Salerno v. Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc.
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Kathryn Kimball Mizelle |
Referred: | Mac R Mccoy |
Case #: | 8:22-cv-01546 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jul 08, 2022 |
Terminated: | Oct 28, 2022 |
Case in other court: | Sixth Judicial District, 2022-CA-001442 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 04, 2023 4:00 AM EST |
Defendant
Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Adrienne Salerno
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Friday, October 28, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
![]() ORDER dismissing this case without prejudice. After 30 days, dismissal shall be with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to terminate any pending motions and deadlines and to close this case. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 10/28/2022. (RLD) |
|
10 | 10
![]() NOTICE of settlement (Joint) by Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc. (Gerrity, Joni) |
|
Friday, September 02, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
![]() CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by February 24, 2023. Dispositive motions due by March 31, 2023. Pretrial Conference scheduled for September 14, 2023 at 9:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 13B before Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle. Jury Trial scheduled for the October 2023 trial calendar in Tampa Courtroom 13B before Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle. Conduct mediation by March 17, 2023. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 9/2/2022. (GSO) |
|
Tuesday, August 16, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
![]() CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Gerrity, Joni) |
|
Friday, July 22, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
![]() NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc.. Related case(s): No (Gerrity, Joni) |
|
6 | 6
![]() CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc.. (Gerrity, Joni) |
|
Monday, July 11, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Damien A. Orato on behalf of Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc. Lead Counsel: Damien A. Orato. (Orato, Damien) Modified text on 7/11/2022 (MCB) |
|
3 | 3
![]() CIVIL CASE ORDER. Counsel and any unrepresented party shall meet within forty days after the case was removed for the purposes of preparing and filing a Case Management Report. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 7/11/2022. (JMB) |
|
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Mon 07/11 11:45 AM
NOTICE to counsel Damien A. Orato, Joni M. Gerrity of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SEG) |
||
Friday, July 08, 2022 | ||
2 | 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 8:22-cv-1546-KKM-MRM. (SJB) | |
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the Sixth Judicial District, case number 2022-CA-001442 filed in State Court on 06/01/2021. Filing fee $402, receipt number AFLMDC-19754245 filed by Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc..(Gerrity, Joni) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 07/08 3:50 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 8:22-cv-1546-KKM-MRM. (SJB) |