New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Joan M Azrack
Referred: Arlene R Lindsay
Case #: 2:22-cv-04016
Nature of Suit220 Real Property - Foreclosure
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Contract Default
Case Filed:Jul 08, 2022
Terminated:Jan 31, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 04, 2023 4:14 AM EST
Defendant
"John Doe" and "Mary Doe"
Glen Cove, NY 11542
Defendant
Denise Carey Bettencourt
1 Lattingtown Road
Glen Cove, NY 11542
Represented By
Nathan R. Jones
Forchelli Deegan Terrana LLP
contact info
Defendant
Millicent Z. Carey
1 Lattingtown Road
Glen Cove, NY 11542
Defendant
New York State Department of Taxation and Finance Tax Compliance Division-C.O.-ATC
W.A.Harriman Campus- Building 9
Albany, NY 12227
Plaintiff
Millennium Trust Company, LLC
as Custodian FBO Prime Meridian NPL, LLC 1688 Meridian Avenue- Suite 610
Miami, FL 33139
Represented By
Danielle Paula Light
Hasbani & Light, P.C.
contact info
Shauna M Deluca
Hasbani & Light, P.C.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
United States of America Department of Treasury Internal Revenue Service
Terminated: 11/28/2022
550 Main Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, January 31, 2023
order Order Dismissing Case Tue 01/31 11:01 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE re20 . The stipulation of dismissal is so ordered. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 1/31/2023. (LP)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 30, 2023
20 20 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 01/30 12:54 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal by Millennium Trust Company, LLC (Deluca, Shauna)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 10, 2023
order Status Report Order Tue 01/10 9:30 AM
STATUS REPORT ORDER: The parties are directed to provide a joint status report regarding the progress of settlement discussions by or before 2/10/2023. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 1/10/2023. (MB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 05, 2023
19 19 1 pgs misc Letter Thu 01/05 4:33 PM
Letter Joint Status Report Letter by Millennium Trust Company, LLC (Light, Danielle)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 21, 2022
order Status Report Order Wed 12/21 2:44 PM
STATUS REPORT ORDER: Based on the representations set forth in DE17 , the parties are directed to provide a joint status report regarding the progress of settlement discussions, by or before 1/5/2023. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 12/21/2022. (MB)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 28, 2022
order Order Dismissing Parties Mon 11/28 8:41 AM
Order Dismissing Parties - Party United States of America Department of Treasury Internal Revenue Service terminated.Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 11/28/2022. (LP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 23, 2022
18 18 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 11/23 10:50 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Millennium Trust Company, LLC of Defendant United States of America Department of Treasury Internal Revenue Service (Deluca, Shauna)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 22, 2022
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Tue 11/22 2:23 PM
ORDER re17 : The time to submit the Rule 26 Meeting Report is extended to and including January 5, 2023. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 11/22/2022. c/ecf (RI)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 21, 2022
17 17 motion Extension of Time to File Document Mon 11/21 2:29 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Rule 26 Meeting Report by Denise Carey Bettencourt, Denise Carey Bettencourt. (Jones, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 17, 2022
16 16 order Clerks Entry of Default Thu 11/17 3:55 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT: It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendants Millicent Z. Carey and New York State Department of Taxation and Finance Tax Compliance Division-C.O.-ATC have failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the defaults of defendants Millicent Z. Carey and New York State Department of Taxation and Finance Tax Compliance Division-C.O.-ATC are hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (JT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 15, 2022
15 15 1 pgs misc Letter Tue 11/15 5:33 PM
Letter RE: Domicile of Plaintiff's Members by Millennium Trust Company, LLC (Deluca, Shauna)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Request for Certificate of Default Tue 11/15 12:38 PM
Request for Certificate of Default by Millennium Trust Company, LLC (Deluca, Shauna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support Affirmation in Support of Request for Default,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex A - AOSs,
Att: 3 Proposed Clerk Certificate of Default
Wednesday, November 09, 2022
