Washington Western District Court
Judge:S Kate Vaughan
Case #: 2:22-cv-00951
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jul 08, 2022
Terminated:Sep 06, 2022
Case in other court:Snohomish Count Superior Court, 22-00002-03156-31
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 04, 2023 1:22 AM PST
Defendant
Island County
Represented By
Michael Anthony Griffin
Jackson Lewis Pc (sea)
contact info
Daniel P Crowner
Jackson Lewis Pc (sea)
contact info
Defendant
John Nieder
Represented By
Michael Anthony Griffin
Jackson Lewis Pc (sea)
contact info
Daniel P Crowner
Jackson Lewis Pc (sea)
contact info
Plaintiff
Mike Adrian
Represented By
Rodney R Moody
Law Office Of Rodney R Moody
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, September 06, 2022
14 14 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss ~Util - Terminate Case Tue 09/06 4:15 PM
STIPULATED MOTION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL signed by Hon. S. Kate Vaughan, re:13 Motion to Dismiss. (TF)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 29, 2022
13 13 motion Dismiss Mon 08/29 3:47 PM
Stipulated MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendants Island County, John Nieder. Noting Date 8/29/2022, (Griffin, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 20, 2022
12 12 6 pgs order Joint Status Report Order Form for Magistrate Judges Wed 07/20 8:48 AM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by Hon. S. Kate Vaughan. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 8/10/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/24/2022, Joint Status Report due by 8/31/2022. (SNP)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge Wed 07/20 8:47 AM
CONSENT by all parties to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. Case remains assigned to Hon. S. Kate Vaughan. (SNP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 19, 2022
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 07/19 9:59 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Daniel P Crowner on behalf of Defendants Island County, John Nieder. (Crowner, Daniel)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Verification of State Court Records Tue 07/19 9:45 AM
VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendants Island County, John Nieder(Griffin, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, July 15, 2022
8 8 11 pgs answer Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Fri 07/15 2:06 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) re:1 Notice of Removal by Island County, John Nieder.(Griffin, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 12, 2022
7 7 misc Jury Demand Tue 07/12 9:56 AM
DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Mike Adrian (Moody, Rodney)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 11, 2022
6 6 utility Case/IFP Deficiency Letter Mon 07/11 2:13 PM
Notice of Filing Deficiency re1 Notice of Removal. ***Action Required*** Notice of Removal - Jury Demand Improperly Submitted. See attached letter for more information and instructions. (MJV)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Consent Letter & Form Mon 07/11 2:12 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 7/18/2022. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (TF)
Related: [-]
4 4 utility Judge Assignment Letter (Removal & Transfer cases only) Mon 07/11 2:10 PM
LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Snohomish County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (MJV)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 07/11 2:07 PM
Hon. S. Kate Vaughan added. (MJV)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 08, 2022
3 3 discov Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 07/08 2:26 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Island County, John Nieder (Griffin, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Declaration (non motion) Fri 07/08 2:21 PM
DECLARATION of Michael A. Griffin re1 Notice of Removal by Defendants Island County, John Nieder (Griffin, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs cmp Notice of Removal Fri 07/08 2:17 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Snohomish County Superior Court, case number 22 2-03156 31; Related [+], filed by Island County, John Nieder.(Griffin, Michael)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-7622202
Att: 1 13 pgs Complaint,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet