Maryland District Court
Judge:Julie Rebecca Rubin
Case #: 1:22-cv-01693
Nature of Suit450 Other Statutes - Commerce
Cause28:1441 Removal - Interstate Commerse Act
Case Filed:Jul 08, 2022
Terminated:Nov 05, 2024
Case in other court:Circuit Court for Frederick County, C-10-CV-22-000340
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 04, 2023 3:31 AM EST
Defendant
Tforce Freight, Inc.
Represented By
William D Bierman
Price Meese Shulman & D'Arminio
contact info
Thomas Martin
Price Meese Shulman And D'Arminio PC
contact info
James Hetzel
Franklin & Prokopik
contact info
Tamara B Goorevitz
Franklin And Prokopik PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Triax, Inc.
Represented By
Davin Van Eyken
Diversified Law Group
contact info

GPO Feb 11 2023
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 2/11/2023. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
GPO Jul 19 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 7/19/2024. (ols, Deputy Clerk)

Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
48 48 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 11/05 10:18 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Tforce Freight, Inc.(Hetzel, James)
Related: [-]
order Order Dismissing Case Tue 11/05 11:17 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice at ECF No.48 , it is this 5th day of November 2024, ORDERED that the Stipulation shall be, and is hereby, APPROVED; and further it is ORDERED that the case shall be, and is hereby, DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 11/5/2024. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
order Order Tue 10/29 7:39 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER: In view of the passage of time since the parties' correspondence at ECF No.46 , it is this 29th day of October 2024, hereby ORDERED that within fourteen (14) days of this order, the parties shall file either a stipulation of dismissal in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a) or a joint status report. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 10/29/2024. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
46 46 corresp Miscellaneous Wed 08/21 12:06 PM
Correspondence re: Letter to Judge Julie R. Rubin (Hetzel, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
45 45 4 pgs order Memorandum to Parties Wed 07/31 3:39 PM
MEMORANDUM to Counsel re: Pretrial Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 7/31/2024. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
44 44 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Fri 07/19 12:22 PM
ORDER granting42 Defendant TForce Freight, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment to Limit and Cap the Damages to a Maximum of $3,000.00 Subject to Plaintiff's Proof of Liability. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 7/19/2024. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
43 43 13 pgs order Memorandum Opinion Fri 07/19 12:11 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 7/19/2024. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2023
42 42 motion Summary Judgment Thu 10/19 4:37 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment to limit and cap the damages subject to Plaintiff's proof of Liability by Tforce Freight, Inc.(Goorevitz, Tamara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
order Order Tue 09/26 1:36 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER: The settlement conference scheduled for Wednesday September 27, 2023 is CANCELED at the request of the Plaintiff. If the parties wish to reschedule they are directed to contact my Chambers for a new date. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 9/26/2023. (Chambers)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
minutes Telephone Conference Fri 09/22 3:35 PM
Telephone Conference re Settlement held on 9/22/2023 before Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite. (cw6s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 05, 2023
order Order Tue 09/05 7:54 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER: Upon consideration of the Joint Discovery Status Report at ECF No. 39, it is this 5th day of September 2023, ORDERED that the Scheduling Order shall be modified as follows: Dispositive Pretrial Motions Deadline October 19, 2023. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 9/5/2023. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 31, 2023
39 39 misc Status Report Thu 08/31 4:13 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint Discovery Status Report by Tforce Freight, Inc.(Hetzel, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 27, 2023
36 36 corresp Extension of Time - requesting Thu 07/27 10:12 AM
REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Discovery(Hetzel, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
35 35 corresp Extension of Time - requesting Thu 07/27 10:09 AM
REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Discovery (Hetzel, James)
Related: [-]
order Order Thu 07/27 10:44 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER: Upon consideration of the Request for Extension of Time to File Discovery at ECF Nos. 35 and 36, it is this 27th day of July 2023, hereby, ORDERED that the Request shall be, and is hereby APPROVED; and further it is ORDERED that the Scheduling Order shall be modified as follows: Discovery Deadline and Submission of Status Report August 28, 2023; Requests for Admission September 5, 2023; Dispositive Pretrial Motions Deadline September 28, 2023.. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 7/27/2023. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
order Order Thu 07/27 10:45 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER: It is this 27th day of July 2023 ORDERED that the Letter Order issued at ECF No. 28 shall be, and is hereby, VACATED.. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 7/27/2023. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 12, 2023
33 33 notice Notice (Other) Mon 06/12 3:38 PM
-FILED IN ERROR- NOTICE by Triax, Inc. Rule 26(a) Disclosure (Van Eyken, Davin) Modified on 6/12/2023 (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
notice QC Notice - Miscellaneous Mon 06/12 3:52 PM
QC NOTICE:33 Notice (Other) filed by Triax, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **Discovery, including Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosures, should not be filed with the Court pursuant to Local Rule 104. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
32 32 2 pgs order Order for Settlement Conference Wed 04/05 3:33 PM
ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 4/5/2023. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 30, 2023
order Order Thu 03/30 1:54 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER: Pursuant to the Joint Status Report filed at ECF No. 29, the Rule 16 telephone conference scheduled for Monday, April 17, 2023 at 3:00 p.m. is CANCELLED. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 3/30/2023. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 29, 2023
30 30 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 03/29 2:35 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite for Mediation. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 3/29/2023. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 28, 2023
