Louisiana Western District Court
Judge:Robert R Summerhays
Referred: David J Ayo
Case #: 6:22-cv-02025
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Jul 08, 2022
Terminated:Feb 05, 2025
Case in other court:15th JDC Lafayette Parish, C-20221146D
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 04, 2023 2:53 AM CST
Defendant
Hartford Casualty Insurance Co
Represented By
James D Hollier
Neuner Pate
contact info
Philip Henry Boudreaux, Jr
Neuner Pate
contact info
Defendant
Texas Roadhouse Holdings L L C
Represented By
James D Hollier
Neuner Pate
contact info
Philip Henry Boudreaux, Jr
Neuner Pate
contact info
Defendant
V M C Facilities L L C
Defendant
X R C L L C
Plaintiff
Gloria J Cormier
Represented By
Logan Michael Landgrave
Law Office Of Blaine J Barrilleaux
contact info
Blaine J Barrilleaux
Law Office Of Blaine J Barrilleaux
contact info
Allison Morrow Weaver
Law Office Of Blaine J Barrilleaux
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Texas Roadhouse Inc
Terminated: 09/16/2022


Docket last updated: 35 minutes ago
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
35 35 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case (30, 60, 90 day) Wed 02/05 2:53 PM
60 DAY ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Robert R Summerhays on 2/5/2025. (crt,Craig-Fontenot, C)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
34 34 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss/Joint or Voluntary Tue 11/05 9:31 AM
ORDER granting33 Joint/Voluntary Motion to Dismiss Texas Roadhouse Holdings, LLC and the Hartford Casualty Insurance Co. Signed by Judge Robert R Summerhays on 11/5/2024. (crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
33 33 motion Dismiss/Joint or Voluntary Thu 09/26 3:25 PM
JOINT/VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss Texas Roadhouse Holdings, LLC and the Hartford Casualty Insurance Co by Hartford Casualty Insurance Co, Texas Roadhouse Holdings L L C, Gloria Cormier. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/26/2024.(Attorney Philip Henry Boudreaux, Jr added to party Texas Roadhouse Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Boudreaux, Philip) Modified to add filers and edit text on 9/26/2024 (Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed order
Monday, September 23, 2024
32 32 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss/Joint or Voluntary Mon 09/23 3:39 PM
ORDER granting31 Joint/Voluntary Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Robert R Summerhays on 9/23/2024. (crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
31 31 motion Dismiss/Joint or Voluntary Fri 09/20 12:52 PM
JOINT/VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss XRC, LLC d/b/a Xtreme Roofing and Construction, LLC by X R C L L C. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/20/2024.(aty,Durham, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed order
Friday, December 22, 2023
30 30 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion for Extension (Other) Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 12/22 11:02 AM
ORDER granting29 Motion to Deem Moot the Notice of Intent to Dismiss or alternatively, MOTION for Extension of Time to Enter Default or MOTION for Extension of Time for VMC to File Answer. Therefore, the Notice Of Intent To Dismiss For Failure To Prosecute Under LR 41.3 entered by this Honorable Court on December 11, 2023, is deemed moot and VMC Facilities LLC will remain a party unless dismissed by other motion of a party or the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J Ayo on 12/22/2023. (crt,Chicola, C)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
29 29 motion Miscellaneous Relief Extension (Other) Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 12/21 10:06 AM
Unopposed MOTION to Deem Moot the Notice of Intent to Dismiss, or alternatively, MOTION for Extension of Time to Enter Default or MOTION for Extension of Time for VMC to File Answer with consent by Gloria J Cormier. Motions referred to David J Ayo. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/21/2023.(aty,Wallace, Brandon). Modified to add motion events and edit text on 12/21/2023 (Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order on Default Extension,
Att: 2 Exhibit A- VMC will respond soon
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 12/21 11:16 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to29 Motion to Deem Moot the Notice of Intent to Dismiss, or alternatively, MOTION for Extension of of Time to Enter Default orMotion for Extension of Time for VMC to File Answer. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/21/2023. (crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
28 28 notice Notice of Intent to Dismiss (Form Included) Mon 12/11 10:51 AM
NOTICE of Intent to dismiss V M C Facilities L L C for Failure to take default 60 days after service. (crt,Craig-Fontenot, C)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2023
27 27 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 10/19 9:36 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gloria J Cormier. V M C Facilities L L C served on 8/11/2023, answer due 9/1/2023.(aty,Wallace, Brandon) Modified to correct service and answer due date on 10/19/2023 (Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proof of mailing in addition to service on agent.
