California Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Dennis Montali
Case #: 1:22-bk-10256
Case Filed:Jul 07, 2022
Creditor Meeting:Oct 11, 2022
Claims Deadline:Sep 15, 2022

Debtor
Sandra Lee Sheffield
1153 Hexem Ave
Santa Rosa, CA 95404-2555
Represented By
Andrea Michaelsen
contact info
Sandra Lee Sheffield
Pro Se
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
David Burchard
P.O. Box 8059
Foster City, CA 94404
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee / SR
Office of the United States Trustee Phillip J. Burton Federal Building 450 Golden Gate Ave. 5th Fl., #05-0153
San Francisco, CA 94102


Docket last updated: 04/08/2024 3:39 PM PDT
Thursday, July 07, 2022
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)([LINK 22-10256 ) [misc,volp13] ( 313.00). Receipt number A32015416, amount $ 313.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)
1 1 Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual, Fee Amount $313. Filed by Sandra Lee Sheffield. Incomplete Filings due by 07/21/2022. Order Meeting of Creditors due by 08/8/2022. (Michaelsen, Andrea)
Related: [-]
2 2 Statement of Social Security Number. Filed by Debtor Sandra Lee Sheffield (Michaelsen, Andrea)
Related: [-]
3 3 Order to File Required Documents and Notice of Automatic Dismissal. (rdr)
Related: [-]