order Order to Show Cause Wed 11/09 11:22 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: The Complaint states that Plaintiff Millennium Trust Company, LLC is an Illinois limited liability company, and attributes that citizenship to the fact that its members are domiciled in the State of Illinois. In light of the Court's obligation to examine its subject matter jurisdiction sua sponte , Plaintiff is directed to file a letter within one week from the date of this Order setting forth the citizenship of each of the LLC's members, as limited liability companies take the citizenship of each of their members. See Bayerische Landesbank, New York Branch v. Aladdin Capital Management LLC , 692 F.3d 42, 49 (2d Cir. 2012). Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 11/9/2022. (MB)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 07, 2022
13 13 2 pgs respm Response to Motion Mon 11/07 2:38 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re11 MOTION for pre motion conference filed by Denise Carey Bettencourt, Denise Carey Bettencourt. (Jones, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 02, 2022
12 12 service Certificate of Service Wed 11/02 11:01 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Millennium Trust Company, LLC (Deluca, Shauna)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Pre Motion Conference Wed 11/02 10:51 AM
MOTION for pre motion conference by Millennium Trust Company, LLC. (Deluca, Shauna)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 20, 2022
10 10 1 pgs order Scheduling Order Thu 10/20 2:53 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by November 21, 2022. See the attached Order for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 10/20/2022. c/ecf (RI)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Rule 26(f) form
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
9 9 9 pgs respoth Amended Answer to Complaint Wed 09/28 12:18 PM
AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiff's Complaint by Denise Carey Bettencourt, Denise Carey Bettencourt. (Jones, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 14, 2022
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 09/14 9:10 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Millennium Trust Company, LLC. Denise Carey Bettencourt served on 9/7/2022, answer due 9/28/2022; Millicent Z. Carey served on 9/13/2022, answer due 10/4/2022. (Deluca, Shauna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Friday, August 26, 2022
7 7 9 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Fri 08/26 11:12 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,, by Denise Carey Bettencourt, Denise Carey Bettencourt. (Jones, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 27, 2022
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 07/27 2:53 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Millennium Trust Company, LLC. New York State Department of Taxation and Finance Tax Compliance Division-C.O.-ATC served on 7/21/2022, answer due 8/11/2022; United States of America Department of Treasury Internal Revenue Service served on 7/18/2022, answer due 8/8/2022. (Deluca, Shauna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Returned Executed
Monday, July 11, 2022
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 07/11 11:06 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Jakubowski, Laura)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Mon 07/11 10:52 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Jakubowski, Laura)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Mon 07/11 10:46 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Jakubowski, Laura)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 07/11 10:51 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Jakubowski, Laura)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 08, 2022
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 07/08 4:49 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Shauna M Deluca on behalf of Millenium Trust Company, LLC as Custodian FBO Prime Meridian NPL, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Deluca, Shauna)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 07/08 4:07 PM
COMPLAINT Millenium Trust Company, LLC as Custodian FBO Prime Meridian NPL, LLC against "John Doe" and "Mary Doe", Denise Carey Bettencourt, Denise Carey Bettencourt, Millicent Z. Carey, New York State Department of Taxation and Finance Tax Compliance Division-C.O.-ATC, United States of America Department of Treasury Internal Revenue Service filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15730430 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Millenium Trust Company, LLC as Custodian FBO Prime Meridian NPL, LLC. (Light, Danielle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons Summons,
Att: 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement,
Att: 4 Exhibit A- Legal Description,
Att: 5 Exhibit B- Consolidated Note 3,
Att: 6 Exhibit C- Consolidated Mortgage 3,
Att: 7 Exhibit D- AOMs,
Att: 8 Exhibit E- 90 Day Notices,
Att: 9 Exhibit F-1306 Filing,
Att: 10 Exhibit G- Letters of Testamentary,
Att: 11 Exhibit H- Deed,
Att: 12 RPAPL 1303 Notice,
Att: 13 RPAPL 1320 Notice