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
26 26 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension (Other) Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 09/20 3:51 PM
ORDER granting25 Motion Extension of Time to Serve VMC Facilities LLC. Plaintiff is granted an additional 30 days from the signing of this order to effect service of process on VMC Facilities LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J Ayo on 9/20/2023. (crt,Bunting, M)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 15, 2023
25 25 motion Extension (Other) Miscellaneous Relief Tue 08/15 1:22 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve VMC Facilities with consent by Gloria J Cormier. Motions referred to David J Ayo. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/15/2023.(aty,Wallace, Brandon) Modified on 8/15/2023 (Thomas, T). Added MOTION to Deem the Notice of Intent to Dismiss as Moot on 8/15/2023 (Thomas, T). Modified on 8/15/2023 (Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed order Alternative orders on Plaintiff's motion,
Att: 2 Exhibit A- Summons and associated documents sent to VMC,
Att: 3 Exhibit B- Signed USPS green card,
Att: 4 Exhibit C- Signed certificate of service,
Att: 5 Exhibit D- Correspondence to VMC facilities
Monday, August 07, 2023
24 24 notice Notice of Intent to Dismiss (Form Included) Mon 08/07 9:56 AM
NOTICE of Intent to dismiss V M C Facilities L L C for Failure to effect service within 90 days. (crt,Craig-Fontenot, C)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 23, 2023
23 23 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Wed 05/24 11:00 AM
ORDER granting22 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Logan Michael Landgrave terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J Ayo on 5/23/2023. (crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 19, 2023
22 22 motion Substitute Attorney Fri 05/19 9:27 AM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney Brandon O. Wallace in place of Logan M. Landgrave with consent by Gloria J Cormier. Motions referred to David J Ayo. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/19/2023.(Attorney Brandon O Wallace added to party Gloria J Cormier(pty:pla))(aty,Wallace, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed order Proposed Substitution Of Counsel Order
Tuesday, May 02, 2023
21 21 1 pgs order Order to Strike Tue 05/02 2:30 PM
ORDER TO STRIKE18 First MOTION to Substitute Attorney Brandon O. Wallace in place of Logan M. Landgrave with consent sought but not yet obtained. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J Ayo on 5/2/2023. (crt,Bunting, M)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 01, 2023
20 20 motion Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF) Mon 05/01 9:07 AM
PROPOSED ORDER re18 Motion to Substitute Attorney, Referred to Magistrate Judge David J Ayo. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/1/2023. (crt,Mitchell, P)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 31, 2023
19 19 notice Notice of Deficiency Fri 03/31 4:32 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency to Logan Michael Landgrave on behalf of Gloria J Cormier regarding18 First MOTION to Substitute Attorney Brandon O. Wallace in place of Logan M. Landgrave with consent sought but not yet obtained. Reason: Either no proposed order accompanied this motion or the proposed order was not on a separate page. Please see LR7.4.1 or LR58.1 for additional information. (crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Substitute Attorney Fri 03/31 2:50 PM
DEFICIENT ? First MOTION to Substitute Attorney Brandon O. Wallace in place of Logan M. Landgrave with consent sought but not yet obtained by Gloria J Cormier. Motions referred to David J Ayo. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/31/2023. (aty,Landgrave, Logan) Modified to reflect deficiency on 3/31/2023 (Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 21, 2023
17 17 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 03/21 5:05 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by X R C L L C. (aty,Durham, Meredith)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Tue 03/21 5:00 PM
DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by X R C L L C. (aty,Durham, Meredith)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included) Tue 03/21 2:50 PM
NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re:14 Answer to Amended Complaint, sent to Meredith Renee Durham on behalf of X R C L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 4/4/2023. (crt,Bunting, M)
Related: [-]
14 14 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 03/21 2:26 PM
ANSWER to8 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by X R C L L C.(Attorney Meredith Renee Durham added to party X R C L L C(pty:dft))(aty,Durham, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 09, 2023
13 13 service Affidavit of Service Thu 03/09 4:29 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Original and Amended Petition, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production served on XRC, LLC on 1/10/23, filed by Gloria J Cormier. (aty,Landgrave, Logan)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 03, 2022
