California Central District Court
Judge:Josephine L Staton
Referred: Margo A Rocconi
Case #: 2:22-cv-04664
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Jul 08, 2022
Terminated:Dec 05, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 04, 2023 12:58 AM PST
Defendant
Cedars-Sinai Health System
Represented By
Christopher K Whang
Jeffer Mangels Butler And Mitchell LLP
contact info
Stuart K Tubis
Jeffer Mangels Butler And Mitchell LLP
contact info
Martin H Orlick
Jeffer Mangels Butler And Mitchell LLP
contact info
Marta Maria Fernandez
Jeffer Mangels Butler And Marmaro LLP
contact info
Defendant
Cedars-Sinai Medical Center
Represented By
Christopher K Whang
Jeffer Mangels Butler And Mitchell LLP
contact info
Stuart K Tubis
Jeffer Mangels Butler And Mitchell LLP
contact info
Martin H Orlick
Jeffer Mangels Butler And Mitchell LLP
contact info
Marta Maria Fernandez
Jeffer Mangels Butler And Marmaro LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Winter Kelly
Represented By
Alison M. Bernal
Nye Stirling Hale Miller And Sweet LLP
contact info
Jonathan D. Miller
Nye Stirling Hale Miller And Sweet LLP
contact info
Benjamin J. Sweet
Nye Stirling Hale Miller And Sweet, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
35 35 order Dismissing Case Tue 12/05 1:48 PM
ORDER On Stipulation to Dismiss Action Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)34 by Judge Josephine L. Staton that the above-captioned action be and hereby is dismissed, with prejudice, in its entirety pursuant to FRCP, Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2023
34 34 stip Dismiss Case Fri 12/01 7:18 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Settlement filed by Plaintiff Winter Kelly.(Bernal, Alison)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
33 33 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Thu 11/30 9:40 AM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) Order to Show Cause re Dismissal by Judge Josephine L. Staton: Within 10 days, the parties are ordered to show cause as to why this matter should not be dismissed. A notice of dismissal filed within that time period will be deemed an acceptable response to this Order. (jp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
32 32 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Tue 09/26 12:53 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Counsel and/or the parties are advised that the Court has updated its procedures in civil cases, including procedures encouraging consent to the magistrate judge in ordinary civil cases; setting forth presumptive schedules for class certification motion briefing; simplifying the requirements for substituting named defendants for Doe defendants; clarifying requirements for submission of mandatory chambers copies of voluminous exhibits; substituting compliance with the Local Rule regarding limitations on the number of words in the parties briefing for the Courts previous page limitations on briefing; imposing further limitations on the number of words in reply briefs; updating the Courts procedures in the case of settlement, including procedures for orders imposing stays of proceedings, orders of dismissal, and retention of jurisdiction by the Court; imposing limitations on both the number of and the content of motions in limine; and clarifying trial exhibit preparation, including the requirement to prepare a separate binder of exhibits for each witness. These updates are found on the Courts procedures page, and/or the Courts Initial Standing Order and Civil Trial Order, attached thereto. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cbr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 20, 2023
31 31 notice Settlement Thu 07/20 6:15 AM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Winter Kelly. (Bernal, Alison)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 27, 2023
30 30 2 pgs order Order Tue 06/27 12:30 PM
DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT by Judge Josephine L. Staton DENYING Joint Stipulation By All Parties Requesting 60 Day Modification of Scheduling Order29 . (jp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 20, 2023
29 29 stip Discovery Tue 06/20 2:04 PM
First STIPULATION for Discovery filed by Defendants Cedars-Sinai Health System, Cedars-Sinai Medical Center, Does.(Attorney Stuart K Tubis added to party Does(pty:dft))(Tubis, Stuart)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Joint Stipulation by all Parties Requesting 60 Day Modification of Scheduling Order
Tuesday, October 25, 2022
28 28 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12) Tue 10/25 5:43 PM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 10/13/2023. (vv)
Related: [-]
27 27 order Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only Tue 10/25 5:40 PM
CIVIL TRIAL ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton. (vv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 19, 2022
26 26 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Thu 10/20 2:11 PM
MINUTES (In Chambers) SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report. (Doc.24 .) The following schedule is set. Last Day to File a Motion to Add Parties or Amend Pleadings: 12/2/2022. Fact Discovery Cutoff: 8/11/2023. Last Day to File Motions (Excluding Daubert Motions and all other Motions in Limine): 8/25/2023. Last Day to Serve Initial Expert Reports: 8/25/2023. Last Day to Serve Rebuttal Expert Reports: 9/22/2023. Expert Discovery Cutoff: 10/20/2023. Last Day to Conduct Settlement Proceedings: 10/13/2023. Last Day to File Other Motions in Limine (Excluding Daubert Motions): 3/15/2024. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/12/2024 at 10:30 AM. (See document for further information). (jp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 06, 2022
textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Thu 10/06 2:48 PM
TEXT ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The Court, on its own motion, hereby VACATES the Scheduling Conference set for October 7, 2022. The Court will issue a separate Scheduling Order pursuant to the parties Joint 26(f) Report. No appearances are necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vv)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 23, 2022
24 24 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Fri 09/23 6:40 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4-7 days, filed by Plaintiff Winter Kelly.. (Bernal, Alison)
Related: [-]
23 23 attorney Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information (G-06) Fri 09/23 6:37 PM
NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Jonathan D. Miller counsel for Plaintiff Winter Kelly. Changing Firm Name to Nye, Stirling, Hale, Miller & Sweet, LLP. Filed by Plaintiff Winter Kelly. (Miller, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
22 22 attorney Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information (G-06) Fri 09/23 6:33 PM
NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Alison M. Bernal counsel for Plaintiff Winter Kelly. Changing Firm Name to Nye, Stirling, Hale, Miller & Sweet, LLP. Filed by Plaintiff Winter Kelly. (Bernal, Alison)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 16, 2022
21 21 order Leave to Appear Fri 09/16 5:39 PM
DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT by Judge Josephine L. Staton re Request for Leave to Appear20 . ***This denial is without prejudice. The Court typically issues a Scheduling Order based on the parties Rule 26(f) Report and vacates the Scheduling Conference. If, for any reason, the Court determines that a Scheduling Conference will be held, it will reset the hearing date or permit remote appearances, or both.*** (jp)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 12, 2022
20 20 motion Appear Mon 09/12 11:59 AM
REQUEST for Leave of Stuart K. Tubis, Esq. to Appear Request for Remote Appearance Or Other Appearance at Scheduling Conference on October 7, 2022 filed by Defendants Cedars-Sinai Health System, Cedars-Sinai Medical Center. Request set for hearing on 10/7/2022 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Tubis, Stuart)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Request for Remote Appearance or in Person Appearance by Non-Lead Trial Counsel at Scheduling Conference on 10.7.22
Tuesday, August 09, 2022
19 19 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Tue 08/09 4:08 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. A Scheduling Conference is set for October 7, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. (dr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 02, 2022
18 18 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 08/02 11:01 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Corporate Disclosure Statement of Defendants Cedars-Sinai Health System and Cedars-Sinai Medical Center filed by Defendants Cedars-Sinai Health System, Cedars-Sinai Medical Center (Tubis, Stuart)
Related: [-]
17 17 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 08/02 10:57 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Answer of Defendants Cedars-Sinai Health System and Cedars-Sinai Medical Center to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendants Cedars-Sinai Health System, Cedars-Sinai Medical Center.(Attorney Stuart K Tubis added to party Cedars-Sinai Health System(pty:dft), Attorney Stuart K Tubis added to party Cedars-Sinai Medical Center(pty:dft))(Tubis, Stuart)
Related: [-]
Sunday, July 24, 2022
16 16 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 07/25 9:24 AM
ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton granting14 Non-Resident Attorney Benjamin J Sweet APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Winter Kelly, designating Jonathan D Miller as local counsel. (jp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 19, 2022
15 15 notice Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form Tue 07/19 4:05 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Benjamin J. Sweet to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Winter Kelly (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33644632)14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case information is incomplete. DJ and MJ initials missing on application. Please note DJ and MJ Notice of Assignment, dated 7/8/22, Dkt.6 (lt)
Related: [-]
Saturday, July 16, 2022
14 14 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Sat 07/16 12:12 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Benjamin J. Sweet to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Winter Kelly (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33644632) filed by Plaintiff Winter Kelly. (Miller, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, July 15, 2022
13 13 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Fri 07/15 9:22 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Winter Kelly, upon Defendant Cedars-Sinai Health System served on 7/13/2022, answer due 8/3/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Sheryl Swanson, Risk Management and Person Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Miller, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Fri 07/15 9:20 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Winter Kelly, upon Defendant Cedars-Sinai Medical Center served on 7/13/2022, answer due 8/3/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Sheryl Swanson, Risk Management and Person Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Miller, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 08, 2022
11 11 attorney Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form Fri 07/08 2:39 PM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Benjamin J. Sweet on behalf of Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 07/08 2:38 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Cedars-Sinai Medical Center. (et)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 07/08 2:37 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Cedars-Sinai Health System. (et)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Fri 07/08 2:35 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 07/08 2:35 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 07/08 2:34 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (et)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 07/08 12:11 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Winter Kelly, (Miller, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Summons Request Fri 07/08 12:09 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Winter Kelly. (Miller, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Fri 07/08 12:08 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Winter Kelly. (Miller, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 07/08 12:04 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Winter Kelly. (Miller, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 07/08 11:57 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33597487 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Winter Kelly. (Attorney Jonathan D. Miller added to party Winter Kelly(pty:pla))(Miller, Jonathan)
Related: [-]