
David Mark Goldstein, Esq.
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
contact info
Defendant
Sony Pictures Imageworks
Represented By
Stephen V. Bomse
Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe
contact info
Paul Francis Rugani
Orrick, Herrington Sutcliffe
contact info
David Mark Goldstein, Esq.
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
contact info
Defendant
The Walt Disney Company
Represented By
Emily Johnson Henn
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Deborah A. Garza
Covington And Burling LLP
contact info
Cortlin Hall Lannin
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Thomas A. Isaacson
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Defendant
Blue Sky Studios, Inc.
Represented By
William Faulkner
Mcmanis Faulkner
contact info
Jonathan Bradley Pitt
Williams And Connolly LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert A. Nitsch, Jr.
Represented By
Steve W. Berman
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
Brent W Johnson
Cohen Milstein Sellers And Toll PLLC
contact info
Bruce Van Spiva
The Spiva Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Matthew W Ruan
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll
contact info
Richard L. Grossman
Pillsbury & Coleman, LLP
contact info
Jeffrey Benjamin Dubner
Cohen Milstein Sellers And Toll PLLC
contact info
Daniel A. Small
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC
contact info
Steven Gerald Sklaver
Susman Godfrey LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Georgia Cano
Represented By
Steve W. Berman
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
Polina Pecherskaya
contact info
Matthew Robert Berry
Susman Godfrey LLP
contact info
Kalpana Srinivasan
Susman Godfrey
contact info
Marc M. Seltzer
Susman Godfrey LLP
contact info
Craig Justin Ackermann
Ackermann & Tilajef, P.C.
contact info
Jordan Lee Talge
Susman Godfrey, LLP
contact info
Ari Nathan Cherniak
Hammondlaw, PC
contact info
John Edward Schiltz
Susman Godfrey LLP
contact info
Julian Ari Hammond
Hammondlaw, PC
contact info
Jeffrey Benjamin Dubner
Cohen Milstein Sellers And Toll PLLC
contact info
Steven Gerald Sklaver
Susman Godfrey LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
David Wentworth
Represented By
Steve W. Berman
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
Ashley A Bede
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
Jeff D Friedman
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
Shana E. Scarlett
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
Jeffrey Benjamin Dubner
Cohen Milstein Sellers And Toll PLLC
contact info
Steven Gerald Sklaver
Susman Godfrey LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Digital Domain 3.0, Inc.
Terminated: 11/05/2014


1. Judge Rejects Antitrust Lawsuit Over Studio Anti-Poaching Pacts (hollywoodreporter.com)
Submitted Mon 04/06/2015
Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, January 14, 2015
83 83 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant ImageMovers, LLC without prejudice by Georgia Cano, Robert A. Nitsch, Jr, David Wentworth (Dubner, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/14/2015)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 13, 2015
82 82 NOTICE of Appearance by William Faulkner Notice of Appearance of John E. Schmidtlein and Jonathan B. Pitt (Faulkner, William) (Filed on 1/13/2015)
Related: [-]
81 81 STIPULATION re Production of Electronically Stored Information filed by Georgia Cano. (Sklaver, Steven) (Filed on 1/13/2015)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 12, 2015
80 80 Proposed Order re71 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof by Blue Sky Studios, Inc., Digital Domain 3.0, Inc., Dreamworks Animation SKG Inc., ImageMovers, ImageMovers Digital, Lucasfilm Ltd. LLC, Pixar, Sony Pictures Animation, Sony Pictures Imageworks, The Walt Disney Company. (Mader, Shannon) (Filed on 1/12/2015)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 09, 2015
79 79 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ADMINISTRATION MOTION BY DEFENDANTS BLUE SKY STUDIOS AND SONY PICTURES TO SEAL EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS THE CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Blue Sky Studios, Inc., Sony Pictures Animation, Sony Pictures Imageworks.(Faulkner, William) (Filed on 1/9/2015)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Pitt,
Att: 2 Declaration Henn,
Att: 3 Proposed Order,
Att: 4 Exhibit Redacted Version,
Att: 5 Exhibit Unredacted Version,
Att: 6 Exhibit Redacted Version,
Att: 7 Exhibit Unredacted Version,
Att: 8 Exhibit Redacted Version,
Att: 9 Exhibit Unredacted Version,
Att: 10 Exhibit Redacted Version,
Att: 11 Exhibit Unredacted Version,
Att: 12 Exhibit Redacted Version,
Att: 13 Exhibit Unredacted Version,
Att: 14 Exhibit Redacted Version,
Att: 15 Exhibit Unredacted Version
78 78 Declaration of David M. Goldstein in Support of75 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed byImageMovers, ImageMovers Digital, Lucasfilm Ltd. LLC, Pixar, The Walt Disney Company. Related [+] (Henn, Emily) (Filed on 1/9/2015)
Related: [-] 75
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G
77 77 Declaration of Jonathan B. Pitt in Support of75 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed byImageMovers, ImageMovers Digital, Lucasfilm Ltd. LLC, Pixar, The Walt Disney Company. Related [+] (Henn, Emily) (Filed on 1/9/2015)
Related: [-] 75
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7
76 76 Request for Judicial Notice In Support of 75 Motion to Dismiss filed by ImageMovers, ImageMovers Digital, Lucasfilm Ltd. LLC, Pixar, The Walt Disney Company.(Henn, Emily) (Filed on 1/9/2015) Modified on 1/13/2015 (cv, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit J,
Att: 11 Exhibit K,
Att: 12 Exhibit L,
Att: 13 Exhibit M
75 75 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint filed by ImageMovers, ImageMovers Digital, Lucasfilm Ltd. LLC, Pixar, The Walt Disney Company. Motion Hearing set for 3/26/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 2/9/2015. Replies due by 3/2/2015.(Henn, Emily) (Filed on 1/9/2015) (Hearing Date Approved by CMO - sms, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/13/2015 (cv, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
74 74 Declaration of Vinaleth Vinnie Bowling in Support of71 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof filed byBlue Sky Studios, Inc., Dreamworks Animation SKG Inc., ImageMovers, ImageMovers Digital, Lucasfilm Ltd. LLC, Pixar, Sony Pictures Animation, Sony Pictures Imageworks, The Walt Disney Company. Related [+] (Mader, Shannon) (Filed on 1/9/2015)
Related: [-] 71
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
73 73 Declaration of Ellen Shin in Support of71 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof filed byBlue Sky Studios, Inc., Dreamworks Animation SKG Inc., ImageMovers, ImageMovers Digital, Lucasfilm Ltd. LLC, Pixar, Sony Pictures Animation, Sony Pictures Imageworks, The Walt Disney Company. Related [+] (Mader, Shannon) (Filed on 1/9/2015)
Related: [-] 71
72 72 Declaration of Shannon Mader in Support of71 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof filed byDreamworks Animation SKG Inc.. Related [+] (Mader, Shannon) (Filed on 1/9/2015)
Related: [-] 71
71 71 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof filed by Dreamworks Animation SKG Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/23/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 2/9/2015. Replies due by 3/2/2015. (Mader, Shannon) (Filed on 1/9/2015)
Related: [-]