12 12 service Summons Reissued - All (Form Included) Mon 10/03 5:07 PM
SUMMONS REISSUED as to V M C Facilities L L C, X R C L L C. (crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 10/03 3:56 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to X R C L L C, requested by Gloria J Cormier. (aty,Landgrave, Logan)
Related: [-]
service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 10/03 3:59 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to V M C Facilities L L C, requested by Gloria J Cormier. (aty,Landgrave, Logan)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 16, 2022
11 11 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 09/16 11:28 AM
ANSWER to8 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Hartford Casualty Insurance Co, Texas Roadhouse Holdings L L C.(aty,Boudreaux, Philip)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 02, 2022
10 10 order Minute Entry/Order Reassigning Case Tue 09/06 2:29 PM
ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY issued by the Clerk. In accordance with Standing Order 1.62, this matter is hereby reassigned. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge David J Ayo. Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna no longer assigned to case. All future filings should bear the name of the new judge assignment. Approved by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 9/2/2022. (crt,Whidden, C)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 26, 2022
9 9 service Summons Issued - All (Form Included) Fri 08/26 2:23 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Texas Roadhouse Inc, V M C Facilities L L C, X R C L L C. (crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
8 8 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 08/26 2:22 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Hartford Casualty Insurance Co, Texas Roadhouse Inc, V M C Facilities L L C, X R C L L C with Jury Demand filed by Gloria J Cormier.(crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Fri 08/26 2:15 PM
ORDER granting6 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 8/26/2022. (crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 25, 2022
6 6 motion Amend/Correct Thu 08/25 12:48 PM
First MOTION to Amend/Correct with consent Plaintiff's Petititon for Damages by Gloria J Cormier. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/25/2022.(aty,Landgrave, Logan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed pleading Plaintiffs amended petition for damages,
Att: 2 Proposed order Plaintiffs proposed order granting leave to file amended petition for damages.
Thursday, July 21, 2022
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 07/21 2:58 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Texas Roadhouse Inc for Texas Roadhouse Holdings L L C, Corporate Parent Hartford Accident & Indemnity Co, Corporate Parent Hartford Fire Insurance Co, Corporate Parent Hartford Financial Services Group Inc for Hartford Casualty Insurance Co by Hartford Casualty Insurance Co, Texas Roadhouse Holdings L L C. (aty,Boudreaux, Philip) Modified on 7/21/2022 (Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 12, 2022
4 4 order Removal Order Tue 07/12 11:08 AM
REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 7/12/2022. (crt,Craig-Fontenot, C)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 08, 2022
3 3 motion Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF) Mon 07/11 6:11 PM
PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/8/2022. (crt,Chavis, J)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included) Mon 07/11 6:10 PM
NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re:1 Notice of Removal, sent to Philip Henry Boudreaux, Jr on behalf of Hartford Casualty Insurance Co, Texas Roadhouse Holdings L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 7/22/2022. (crt,Chavis, J)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs cmp Notice of Removal Fri 07/08 2:44 PM
NOTICE of Removal from 15th JDC Lafayette Parish, Case Number C-20221146D with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5169913) filed by Texas Roadhouse Holdings, LLC, Hartford Casualty Insurance Co.(Attorney Philip Henry Boudreaux, Jr added to party Hartford Casualty Insurance Co(pty:dft), Attorney Philip Henry Boudreaux, Jr added to party Texas Roadhouse Holdings, LLC(pty:dft))(aty,Boudreaux, Philip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet,
Att: 2 45 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit
answer Answer to Complaint Mon 07/11 6:02 PM
STATE COURT ANSWER to Complaint (15th JDC Lafayette Parish, #C-20221146D, filed 4/27/22) by Hartford Casualty Insurance Co, Texas Roadhouse Holdings L L C. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: The PDF image can be found in Attachment #2 to Document1 , Notice of Removal.(crt,Chavis, J)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 07/11 6:07 PM
CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Chavis, J)
Related: [-]