Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Kathryn Kimball Mizelle
Referred: Mac R Mccoy
Case #: 8:22-cv-01546
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Jul 08, 2022
Terminated:Oct 28, 2022
Case in other court:Sixth Judicial District, 2022-CA-001442
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 04, 2023 4:00 AM EST
Defendant
Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc.
Represented By
Damien A. Orato
Rumberger, Kirk & Caldwell, PA
contact info
Joni M. Gerrity
Rumberger, Kirk & Caldwell
contact info
Plaintiff
Adrienne Salerno
Represented By
Robert Anthony Santa Lucia
Morgan And Morgan
contact info
Robert A. Santa Lucia
Florin Roebig, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, October 28, 2022
11 11 1 pgs order Order dismissing case Fri 10/28 3:39 PM
ORDER dismissing this case without prejudice. After 30 days, dismissal shall be with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to terminate any pending motions and deadlines and to close this case. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 10/28/2022. (RLD)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of settlement Fri 10/28 3:09 PM
NOTICE of settlement (Joint) by Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc. (Gerrity, Joni)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 02, 2022
9 9 order Case Management / FLSA / ADA / Social Security / Scheduling Order Fri 09/02 4:43 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by February 24, 2023. Dispositive motions due by March 31, 2023. Pretrial Conference scheduled for September 14, 2023 at 9:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 13B before Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle. Jury Trial scheduled for the October 2023 trial calendar in Tampa Courtroom 13B before Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle. Conduct mediation by March 17, 2023. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 9/2/2022. (GSO)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 16, 2022
8 8 misc Case Management Report Tue 08/16 2:43 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Gerrity, Joni)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 22, 2022
7 7 notice Notice of a Related Action Fri 07/22 4:10 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc.. Related case(s): No (Gerrity, Joni)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 07/22 4:10 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc.. (Gerrity, Joni)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 11, 2022
5 5 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Mon 07/11 3:52 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Damien A. Orato on behalf of Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc. Lead Counsel: Damien A. Orato. (Orato, Damien) Modified text on 7/11/2022 (MCB)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Civil Action Order Mon 07/11 10:44 AM
CIVIL CASE ORDER. Counsel and any unrepresented party shall meet within forty days after the case was removed for the purposes of preparing and filing a Case Management Report. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 7/11/2022. (JMB)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Mon 07/11 11:45 AM
NOTICE to counsel Damien A. Orato, Joni M. Gerrity of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SEG)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 08, 2022
2 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 8:22-cv-1546-KKM-MRM. (SJB)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs notice Notice of Removal Fri 07/08 2:36 PM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the Sixth Judicial District, case number 2022-CA-001442 filed in State Court on 06/01/2021. Filing fee $402, receipt number AFLMDC-19754245 filed by Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc..(Gerrity, Joni)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 5 pgs State Court COMPLAINT Exhibit A - State Court Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - ROS,
Att: 3 State Court ANSWER Exhibit C - State Court Answer,
Att: 4 State Court Docket Sheet State Court Docket Sheet,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit D - Notice of Filing Removal,
Att: 6 State Court Other Documents Exhibit E - State Court File,
Att: 7 1 pgs Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 07/08 3:50 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 8:22-cv-1546-KKM-MRM. (SJB)
Related: [-]