29 29 misc Status Report Tue 03/28 2:27 PM
STATUS REPORT Initial Joint Status Report by Tforce Freight, Inc.(Hetzel, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 14, 2023
28 28 1 pgs order Order Tue 03/14 10:12 AM
ORDER re: Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 3/14/2023. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
27 27 21 pgs order Order Tue 03/14 10:11 AM
DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 3/14/2023. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
26 26 order Scheduling Order Tue 03/14 10:10 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 7/27/2023. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 3/14/2023. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 03, 2023
25 25 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 03/03 1:52 PM
ANSWER to22 Amended Complaint by Tforce Freight, Inc..(Hetzel, James)
Related: [-]
23 23 respoth Amended Answer to Complaint Fri 03/03 1:19 PM
-FILED IN ERROR- AMENDED ANSWER to by Tforce Freight, Inc.. (Hetzel, James) Modified on 3/3/2023 (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
notice QC Notice - Miscellaneous Fri 03/03 1:45 PM
QC NOTICE:23 Amended Answer to Complaint filed by Tforce Freight, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **Incorrect event used. Please refile using the event Answers to Complaint and link to 22 when prompted. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 17, 2023
22 22 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 02/17 11:16 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Triax, Inc..(Van Eyken, Davin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment
notice QC Notice - Amended Complaint Fri 02/17 8:25 AM
QC NOTICE:18 Amended Complaint filed by Triax, Inc. needs to be corrected. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. The following corrective actions are needed regarding missing or incomplete information: **Redline copy has not been filed. Please re-file the clean version of the amended complaint as the main document and the redline version as an attachment to the amended complaint. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 16, 2023
20 20 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Thu 02/16 4:15 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Triax, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Brass Junkies LLP for Triax, Inc..(Van Eyken, Davin)
Related: [-]
19 19 service Certificate of Service Thu 02/16 4:12 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Triax, Inc. re18 Amended Complaint Amended Certificate of Service (Van Eyken, Davin)
Related: [-]
18 18 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 02/16 4:01 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Triax, Inc..(Van Eyken, Davin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit
Saturday, February 11, 2023
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 02/13 8:51 AM
ORDER granting5 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; dismissing without prejudice3 Plaintiff's Complaint; granting Plaintiff Triax, Inc. leave to file an amended complaint within 20 days of entry of this order. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 2/11/2023. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
16 16 7 pgs order Memorandum Opinion Mon 02/13 8:49 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 2/11/2023. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 15, 2022
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 09/15 1:59 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Thomas Martin. Directing attorney Thomas Martin to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 9/15/2022. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 09/15 2:56 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of William D Bierman. Directing attorney William D Bierman to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 9/15/2022. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 09, 2022
13 13 motion Pro Hac Vice Fri 09/09 11:22 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for William D. Bierman (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10145222.) by Tforce Freight, Inc.(Goorevitz, Tamara)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Pro Hac Vice Fri 09/09 11:20 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Thomas C. Martin (Filing fee $100, receipt number BMDDC-10145158.) by Tforce Freight, Inc.(Goorevitz, Tamara)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 04, 2022
11 11 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 08/04 3:42 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Tforce Freight, Inc..(Goorevitz, Tamara)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Local Rule Thu 08/04 3:38 PM
Local Rule 103.5 Certificate(Goorevitz, Tamara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
Friday, July 22, 2022
9 9 respm Response Fri 07/22 11:52 AM
RESPONSE re4 Notice of Standing Order 2021-13 Concerning Removal Actions Statement Concerning Removal filed by Tforce Freight, Inc..(Goorevitz, Tamara)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 21, 2022
8 8 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 07/21 12:12 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Triax, Inc..(Van Eyken, Davin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
notice QC Notice - Miscellaneous Thu 07/21 9:05 AM
QC NOTICE:6 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Triax, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **Exhibit 1 is upside down. Please correct and refile. Please also correct the case number. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 20, 2022
6 6 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 07/20 4:31 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Triax, Inc..(Van Eyken, Davin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, July 14, 2022
5 5 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 07/14 4:55 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Tforce Freight, Inc.(Goorevitz, Tamara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, July 08, 2022
4 4 notice Notice of Standing Order 2021-13 Concerning Removal Actions Fri 07/08 2:47 PM
Clerk's Notice of Standing Order concerning removal actions filed in this Court, which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Complaint Fri 07/08 2:46 PM
COMPLAINT against Tforce Freight, Inc., filed by Triax, Inc. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Fri 07/08 2:21 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by TFORCE FREIGHT, INC. identifying Corporate Parent TFI International, Inc. for TFORCE FREIGHT, INC..(Goorevitz, Tamara)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 07/08 2:15 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Frederick County, case number C-10-CV-22-000340. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10039614), filed by TFORCE FREIGHT, INC..(Goorevitz, Tamara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Attachment Certificate of Filing Notice of Removal,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1 - Complaint
utility Remark - State Court Docs Fri 07/08 2:47 PM
THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (3) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR FREDERICK COUNTY. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]